Garrity Power Services LLC v. Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd et al
Plaintiff: Garrity Power Services LLC
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd and Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00269
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Garrity Power Services LLC. Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd waiver sent on 9/2/2020, answer due 12/22/2020. (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
September 4, 2020 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Samsung Electronics America, Inc. to 12/22/2020; Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd to 12/22/2020. (ch, )
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND WAIVER OF FOREIGN SERVICE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/4/2020. (ch, )
September 3, 2020 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND WAIVER OF FOREIGN SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
August 27, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Grant Cole on behalf of Garrity Power Services LLC (Cole, Ryan)
August 26, 2020 Filing 10 CORRECTED SUMMONS Issued as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (ch, )
August 26, 2020 Filing 9 ***SEE CORRECTED SUMMONS # 10***SUMMONS Issued as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (ch, ) Modified on 8/26/2020 (ch, ).
August 25, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jaspal Singh Hare on behalf of Garrity Power Services LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7967469. (Hare, Jaspal)
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Jaspal Singh Hare on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hare, Jaspal)
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Garrity Power Services LLC. (Hare, Jaspal)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Garrity Power Services LLC (Hare, Jaspal)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of Garrity Power Services LLC (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es))(ch, )
August 17, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
August 17, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Garrity Power Services LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7950831.), filed by Garrity Power Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 067 patent, #2 Exhibit B - claim chart, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hare, Jaspal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garrity Power Services LLC v. Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garrity Power Services LLC
Represented By: Jaspal Singh Hare
Represented By: Elizabeth L DeRieux
Represented By: Ryan Grant Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?