MALDONADO et al v. Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: MICKEY MALDONADO and MELVIN J ASKEW
Defendant: Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 2:2020cv00242
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, PROPOSED DEADLINES FOR DOCKET CONTROL ORDER AND DISCOVERY ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 9/23/2020 11:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/27/2020. (nkl, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America.(Ramos, Steven)
July 28, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MELVIN J ASKEW. (Negem, Jimmy)
July 28, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MICKEY MALDONADO. All Defendants. (Negem, Jimmy)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (ch, )
July 17, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
July 17, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7898376.), filed by MICKEY MALDONADO, MELVIN J ASKEW. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet)(Negem, Jimmy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MALDONADO et al v. Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICKEY MALDONADO
Represented By: Jimmy Michael Negem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELVIN J ASKEW
Represented By: Jimmy Michael Negem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Steven Thomas Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?