Instacart v. Cornershop Technologies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Maplebear Inc. dba Instacart
Defendant: Does 1-10, Cornershop Technologies, Inc., Delivery Technologies US, Inc. and Cornershop Technologies LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00240
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #43 Motion for Extension of Time to File Sur-Reply to Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/11/2020. (nkl, )
September 9, 2020 Filing 43 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Cornershop Technologies LLC, Cornershop Technologies, Inc., Delivery Technologies US, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #39 Motion to Withdraw #17 MOTION to Expedite Discovery. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/8/2020. (nkl, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 41 Unopposed MOTION for Hearing re #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Maplebear Inc. dba Instacart. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jacob, Sharif)
September 4, 2020 Filing 40 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Maplebear Inc. dba Instacart. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. Crain, #2 Ex. A - Crain CV, #3 Declaration of S. Jacob, #4 Ex. A - Uber Press Release, #5 Ex. B - Jacobs Article, #6 Ex. C - 9.3.2020 Proposed Stip, #7 Ex. D. - Redline of 9.3.2020 Proposed Stip, #8 Ex. E - Clean Copy of Proposed Stip)(Jacob, Sharif)
September 4, 2020 Filing 39 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #17 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Maplebear Inc. dba Instacart. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jacob, Sharif)
September 3, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer by Cornershop Technologies LLC, Cornershop Technologies, Inc., Delivery Technologies US, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Polito, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Affidavit Alvarado, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Affidavit Mena, #21 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
September 3, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John A Polito on behalf of Cornershop Technologies LLC, Cornershop Technologies, Inc., Delivery Technologies US, Inc. (Polito, John)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #17 MOTION to Expedite Discovery, #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Replies due by 9/4/2020.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/25/2020. (nkl, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 35 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 MOTION to Expedite Discovery, #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Maplebear Inc. dba Instacart. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jacob, Sharif)
August 21, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Colette Reiner Mayer on behalf of Cornershop Technologies LLC, Cornershop Technologies, Inc., Delivery Technologies US, Inc. (Mayer, Colette)
August 21, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard S J Hung on behalf of Cornershop Technologies LLC, Cornershop Technologies, Inc., Delivery Technologies US, Inc. (Hung, Richard)
August 21, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael A Jacobs on behalf of Cornershop Technologies LLC, Cornershop Technologies, Inc., Delivery Technologies US, Inc. (Jacobs, Michael)
August 21, 2020 Filing 31 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cornershop Technologies LLC, Cornershop Technologies, Inc., Delivery Technologies US, Inc. (Smith, Melissa)
August 21, 2020 Filing 30 RESPONSE to Motion re #17 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Cornershop Technologies LLC, Cornershop Technologies, Inc., Delivery Technologies US, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Cuevas, #2 Affidavit Jacobs, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Affidavit Lizarzabal, #9 Affidavit Hung, #10 Exhibit A, #11 Exhibit B, #12 Exhibit C, #13 Exhibit D, #14 Exhibit E, #15 Exhibit F, #16 Affidavit Scarazzo, #17 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
August 21, 2020 Filing 29 RESPONSE to Motion re #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Cornershop Technologies LLC, Cornershop Technologies, Inc., Delivery Technologies US, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Cuevas, #2 Affidavit Lizarzabal, #3 Affidavit Jacobs, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Affidavit Hung, #10 Exhibit A, #11 Exhibit B, #12 Exhibit C, #13 Exhibit D, #14 Exhibit E, #15 Exhibit F, #16 Affidavit Scarazzo, #17 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
August 20, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE by Maplebear Inc. dba Instacart re #17 MOTION to Expedite Discovery Supplemental Certificate of Conference (Jacob, Sharif)
