Runyon v. Arkoma Energy Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Thomas Runyon
Defendant: Arkoma Energy Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00245
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Referring Judge: Roy S Payne
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Thomas Runyon (Hommel, William)
September 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by Thomas Runyon (Hommel, William)
September 14, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
September 14, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Arkoma Energy Services, LLC.(Love, Gregory)
August 17, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, )
August 12, 2020 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Arkoma Energy Services, LLC to 9/13/2020. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
August 12, 2020 Filing 5 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Arkoma Energy Services, LLC.( Love, Gregory)
August 12, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Phillip Love on behalf of Arkoma Energy Services, LLC (Love, Gregory)
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas Runyon. Arkoma Energy Services, LLC served on 7/28/2020, answer due 8/18/2020. (Hommel, William)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Arkoma Energy Services, LLC. REGISTERED AGENT - CHRISTOPHER BLACK (nkl, )
July 24, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )
July 24, 2020 Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, )
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Arkoma Energy Services, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7909146.), filed by Thomas Runyon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hommel, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Runyon v. Arkoma Energy Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Runyon
Represented By: William S Hommel, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkoma Energy Services, LLC
Represented By: Gregory Phillip Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?