Kutt v. Apple Inc et al
Plaintiff: Mers Kutt
Defendant: Google Corporation, Storage Post Inc, Seasons Condominiums, Pamela Mary Devins, Dell Inc, Robert Greene, Hewlet Packard Company, International Business Machines Corporation, Amazon.com Inc, Blackberry LTD, Best Buy Co Inc, ASUSTeK Computer Inc, Banking & Trust Company, United States of America Governments, Sony Corporation, Scotiabank, Toshiba Corporation, Mr. Stuart Smith LLP, Lenovo Group Limited, Carol Clay, Rhea Greene, Nokia Corporation, Sprint Corp, AT&T Corp., Ellen Azevedo, Acer Incorporated, Verizon Communications Inc., Condominium Association, Fujitu Limited, Samsung Electronics Company Ltd, Travelers Companies Inc, Atmel Corporation, Intel Corporation, HTC Corporation, JP Morgan Chase & Co., T-Mobile USA Inc, Arm Holding PLC, Microsoft Corporation, nVidia Corporation, Edward Francis O'Connor, LLP, Apple Inc, eBay Inc, Jones Day, Qualcomm Incorporated and Advanced Micro Devices
Case Number: 2:2019cv00316
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Referring Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Decl. of Ana Williams, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
November 18, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tiffany Patrice Cunningham on behalf of Intel Corporation (Cunningham, Tiffany)
November 18, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Decl. of N. Pous, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
November 7, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1), 12(b)(4), 12(b)(5) and 12(b)(6) by AT&T Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Paula Phillips, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Breedlove, Scott)
October 29, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Against Arm by Arm Holding PLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Plaintiff Mailing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Anderson, Kevin)
October 24, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss (Defendant BlackBerry Ltd.'s Motion to Dismiss Under Fed. Civ. P. 12(b)(4) and 12(b)(5)) by Blackberry LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Geng, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Hassett, Shaun)
October 24, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) by Travelers Companies Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Case No. 1:12-cv-1489 (E.D. Va. dismissed Feb. 20, 2013)), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Matthew)
October 24, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Dean Walker on behalf of Travelers Companies Inc (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Walker, Matthew)
October 18, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Memorandum in Support by Jones Day. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2013.02.20 E.D. Va. Order, #2 Exhibit 2-2015.12.17 E.D. Va. Order, #3 Exhibit 3-2017.01.24 E.D. Va. Order, #4 Exhibit 4-2016.02.05 U.S. Ct. App. Fed. Cir. Order, #5 Exhibit 5-S. Suchy Decl., #6 Exhibit 6-Kutt Sent Priority Mail Env (Exhibit A S. Suchy Decl., #7 Exhibit 7-Kutt Sent Complaint and Attachments (Exhibit B S. Suchy Decl., #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Erdmann, Michael)
October 18, 2019 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Apple Inc to 11/18/2019; Intel Corporation to 11/18/2019. (ch, )
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Apple Inc deadline is 11/18/2019, Intel Corporation deadline is 11/18/2019. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 10/18/2019. (ch, )
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Under FRCP 12(B)(4) and 12(B)(5) by Verizon Communications Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aizawa, #2 Ex 1 - Postal Package, #3 Ex 2 - Kutt Complaint, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Intel Corporation re #4 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move, or Otherwise Respond to Pro Se Plaintiff's Complaint (Gillam, Harry)
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
October 17, 2019 Per Conversation with Mr. Mers Kutt on 10/17/2019, an alternate e-mail address was provided to the court: mk@merskutt.com (klc, )
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Expedite Briefing. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 10/16/2019. (nkl, )
October 14, 2019 Filing 5 Opposed MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Intel Corporation's Opposed Motion to Extend the Deadline to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
October 14, 2019 Filing 4 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move, or Otherwise Respond to Pro Se Plaintiff's Complaint by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Rodney Gilstrap recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/10/2019. (nkl, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope(s))(nkl, )
September 23, 2019 Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 6-49203. (mjc, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Mers Kutt. (Attachments: #1 Attachments, #2 US Patent, #3 US Patent, #4 Exhibit)(ch, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/20/2019: #5 Envelope(s)) (ch, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/30/2019: #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (nkl, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kutt v. Apple Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Storage Post Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seasons Condominiums
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Mary Devins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dell Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewlet Packard Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Business Machines Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackberry LTD
Represented By: Shaun William Hassett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Buy Co Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASUSTeK Computer Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banking & Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America Governments
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scotiabank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Stuart Smith LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenovo Group Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Clay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhea Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nokia Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Corp.
Represented By: Scott Wayne Breedlove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen Azevedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acer Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Communications Inc.
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Condominium Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fujitu Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Company Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Companies Inc
Represented By: Matthew Dean Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atmel Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intel Corporation
Represented By: Harry Lee Gillam, Jr
Represented By: Tiffany Patrice Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arm Holding PLC
Represented By: Kevin Paul Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: nVidia Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Francis O'Connor, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eBay Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones Day
Represented By: Michael Allan Erdmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qualcomm Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Micro Devices
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mers Kutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?