Seagen Inc. v. Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.
Plaintiff: Seagen Inc.
Defendant: Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.
Petitioner: Non-Party The University of Texas MD Anderson Cancer Center
Not Classified By Court: David Folsom and Shane A Nelson
Intervenor Defendant: AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP and AstraZeneca UK Limited
Case Number: 2:2020cv00337
Filed: October 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 494 ORDER granting #493 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Angela X Gao terminated. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/28/2023. (ch, )
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 493 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney AS TO ANGELA X. GAO by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Prop Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
February 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 492 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: impasse(Folsom, David)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 491 NOTICE by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd. REGARDING PATENT TRIAL AND APPEAL BOARD'S INSTITUTION OF POST-GRANT REVIEW (Attachments: #1 February 14, 2023 Ruling of the Patent Trial and Appeal Board)(Ratliff II, Preston)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 490 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas Lane Evoy on behalf of AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-9296407. (Evoy, Nicholas)
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 489 ORDER granting #488 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Karl M Johnston terminated. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/23/2022. (ch, )
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 488 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Karl M. Johnston) by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fair, Andrea)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 487 ORDER - Court enters this Order sua sponte. Court ORDERS Seagen Inc., Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd., and Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, and Astrazeneca UK Ltd (the Parties) to mediate in this case promptly and at a mutually agreeable date. The mediation shall be conducted by the Hon. David Folsom, 6002-B Summerfield Drive, Texarkana, Texas 75503, dfolsom@jw.com. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/14/2022. (ch, )
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 486 REDACTION to #478 Sealed PATENT Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion by Seagen Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 485 REDACTION to #471 Sealed PATENT Reply to Response to PATENT Motion, by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit M. Chivvis, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Smith, Melissa)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 484 Unopposed MOTION for Hearing re #442 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY BASED ON SEAGENS POST-TRIAL DISCLAIMER AND FOR DISMISSAL OF INFRINGEMENT CLAIMS AS MOOT, #443 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR JUDGMENT FOR SUPPLEMENTAL DAMAGES AND ONGOING ROYALTIES by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ratliff II, Preston)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 483 REDACTION to #479 Sealed Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion, for Judgment for Supplemental Damages and Ongoing Royalties by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Thompson, Gregory)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 482 REDACTION to #474 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion, Renewed Motion for Judgment of Invalidity as a Matter of Law by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Thompson, Gregory)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 481 REDACTION to #473 Reply to Response to Motion for New Trial by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Thompson, Gregory)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 480 REDACTION to #472 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion, Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law as to Non-Infringement and Damages by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Thompson, Gregory)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 479 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #443 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR JUDGMENT FOR SUPPLEMENTAL DAMAGES AND ONGOING ROYALTIES filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Ratliff II, Preston)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 478 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #445 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law as to Non-Infringement and Damages filed by Seagen Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 477 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #444 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Renewed Motion for Judgment of Invalidity as a Matter of Law filed by Seagen Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 476 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #446 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Motion for New Trial filed by Seagen Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 475 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #442 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY BASED ON SEAGENS POST-TRIAL DISCLAIMER AND FOR DISMISSAL OF INFRINGEMENT CLAIMS AS MOOT filed by Seagen Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 474 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #444 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Renewed Motion for Judgment of Invalidity as a Matter of Law filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Ratliff II, Preston)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 473 REPLY to Response to Motion re #446 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Motion for New Trial filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Ratliff II, Preston)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 472 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #445 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law as to Non-Infringement and Damages filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit DECLARATION OF PRESTON K. RATLIFF II, #2 Exhibit 1)(Ratliff II, Preston)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 471 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re #443 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR JUDGMENT FOR SUPPLEMENTAL DAMAGES AND ONGOING ROYALTIES filed by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit M. Chivvis, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Smith, Melissa)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 470 REPLY to Response to Motion re #442 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY BASED ON SEAGENS POST-TRIAL DISCLAIMER AND FOR DISMISSAL OF INFRINGEMENT CLAIMS AS MOOT filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ratliff II, Preston)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 469 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #443 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR JUDGMENT FOR SUPPLEMENTAL DAMAGES AND ONGOING ROYALTIES filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Christine S. Meyer, Ph.D., #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Text of Proposed Order)(Ratliff II, Preston)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 468 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #445 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law