Stewart v. Michael G. Hartline et al
Plaintiff: Ricky Joe Stewart
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company, Misty Rene McCathern, Michael G. Hartline, Professional Transportation, Inc. and Demarione Drumaine Muldrow
Case Number: 2:2020cv00187
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Corey Barrett Kronzer on behalf of Ricky Joe Stewart (Kronzer, Corey)
July 22, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gemma Zuniga on behalf of Misty Rene McCathern, Professional Transportation, Inc., Union Pacific Railroad Company (Zuniga, Gemma)
July 21, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by Ricky Joe Stewart (Baxley, Bristol)
July 10, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
July 10, 2020 Filing 7 Demarione Drumaine Muldrow's ANSWER to Complaint by Demarione Drumaine Muldrow.(Bunt, Brian)
July 10, 2020 Filing 6 Michael G. Hartline d/b/a Hartline Farm & Timber's ANSWER to Complaint by Michael G. Hartline.(Bunt, Brian)
June 30, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
June 30, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company identifying Corporate Parent Union Pacific Railroad Company for Union Pacific Railroad Company, Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Gilliam, Bobby)
June 30, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Professional Transportation, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Professional Transportation, Inc. for Professional Transportation, Inc., Professional Transportation, Inc.. (Gilliam, Bobby)
June 30, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Michael G. Hartline, Demarione Drumaine Muldrow by Misty Rene McCathern, Union Pacific Railroad Company, Professional Transportation, Inc..(Gilliam, Bobby)
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Misty Rene McCathern, Michael G. Hartline, Demarione Drumaine Muldrow, Professional Transportation, Inc. c/o National Registered Agents, Inc., Union Pacific Railroad Company c/o C.T. Corporation System. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) Misty Rene McCathern, #2 Summons(es) Demarione Drumaine Muldrow, #3 Summons(es) \Professional Transportation, Inc., #4 Summons(es) Union Pacific Railroad Company)(nkl, )
June 10, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )
June 10, 2020 Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, )
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ricky Joe Stewart ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7832725.), filed by Ricky Joe Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baxley, Bristol)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. Michael G. Hartline et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Gemma Zuniga
Represented By: Bobby S Gilliam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Misty Rene McCathern
Represented By: Gemma Zuniga
Represented By: Bobby S Gilliam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael G. Hartline
Represented By: Brian Lynn Bunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Professional Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Gemma Zuniga
Represented By: Bobby S Gilliam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Demarione Drumaine Muldrow
Represented By: Brian Lynn Bunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Joe Stewart
Represented By: Bristol Baxley
Represented By: Corey Barrett Kronzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?