August 20, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE by Maplebear Inc. dba Instacart re #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Supplemental Certificate of Conference (Jacob, Sharif)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #17 MOTION to Expedite Discovery, #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Responses due by 8/21/2020. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/14/2020. (nkl, )
August 11, 2020 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 MOTION to Expedite Discovery, #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (SECOND) by Cornershop Technologies LLC, Cornershop Technologies, Inc., Delivery Technologies US, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
August 7, 2020 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Delivery Technologies US, Inc. to 9/7/2020; Cornershop Technologies LLC to 9/7/2020; Cornershop Technologies, Inc. to 9/7/2020. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
August 6, 2020 Filing 24 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Cornershop Technologies LLC, Cornershop Technologies, Inc., Delivery Technologies US, Inc..( Smith, Melissa)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #17 MOTION to Expedite Discovery, #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Responses due by 8/14/2020. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/31/2020. (ch, )
July 30, 2020 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 MOTION to Expedite Discovery, #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Cornershop Technologies LLC, Cornershop Technologies, Inc., Delivery Technologies US, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
July 22, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maplebear Inc. dba Instacart. Delivery Technologies US, Inc. served on 7/17/2020, answer due 8/7/2020. (Jones, Michael)
July 22, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maplebear Inc. dba Instacart. Cornershop Technologies LLC served on 7/17/2020, answer due 8/7/2020. (Jones, Michael)
July 22, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maplebear Inc. dba Instacart. Cornershop Technologies, Inc. served on 7/17/2020, answer due 8/7/2020. (Jones, Michael)
July 16, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV on behalf of Maplebear Inc. dba Instacart (Clutter, Patrick)
July 16, 2020 Filing 17 WITHDRAWN PER ORDER #42 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Maplebear Inc. dba Instacart. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - First Set of Interrogatories, #2 Ex B - First Set of Requests for Production, #3 Ex C - Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Jacob, Sharif) Modified on 9/8/2020 (nkl, ).
July 16, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Maplebear Inc. dba Instacart. (Attachments: #1 A. Nodes Declaration, #2 Ex. A Jackson Square Ventures Just Closed Its Third Fund With $193 Million; Heres How It Plans To Invest It, #3 Ex. B Cease and Desist, #4 Ex. C Cornershop's Response to Instacart's Cease and Desist, #5 Ex. D Cornershop Aims For Slice of Grocery Shopping in Chile and Mexico, #6 Ex. E Ubers Grocery-Delivery Expansion Plans Face Questions as Chains Rebel, #7 Ex. F Job Postings, #8 Ex. G Cornershop's TOS, #9 L. Romaniuk Declaration, #10 Ex. A Sam's Club Storefront, #11 Ex. B Sam's Club Bakery, #12 Ex. C Sara Lee Bread, #13 Ex. D How to Set Up Retailers, #14 Ex. E Initial Email Communication, #15 Ex. F Lightbox Assembly, #16 Ex. G MoPho Studio Guide, #17 Ex. H Photos Have Been Taken, #18 Ex. I Retouching Overview, #19 Ex. J Assignment Screen, #20 Ex. K Shopper Appl. T&C, #21 Ex. L Merrifield Assignment, #22 Ex. M Aerotek Agreement, #23 Ex. N MoPho Addendum, #24 Ex. O Hullar Assignment, #25 Ex. P Medina Assignment, #26 Ex. Q Ottele Assignment, #27 Ex. R Rodriguez Assignment, #28 Ex. S Copyright Registrations, #29 J. Rustad Declaration, #30 Ex. A - Instacart Storefront Screen Capture, #31 Ex. B - Instacart Aisle Screen Capture, #32 Ex. C - June 2020 Suspected Scraper User Identification List, #33 Ex. D - Instacarts robots.txt file, #34 Ex. E - Table of June 8, 2020 Image Comparison Results, #35 Ex. F - Table of June 8, 2020 Image Comparison Results with Exact Product Name and Price Matches, #36 Ex. G - Table Global Catalog Image Comparison Results, #37 Ex. H - Summary Table of Copyright Management Information, #38 K. Son Declaration, #39 Ex. A - Instacart's Operative TOS, #40 Ex. B - Instacart's Legacy TOS, #41 Ex. C - Cornershop's Terms of Use, #42 Ex. D - LinkedIn Pages, #43 Ex. E - Executive Account Pages, #44 Ex. F - Employee Account Pages, #45 Text of Proposed Order)(Jacob, Sharif)
July 16, 2020 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Maplebear Inc. dba Instacart identifying Corporate Parent None for Maplebear Inc. dba Instacart. (Jacob, Sharif)