as to Non-Infringement and Damages filed by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit M. Chivvis, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 467 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #444 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Renewed Motion for Judgment of Invalidity as a Matter of Law filed by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 466 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #446 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Motion for New Trial filed by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 465 RESPONSE in Opposition re #442 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY BASED ON SEAGENS POST-TRIAL DISCLAIMER AND FOR DISMISSAL OF INFRINGEMENT CLAIMS AS MOOT filed by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 464 REDACTION to #452 Sealed PATENT Reply to Response to PATENT Motion, by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit M. Chivvis, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Smith, Melissa)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 463 REDACTION to #458 Sealed Response to Motion by Seagen Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 462 REDACTION to #457 Sealed Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion, by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Preston K. Ratliff II)(Thompson, Gregory)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 461 REDACTION to #447 Sealed Response to Motion, by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Thompson, Gregory)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 460 ORDER granting #453 Motion Regarding Schedule for Post-Trial Briefing. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/11/2022. (nkl, )
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 459 ORDER REGARDING POST-TRIAL DEPOSITIONS. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/6/2022. (ch, )
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 458 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #455 Opposed MOTION to Take Deposition from SEAGEN MOTION DECLARANT MS. CARRIE DISTLER AND FOR EXPEDITED BRIEFING filed by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 457 SEALED Defendants' SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #435 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR AN EXCEPTIONAL CASE FINDING AND ATTORNEY FEES UNDER 35 U.S.C. 285 filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit DECLARATION OF PRESTON K. RATLIFF II, #2 Exhibit A)(Ratliff II, Preston)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 456 ORDER re #455 Opposed MOTION to Take Deposition from SEAGEN MOTION DECLARANT MS. CARRIE DISTLER AND FOR EXPEDITED BRIEFING filed by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/31/2022. (nkl, )
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 455 Opposed MOTION to Take Deposition from SEAGEN MOTION DECLARANT MS. CARRIE DISTLER AND FOR EXPEDITED BRIEFING by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ratliff II, Preston)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 454 REDACTION to #443 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR JUDGMENT FOR SUPPLEMENTAL DAMAGES AND ONGOING ROYALTIES by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit C. Distler, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 16, #16 Exhibit 17, #17 Exhibit 18, #18 Exhibit 19, #19 Exhibit 20, #20 Exhibit 21, #21 Exhibit 22, #22 Exhibit 23, #23 Exhibit 24, #24 Exhibit 25, #25 Exhibit 26, #26 Exhibit 27, #27 Exhibit 28, #28 Exhibit 29, #29 Exhibit 30, #30 Exhibit 31)(Smith, Melissa)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 453 Joint MOTION REGARDING SCHEDULE FOR POST-TRIAL BRIEFING by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 452 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re #435 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR AN EXCEPTIONAL CASE FINDING AND ATTORNEY FEES UNDER 35 U.S.C. 285 filed by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit M. Chivvis, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Smith, Melissa)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 451 REDACTION to #446 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Motion for New Trial by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Mann, James)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 450 REDACTION to #445 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law as to Non-Infringement and Damages by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Mann, James)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 449 REDACTION to #444 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Renewed Motion for Judgment of Invalidity as a Matter of Law by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mann, James)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 448 REDACTION to #442 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY BASED ON SEAGENS POST-TRIAL DISCLAIMER AND FOR DISMISSAL OF INFRINGEMENT CLAIMS AS MOOT by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, John M. Lambert, Ph.D. Declaration with Exhibits 1-7, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Ratliff II, Preston)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 447 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #435 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR AN EXCEPTIONAL CASE FINDING AND ATTORNEY FEES UNDER 35 U.S.C. 285 filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Preston K. Ratliff II, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Ratliff II, Preston)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 446 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Motion for New Trial by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Ratliff II, Preston)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 445 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law as to Non-Infringement and Damages by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Ratliff II, Preston)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 444 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Renewed Motion for Judgment of Invalidity as a Matter of Law by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ratliff II, Preston)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 443 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR JUDGMENT FOR SUPPLEMENTAL DAMAGES AND ONGOING ROYALTIES by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit C. Distler, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 442 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY BASED ON SEAGENS POST-TRIAL DISCLAIMER AND FOR DISMISSAL OF INFRINGEMENT CLAIMS AS MOOT by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Lambert Declaration with Exhibits 1-7, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Ratliff II, Preston)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 441 REDACTION to #435 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR AN EXCEPTIONAL CASE FINDING AND ATTORNEY FEES UNDER 35 U.S.C. 285 by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit M. Chivvis, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 440 ORDER granting #439 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Janet S Kim terminated. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/9/2022. (ch, )
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 439 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Janet S. Kim by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fair, Andrea)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 438 FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Janet S. Kim by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fair, Andrea) Modified on 8/5/2022 (nkl, ).
