Staub et al v. Herb & Dee's Break Room Social Club, Inc.
Plaintiff: Morgan Jones and Kori Staub
Defendant: Herb & Dee's Break Room Social Club, Inc., Herbert M. Wilburn and Deidre Bockmon
Case Number: 2:2020cv00100
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Referring Judge: Roy S Payne
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15:1938
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 Filing 13 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Deidre Bockmon, Herbert M. Wilburn (ch, )
May 30, 2020 Filing 12 Request by Kori Staub, Morgan Jones for Clerk's Entry of Default against Deidre Bockmon, Herbert M. Wilburn. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Ramey, Archer)
May 11, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kori Staub, Morgan Jones. Deidre Bockmon served on 5/8/2020, answer due 5/29/2020. (Kolder, Eric)
May 11, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kori Staub, Morgan Jones. Herbert M. Wilburn served on 5/8/2020, answer due 5/29/2020. (Kolder, Eric)
May 6, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued as to Deidre Bockmon, Herbert M. Wilburn. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) Herbert Marvin Wilburn, Jr.)(nkl, )
May 6, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kori Staub, Morgan Jones.(Kolder, Eric)
May 4, 2020 Filing 7 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Herb & Dee's Break Room Social Club, Inc. (nkl, )
May 4, 2020 Filing 6 Request by Kori Staub, Morgan Jones for Clerk's Entry of Default against All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(Kolder, Eric)
April 15, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (nkl, )
April 13, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kori Staub, Morgan Jones. All Defendants. (Kolder, Eric)
April 8, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )
April 8, 2020 Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, )
April 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Archer King Ramey on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ramey, Archer)
April 8, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Herb & Dee's Break Room Social Club, Inc.. (ch, )
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7743221.), filed by Kori Staub, Morgan Jones.(Kolder, Eric) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/8/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ch, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Staub et al v. Herb & Dee's Break Room Social Club, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan Jones
Represented By: Archer King Ramey
Represented By: Eric J Kolder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kori Staub
Represented By: Archer King Ramey
Represented By: Eric J Kolder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herb & Dee's Break Room Social Club, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herbert M. Wilburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deidre Bockmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?