The Estate of Henrietta Pipkins v. Marshall Mine, LLC et al
Plaintiff: The Estate of Henrietta Pipkins
Defendant: Caddo Creek Resources Company, L.L.C., RCT Commissioner Christi Craddick, The North American Coal Corporation, RCT Commission Chairman Wayne Christian, Marshall Mine, LLC, The Cabot Corporation, Nacco Industries, Inc., RTC Commissioner Ryan Sitton, The Railroad Commission of Texas and Cabot Norit Activated Carbon Americas
Case Number: 2:2020cv00268
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Referring Judge: Roy S Payne
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) by Marshall Mine, LLC, The Cabot Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Final Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Harrison, George)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) and Rule 12(b)(6) : Motion Hearing set for 11/12/2020 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/13/2020. (nkl, )
September 21, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Heather Diane Hunziker on behalf of RCT Commission Chairman Wayne Christian, RCT Commissioner Christi Craddick, RTC Commissioner Ryan Sitton, The Railroad Commission of Texas (Hunziker, Heather)
September 18, 2020 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Caddo Creek Resources Company, L.L.C., Nacco Industries, Inc., The North American Coal Corporation (Wise, Robert)
September 18, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) and Rule 12(b)(6) by Caddo Creek Resources Company, L.L.C., Nacco Industries, Inc., The North American Coal Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wise, Robert)
September 18, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
September 18, 2020 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Marshall Mine, LLC, The Cabot Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Cabot Norit Americas Inc. for Marshall Mine, LLC. (Harrison, George)
September 18, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Marshall Mine, LLC, The Cabot Corporation.(Harrison, George)
September 16, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RTC Commissioner Ryan Sitton. RTC Commissioner Ryan Sitton waiver sent on 9/15/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Hunziker, Heather)
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RCT Commissioner Christi Craddick. RCT Commissioner Christi Craddick waiver sent on 9/15/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Hunziker, Heather)
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RCT Commission Chairman Wayne Christian. RCT Commission Chairman Wayne Christian waiver sent on 9/15/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Hunziker, Heather)
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The Railroad Commission of Texas. The Railroad Commission of Texas waiver sent on 9/15/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Hunziker, Heather)
September 11, 2020 Partial Filing fee paid : $ 127.00, receipt number 6-54057 (mll, )
September 11, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Estate of Henrietta Pipkins. Caddo Creek Resources Company, L.L.C. served on 8/31/2020, answer due 9/21/2020; Marshall Mine, LLC served on 8/31/2020, answer due 9/21/2020; Nacco Industries, Inc. served on 8/28/2020, answer due 9/18/2020; RCT Commission Chairman Wayne Christian served on 8/31/2020, answer due 9/21/2020; RCT Commissioner Christi Craddick served on 8/31/2020, answer due 9/21/2020; RTC Commissioner Ryan Sitton served on 8/31/2020, answer due 9/21/2020; The Cabot Corporation served on 8/31/2020, answer due 9/21/2020; The North American Coal Corporation served on 8/28/2020, answer due 9/18/2020; The Railroad Commission of Texas served on 8/31/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es), #3 Summons(es), #4 Summons(es), #5 Summons(es), #6 Summons(es), #7 Summons(es), #8 Summons(es), #9 Envelope(s))(nkl, )
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/28/2020. (ch, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Cabot Norit Activated Carbon Americas, Caddo Creek Resources Company, L.L.C., Marshall Mine, LLC, Nacco Industries, Inc., RCT Commission Chairman Wayne Christian, RCT Commissioner Christi Craddick, RTC Commissioner Ryan Sitton, The Cabot Corporation, The North American Coal Corporation, The Railroad Commission of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) Caddo Creek Resources Company, L.L.C., #2 Summons(es) Marshall Mine, LLC, #3 Summons(es) Nacco Industries, Inc., #4 Summons(es) RCT Commission Chairman Wayne Christian, #5 Summons(es) RCT Commissioner Christi Craddick, #6 Summons(es) RTC Commissioner Ryan Sitton, #7 Summons(es) The Cabot Corporation, #8 Summons(es) The North American Coal Corporation, #9 Summons(es) The Railroad Commission of Texas)(nkl, )
August 21, 2020 Partial Filing fee paid on 8/18/2020: $ 273.00 received, receipt number 6-53815 (gsg)
August 17, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by The Estate of Henrietta Pipkins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope(s))(nkl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Estate of Henrietta Pipkins v. Marshall Mine, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caddo Creek Resources Company, L.L.C.
Represented By: Robert K Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCT Commissioner Christi Craddick
Represented By: Heather Diane Hunziker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The North American Coal Corporation
Represented By: Robert K Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCT Commission Chairman Wayne Christian
Represented By: Heather Diane Hunziker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall Mine, LLC
Represented By: George Breck Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cabot Corporation
Represented By: George Breck Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nacco Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Robert K Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RTC Commissioner Ryan Sitton
Represented By: Heather Diane Hunziker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Railroad Commission of Texas
Represented By: Heather Diane Hunziker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cabot Norit Activated Carbon Americas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of Henrietta Pipkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?