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 438, Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Janet S. Kim. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 437 BILL OF COSTS by Seagen Inc.. Costs Taxed in the amount of $177,558.39. (ch, )
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 436 ORDER granting #434 Motion for Bill of Costs. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/3/2022. (ch, )
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 435 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR AN EXCEPTIONAL CASE FINDING AND ATTORNEY FEES UNDER 35 U.S.C. 285 by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit M. Chivvis, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 434 Unopposed MOTION for Bill of Costs by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 433 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (ch, )
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 432 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/19/2022. (ch, )
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 431 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER SUPPORTED BY FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/15/2022. (ch, )
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 430 NOTICE by Seagen Inc. REGARDING PATENT TRIAL AND APPEAL BOARDS DENIAL OF INSTITUTION OF POST-GRANT REVIEW (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Melissa)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 429 REDACTION to #408 Sealed Document by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mann, James)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 428 REDACTION to #407 Opposed SEALED MOTION TO DESIGNATE NEW EXPERT AND CONTINUE BENCH TRIAL by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Manspeizer, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mann, James)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 427 Sealed Document. Daiichi Sankyo Company, Limited's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law (Ratliff II, Preston)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 426 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT SEAGENS PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACTS AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. (Smith, Melissa)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 425 NOTICE by Seagen Inc. REGARDING SEAGENS BENCH TRIAL DEMONSTRATIVES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Smith, Melissa)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 424 Admitted Exhibits List for June 28, 2022 Bench Trial by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd... (Ratliff II, Preston)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 423 NOTICE by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd. Regarding Bench Trial Demonstratives (Ratliff II, Preston)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 422 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Bench Trial Proceedings held on 06/28/2022 before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shawn McRoberts,Telephone number: (903) 923-8546. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Motion to Redact due 7/20/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/27/2022. (smm, )
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 421 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Bench Trial completed on 6/28/2022. (Court Reporter Shawn McRoberts, RMR, CRR) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (aeb)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 420 Sealed Document Notice Regarding Deposition Designations for Bench Trial (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ratliff II, Preston)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 419 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT NOTICE REGARDING EXPERT DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS FOR BENCH TRIAL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Melissa)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 418 ORDER granting #410 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jayson L Cohen terminated. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/27/2022. (ch, )
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 417 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT NOTICE REGARDING EXPERT MATERIALS FOR BENCH TRIAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Melissa)
June 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 416 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Ratliff II, Preston)
June 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 415 NOTICE by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd. re #412 Order on Sealed Motion (Ratliff II, Preston)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 414 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew T Milam on behalf of AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited (Milam, Matthew)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 413 NOTICE by Seagen Inc. re #412 Order on Sealed Motion (Smith, Melissa)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 412 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re #407 . Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/23/2022. (jrg3, )
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 411 RESPONSE in Opposition re #407 Opposed SEALED MOTION TO DESIGNATE NEW EXPERT AND CONTINUE BENCH TRIAL filed by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Chivvis, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 410 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Request for Termination of Electronic Notices - Jayson Cohen by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Jayson)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 409 ORDER EXPEDITING BRIEFING. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/21/2022. (ch, )
June 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 408 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ratliff II, Preston)
June 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 407 Opposed SEALED MOTION TO DESIGNATE NEW EXPERT AND CONTINUE BENCH TRIAL by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Mr. David Manspeizer, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ratliff II, Preston)
June 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 406 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT SEAGENS BENCH TRIAL BRIEF REGARDING DSCS PROSECUTION LACHES EQUITABLE DEFENSE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Smith, Melissa)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Bench Trial set for 6/28/2022 01:00 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. **NOTE: ONLY THE TIME HAS CHANGED.(aeb)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 405 SECOND AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/31/2022. (ch, )
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 404 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 248 Protective Order by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ratliff II, Preston)
