Bell Northern Research, LLC v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Bell Northern Research, LLC
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc. and Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00286
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint and Waiver of Foreign Service Requirement. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/16/2019. (nkl, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint and Waiver of Foreign Service Requirement by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bell Northern Research, LLC. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (Abdullah, Sadaf)
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Joseph Udick on behalf of Bell Northern Research, LLC (Udick, Steven)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Michael Hodge on behalf of Bell Northern Research, LLC (Hodge, Christopher)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Wayne Hartsell on behalf of Bell Northern Research, LLC (Hartsell, Steven)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sadaf R Abdullah on behalf of Bell Northern Research, LLC (Abdullah, Sadaf)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (ch, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bell Northern Research, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Hilco Patent Acquisition 56, LLC, Corporate Parent Hilco IP Merchant Capital, LLC, Corporate Parent Hilco, Inc. for Bell Northern Research, LLC. (Skiermont, Paul)
August 23, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )
August 23, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul Joseph Skiermont on behalf of Bell Northern Research, LLC (Skiermont, Paul)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Skiermont, Paul)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7405747.), filed by Bell Northern Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Skiermont, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell Northern Research, LLC v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bell Northern Research, LLC
Represented By: Paul Joseph Skiermont
Represented By: Sadaf R Abdullah
Represented By: Christopher Michael Hodge
Represented By: Steven Wayne Hartsell
Represented By: Steven Joseph Udick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?