Lighthouse Consulting Group, LLC v. Citizens Financial Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lighthouse Consulting Group, LLC
Defendant: Citizens Financial Group, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00338
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Citizens Financial Group, Inc. to 12/19/2019. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 9 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Citizens Financial Group, Inc..( Samansky, Adam)
November 5, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Citizens Financial Group, Inc. to 12/4/2019. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Citizens Financial Group, Inc..( Samansky, Adam)
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam Phillip Samansky on behalf of Citizens Financial Group, Inc. (Samansky, Adam)
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lighthouse Consulting Group, LLC. Citizens Financial Group, Inc. served on 10/16/2019, answer due 11/6/2019. (Hansley, Austin)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Citizens Financial Group, Inc. C/O: Corporation Service Company. (nkl, )
October 15, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
October 15, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hansley, Austin)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Lighthouse Consulting Group, LLC. (Hansley, Austin)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lighthouse Consulting Group, LLC (Hansley, Austin)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Citizens Financial Group, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7478320.), filed by Lighthouse Consulting Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Hansley, Austin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lighthouse Consulting Group, LLC v. Citizens Financial Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizens Financial Group, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Phillip Samansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lighthouse Consulting Group, LLC
Represented By: Austin Lee Hansley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?