July 16, 2020 Filing 14 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Maplebear Inc. dba Instacart. (Jacob, Sharif)
July 16, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by David J Silbert on behalf of Maplebear Inc. dba Instacart. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7895540. (Silbert, David)
July 16, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Maile Yeats-Rowe on behalf of Maplebear Inc. dba Instacart. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7895536. (Yeats-Rowe, Maile)
July 16, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Caroline K. Simons on behalf of Maplebear Inc. dba Instacart. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7895527. (Simons, Caroline)
July 16, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Robert M. O'Connell, Jr on behalf of Maplebear Inc. dba Instacart. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7895521. (O'Connell, Robert)
July 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Puja Parikh on behalf of Maplebear Inc. dba Instacart. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7895517. (Parikh, Puja)
July 16, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas R. Green on behalf of Maplebear Inc. dba Instacart. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7895509. (Green, Nicholas)
July 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Niall Roberts on behalf of Maplebear Inc. dba Instacart. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7895501. (Roberts, Niall)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Mark S. Puzella on behalf of Maplebear Inc. dba Instacart. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7895487. (Puzella, Mark)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Sarah Salomon on behalf of Maplebear Inc. dba Instacart. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7895480. (Salomon, Sarah)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Cornershop Technologies LLC, Cornershop Technologies, Inc., Delivery Technologies US, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es))(ch, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Sharif E. Jacob on behalf of Maplebear Inc. dba Instacart. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7895464. (Jacob, Sharif)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Copyright Form (AO 121). AO 121 mailed to the Register of Copyrights. (Jones, Michael)
July 16, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
July 16, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief and Money Damages against Cornershop Technologies LLC, Cornershop Technologies, Inc., Delivery Technologies US, Inc., Does 1-10 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7895406.), filed by Maplebear Inc. dba Instacart. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A Job Postings, #2 Ex. B MoPho Studio Guide, #3 Ex. C IS MoPho Vendor Instructions, #4 Ex. D IS TOS, Sign Up & Checkout, #5 Ex. E IS Legacy TOS, #6 Ex. F Cornershop TOS, #7 Ex. G Chart of IS' Copyrights, #8 Ex. H Copyright Images (Part 1), #9 Ex. H Copyright Images (Part 2), #10 Ex. H Copyright Images (Part 3), #11 Ex. I Chart Reflecting Altered CMI, #12 Ex. J Ubers Grocery-Delivery Expansion Plans Face Questions as Chains Rebel, #13 Ex. K IS Cease & Desist Letter, #14 Ex. L CS Reponse to Cease & Desist Letter, #15 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jones, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Instacart v. Cornershop Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornershop Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Richard S J Hung
Represented By: Colette Reiner Mayer
Represented By: John A Polito
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Michael A Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delivery Technologies US, Inc.
Represented By: Richard S J Hung
Represented By: Colette Reiner Mayer
Represented By: John A Polito
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Michael A Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornershop Technologies LLC
Represented By: Richard S J Hung
Represented By: Colette Reiner Mayer
Represented By: John A Polito
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Michael A Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maplebear Inc. dba Instacart
Represented By: Caroline K. Simons
Represented By: Sarah Salomon
Represented By: Mark S. Puzella
Represented By: Nicholas R. Green
Represented By: Maile Yeats-Rowe
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: David J Silbert
Represented By: Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV
Represented By: Sharif E. Jacob
Represented By: Robert M. O'Connell, Jr.
Represented By: Puja Parikh
Represented By: Niall Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?