Hartsfield et al v. PepsiCo, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Crystal Hartsfield, David Hartsfield, Kevon Hartsfield and Cadie Hartsfield
Defendant: PepsiCo, Inc., Morgan Olson, New Bern Transport Corporation, Leggett & Platt, Inc., Toyota Motor Corporation and Daimler Trucks North America LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00379
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
January 15, 2020 Filing 25 PepsiCo, Inc's ANSWER to #1 Complaint , First CROSSCLAIM against Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Leggett & Platt, Inc., Morgan Olson, Toyota Motor Corporation by PepsiCo, Inc..(Dresden, Dennis)
January 15, 2020 Filing 24 New Bern Transport Corporation's ANSWER to #1 Complaint , First CROSSCLAIM against Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Leggett & Platt, Inc., Morgan Olson, Toyota Motor Corporation by New Bern Transport Corporation.(Dresden, Dennis)
January 13, 2020 Filing 23 Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Leggett & Platt, Inc..(Scudder, Mark)
January 13, 2020 Defendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Daimler Trucks North America LLC to 1/21/2020. 10 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
January 13, 2020 Filing 22 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Daimler Trucks North America LLC.( Prichard, David)
January 13, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )
January 13, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
January 13, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Morgan Olson.(Dacus, Deron)
December 18, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Daimler Trucks North America LLC to 1/14/2020. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 20 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Daimler Trucks North America LLC.( Prichard, David)
December 18, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR. FIRST APPLICATION IS 30 DAYS Document # 19, Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 19 ***FILED IN ERROR***Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Daimler Trucks North America LLC.( Prichard, David) Modified on 12/18/2019 (ch, ).
December 16, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for PepsiCo, Inc. to 1/15/2020. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
December 16, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for New Bern Transport Corporation to 1/15/2020. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
December 16, 2019 Filing 18 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re PepsiCo, Inc..( Dresden, Dennis)
December 16, 2019 Filing 17 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re New Bern Transport Corporation.( Dresden, Dennis)
December 13, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Leggett & Platt, Inc. to 1/13/2020. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
December 13, 2019 Filing 16 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Leggett & Platt, Inc..( Scudder, Mark)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 1/28/2020 02:00 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/28/2020. (ch, )
December 11, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Morgan Olson to 1/13/2020. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
December 11, 2019 Filing 14 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Morgan Olson.( Dacus, Deron)
December 6, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Toyota Motor Corporation to 1/20/2020. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
December 6, 2019 Filing 13 Defendant's Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Toyota Motor Corporation.( Stone, David)
December 4, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cadie Hartsfield, David Hartsfield, Crystal Hartsfield, Kevon Hartsfield. Toyota Motor Corporation served on 11/29/2019, answer due 12/20/2019. (Embry, Jeffrey)
December 4, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cadie Hartsfield, David Hartsfield, Crystal Hartsfield, Kevon Hartsfield. PepsiCo, Inc. served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Embry, Jeffrey)
December 4, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cadie Hartsfield, David Hartsfield, Crystal Hartsfield, Kevon Hartsfield. New Bern Transport Corporation served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Embry, Jeffrey)
December 4, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cadie Hartsfield, David Hartsfield, Crystal Hartsfield, Kevon Hartsfield. Morgan Olson served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (Embry, Jeffrey)
December 4, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cadie Hartsfield, David Hartsfield, Crystal Hartsfield, Kevon Hartsfield. Leggett & Platt, Inc. served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Embry, Jeffrey)
December 4, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cadie Hartsfield, David Hartsfield, Crystal Hartsfield, Kevon Hartsfield. Daimler Trucks North America LLC served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Embry, Jeffrey)
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Margaret Claire Pennell on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Pennell, Margaret)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Leggett & Platt, Inc.. (ch, )
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Daimler Trucks North America LLC c/o CT Corporation System, Morgan Olson c/o Corporation Service Company, New Bern Transport Corporation c/o CT Corporation System, PepsiCo, Inc. c/o CT Corporation System, Toyota Motor Corporation c/o Sandra Phillips Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) Morgan Olson, LLC, #2 Summons(es) New Bern Transport Corporation, #3 Summons(es) Pepsico, Inc., #4 Summons(es) Toyota Motor Corporation)(nkl, )
November 18, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )
November 18, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, )
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Lynn Montgomery on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Montgomery, Matthew)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Patrick Peirce on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Peirce, Christopher)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7530777.), filed by Cadie Hartsfield, David Hartsfield, Crystal Hartsfield, Kevon Hartsfield. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Embry, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartsfield et al v. PepsiCo, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PepsiCo, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis S Dresden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Olson
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Bern Transport Corporation
Represented By: Dennis S Dresden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leggett & Platt, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Steven Scudder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Corporation
Represented By: David P Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daimler Trucks North America LLC
Represented By: David McDonald Prichard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Hartsfield
Represented By: Christopher Patrick Peirce
Represented By: Jeffrey Todd Embry
Represented By: Matthew Lynn Montgomery
Represented By: Margaret Claire Pennell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Hartsfield
Represented By: Christopher Patrick Peirce
Represented By: Jeffrey Todd Embry
Represented By: Matthew Lynn Montgomery
Represented By: Margaret Claire Pennell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevon Hartsfield
Represented By: Christopher Patrick Peirce
Represented By: Jeffrey Todd Embry
Represented By: Matthew Lynn Montgomery
Represented By: Margaret Claire Pennell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cadie Hartsfield
Represented By: Christopher Patrick Peirce
Represented By: Jeffrey Todd Embry
Represented By: Matthew Lynn Montgomery
Represented By: Margaret Claire Pennell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?