IPCom Gmbh & Co. KG v. Verizon Communications Inc et al
Plaintiff: IPCom Gmbh & Co. KG
Defendant: Verizon Services Corp, Verizon Business Network Services Inc, Verizon Enterprise Solutions, LLC, Verizon Business Global, LLC, Verizon Communications Inc, Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc, Verizon Data Services LLC, Verizon Business Network Services, LLC and Verizon Online LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00323
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2020 Defendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Verizon Enterprise Solutions, LLC to 12/21/2020; Verizon Online LLC to 12/21/2020; Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless to 12/21/2020; Verizon Business Global, LLC to 12/21/2020; Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc to 12/21/2020; Verizon Communications Inc to 12/21/2020; Verizon Business Network Services, LLC to 12/21/2020; Verizon Business Network Services Inc to 12/21/2020; Verizon Data Services LLC to 12/21/2020; Verizon Services Corp to 12/21/2020. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
November 3, 2020 Filing 20 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Verizon Business Global, LLC, Verizon Business Network Services Inc, Verizon Business Network Services, LLC, Verizon Communications Inc, Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc, Verizon Data Services LLC, Verizon Enterprise Solutions, LLC, Verizon Online LLC, Verizon Services Corp.( Doan, Jennifer)
October 20, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kyle Randall Akin on behalf of All Defendants (Akin, Kyle)
October 20, 2020 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Verizon Enterprise Solutions, LLC to 12/4/2020; Verizon Online LLC to 12/4/2020; Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless to 12/4/2020; Verizon Business Global, LLC to 12/4/2020; Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc to 12/4/2020; Verizon Communications Inc to 12/4/2020; Verizon Business Network Services, LLC to 12/4/2020; Verizon Business Network Services Inc to 12/4/2020; Verizon Data Services LLC to 12/4/2020; Verizon Services Corp to 12/4/2020. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
October 20, 2020 Filing 18 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Verizon Business Global, LLC, Verizon Business Network Services Inc, Verizon Business Network Services, LLC, Verizon Communications Inc, Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc, Verizon Data Services LLC, Verizon Enterprise Solutions, LLC, Verizon Online LLC, Verizon Services Corp.( Doan, Jennifer)
October 20, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Haltom Doan on behalf of All Defendants (Doan, Jennifer)
October 20, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by IPCom Gmbh & Co. KG. Verizon Services Corp served on 10/14/2020, answer due 11/4/2020. (Black, Martin)
October 20, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by IPCom Gmbh & Co. KG. Verizon Online LLC served on 10/14/2020, answer due 11/4/2020. (Black, Martin)
October 20, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by IPCom Gmbh & Co. KG. Verizon Data Services LLC served on 10/14/2020, answer due 11/4/2020. (Black, Martin)
October 20, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by IPCom Gmbh & Co. KG. Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc served on 10/14/2020, answer due 11/4/2020. (Black, Martin)
October 20, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by IPCom Gmbh & Co. KG. Verizon Business Network Services, LLC served on 10/14/2020, answer due 11/4/2020. (Black, Martin)
October 20, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by IPCom Gmbh & Co. KG. Verizon Business Global, LLC served on 10/14/2020, answer due 11/4/2020. (Black, Martin)
October 20, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by IPCom Gmbh & Co. KG. Verizon Enterprise Solutions, LLC served on 10/14/2020, answer due 11/4/2020. (Black, Martin)
October 20, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by IPCom Gmbh & Co. KG. Verizon Business Network Services Inc served on 10/14/2020, answer due 11/4/2020. (Black, Martin)
October 20, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by IPCom Gmbh & Co. KG. Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless served on 10/14/2020, answer due 11/4/2020. (Black, Martin)
October 20, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by IPCom Gmbh & Co. KG. Verizon Communications Inc served on 10/14/2020, answer due 11/4/2020. (Black, Martin)
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless c/o Registered Agent, The Corporation Trust Company, Verizon Business Global, LLC c/o Registered Agent, The Corporation Trust Company, Verizon Business Network Services Inc c/o Registered Agent, The Corporation Trust Company, Verizon Business Network Services, LLC c/o Registered Agent C T Corporation System, Verizon Communications Inc c/o Registered Agent CT Corporation System, Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc c/o Registered Agent C T Corporation System, Verizon Data Services LLC c/o Registered Agent C T Corporation System, Verizon Enterprise Solutions, LLC c/o Registered Agent C T Corporation System, Verizon Online LLC c/o Registered Agent C T Corporation System, Verizon Services Corp. c/o Registered Agent C T Corporation System (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) Verizon Business Global, LLC, #2 Summons(es) Verizon Business Network Services Inc., #3 Summons(es) Verizon Business Network Services, LLC, #4 Summons(es) Verizon Communications Inc., #5 Summons(es) Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc., #6 Summons(es) Verizon Data Services LLC, #7 Summons(es) Verizon Enterprise Solutions, LLC, #8 Summons(es) Verizon Online LLC, #9 Summons(es) Verizon Services Corp.)(nkl, )
October 1, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy Franklin Dewberry on behalf of IPCom Gmbh & Co. KG (Dewberry, Timothy)
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Brian Plies on behalf of IPCom Gmbh & Co. KG (Plies, Jeffrey)
October 1, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
October 1, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by IPCom Gmbh & Co. KG identifying Other Affiliate IPCom Holding GmbH, Other Affiliate Karols Development Co., LLC for IPCom Gmbh & Co. KG. (Black, Martin)
October 1, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Black, Martin)
October 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Verizon Business Global, LLC, Verizon Business Network Services Inc, Verizon Business Network Services, LLC, Verizon Communications Inc, Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc, Verizon Data Services LLC, Verizon Enterprise Solutions, LLC, Verizon Online LLC, Verizon Services Corp ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-8031968.), filed by IPCom Gmbh & Co. KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Black, Martin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IPCom Gmbh & Co. KG v. Verizon Communications Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Services Corp
Represented By: Kyle Randall Akin
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Business Network Services Inc
Represented By: Kyle Randall Akin
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Enterprise Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Kyle Randall Akin
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Business Global, LLC
Represented By: Kyle Randall Akin
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Communications Inc
Represented By: Kyle Randall Akin
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless
Represented By: Kyle Randall Akin
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc
Represented By: Kyle Randall Akin
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Data Services LLC
Represented By: Kyle Randall Akin
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Business Network Services, LLC
Represented By: Kyle Randall Akin
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Online LLC
Represented By: Kyle Randall Akin
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IPCom Gmbh & Co. KG
Represented By: Timothy Franklin Dewberry
Represented By: Jeffrey Brian Plies
Represented By: Martin Jay Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?