Garrett et al v. Hanson et al
Plaintiff: Adrianne Garrett and Garrett Londoff
Defendant: Eric Hanson, Elias Hanson and Chandra Hanson
Case Number: 2:2019cv00307
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 10 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss 12(b)(3) for improper Venue or alternative to Transfer filed by Adrianne Garrett, Garrett Londoff. (Robertson, Alan)
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss 12(b)(3) for improper Venue or alternative to Transfer filed by Chandra Hanson, Elias Hanson, Eric Hanson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - map, #2 Exhibit B - Map)(Boyd, Paul)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, PROPOSED DEADLINES FOR DOCKET CONTROL ORDER AND DISCOVERY ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 11/20/2019 02:00 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap.). Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/1/2019. (ch, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss 12(b)(3) for improper Venue or alternative to Transfer filed by Adrianne Garrett, Garrett Londoff. (Robertson, Alan)
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by Adrianne Garrett, Garrett Londoff (Robertson, Alan)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 Defendants' Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint Subject to 12(b)(3) Mtn to Dismiss for Improper Venue or in alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue by Chandra Hanson, Elias Hanson, Eric Hanson.(Boyd, Paul)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss 12(b)(3) for improper Venue or alternative to Transfer by Chandra Hanson, Elias Hanson, Eric Hanson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - accident report, #2 Exhibit B - Plf Orig. Complaint, #3 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(Boyd, Paul)
October 14, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adrianne Garrett, Garrett Londoff. Elias Hanson served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Runge, Carson)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Chandra Hanson, Elias Hanson, Eric Hanson. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es))(ch, )
September 11, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
September 11, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chandra Hanson, Elias Hanson, Eric Hanson ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7432397.), filed by Adrianne Garrett, Garrett Londoff. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Runge, Carson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garrett et al v. Hanson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrianne Garrett
Represented By: Carson Reed Runge
Represented By: Alan Joseph Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garrett Londoff
Represented By: Carson Reed Runge
Represented By: Alan Joseph Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Hanson
Represented By: Paul M Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elias Hanson
Represented By: Paul M Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chandra Hanson
Represented By: Paul M Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?