May 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 403 ORDER denying #390 Motion ; denying #392 Motion to Stay. The parties are ORDERED tosubmit trial briefs, not to exceed ten pages each, on the issues to be taken up at the bench trial.Briefs shall be submitted to the Court on or before June 20, 2022 at 8:00am.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/13/2022. (klc, )
May 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Bench Trial set for 6/28/2022 09:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (klc, )
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 402 NOTICE by Seagen Inc. re #392 Opposed MOTION to Stay Pending Post-Grant Review NOTICE OF RIPENESS (Smith, Melissa)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 401 REPLY to Response to Motion re #392 Opposed MOTION to Stay Pending Post-Grant Review filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Ratliff II, Preston)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 400 NOTICE by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd. re #397 Notice (Other) MOTION FOR ENTRY OF POST-TRIAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE (Ratliff II, Preston)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 399 REDACTION to #396 Sealed Response to Motion, by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Ratliff II, Preston)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 398 RESPONSE to Motion re #392 Opposed MOTION to Stay Pending Post-Grant Review filed by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 397 NOTICE by Seagen Inc. re #390 Opposed MOTION FOR ENTRY OF POST-TRIAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE NOTICE OF RIPENESS (Smith, Melissa)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 396 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #390 Opposed MOTION FOR ENTRY OF POST-TRIAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Ratliff II, Preston)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 395 ORDER granting #394 Motion for Expedited Briefing on its Motion to Stay Pending Post-Grant Review. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/28/2022. (ch, )
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 394 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite Briefing On Defendants' Motion to Stay Pending Post-Grant Review by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ratliff II, Preston)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER granting as modified #387 Motion to Expedite Briefing. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/25/2022. (ch, )
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 392 Opposed MOTION to Stay Pending Post-Grant Review by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Preston K. Ratliff II, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Text of Proposed Order)(Ratliff II, Preston)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 391 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #390 Opposed MOTION FOR ENTRY OF POST-TRIAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Smith, Melissa)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 390 Opposed MOTION FOR ENTRY OF POST-TRIAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ***FILED IN ERROR***SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #388 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF POST-TRIAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Smith, Melissa) Modified on 4/25/2022 (ch, ).
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ***FILED IN ERROR***Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF POST-TRIAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) Modified on 4/25/2022 (ch, ).
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 387 Opposed MOTION to Expedite BRIEFING ON ITS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF POST-TRIAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 388, Opposed Motion. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 386, opposed MOTION FOR ENTRY OF POST-TRIAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. LINKED TO #388 THAT WAS FILED IN ERROR Document # 389, SEALED ADDITONAL ATTACHMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 386 ***FILED IN ERROR***Opposed MOTION FOR ENTRY OF POST-TRIAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) Modified on 4/25/2022 (ch, ).
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 385 ORDER denying #365 SEALED MOTION DEFENDANTS RULE 50(a) MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/14/2022. (ch, )
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 384 NOTICE by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd. Regarding Trial Demonstratives (Ratliff II, Preston)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 383 Admitted Exhibits List by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd... (Ratliff II, Preston)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 382 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial (Volume 4 Redacted) Proceedings held on 04/07/2022 before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shawn McRoberts,Telephone number: (903) 923-8546.
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 381 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial (Volume 3 Redcated) Proceedings held on 04/06/2022 before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shawn McRoberts,Telephone number: (903) 923-8546.
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 380 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial (Volume 2 Redacted) Proceedings held on 04/05/2022 before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shawn McRoberts,Telephone number: (903) 923-8546.
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 379 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial (Volume 1 Redacted) Proceedings held on 04/04/2022 before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shawn McRoberts,Telephone number: (903) 923-8546.
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 378 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial (Volume 5) Proceedings held on 04/08/2022 before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shawn McRoberts,Telephone number: (903) 923-8546.
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 377 Sealed Trial (Volume 4) Transcript. (smm, )
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 376 Sealed Trial (Volume 3) Transcript. (smm, )
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 375 Sealed Trial (Volume 2) Transcript. (smm, )
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 374 Sealed Trial (Volume 1) Transcript. (smm, )
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 373 Seagen, Inc.'s Final Exhibit List for Jury Trial. (aeb)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 372 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Jury Trial completed on 4/8/2022. (Court Reporter Shawn McRoberts, RMR, CRR) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (aeb)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 371 SEALED Jury Notes. (aeb)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 370 SEALED Jury Verdict. (aeb)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 369 JURY VERDICT. (aeb)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 368 NOTICE by Seagen Inc. REGARDING TRIAL DEMONSTRATIVES (Smith, Melissa)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 367 Sealed Document. JOINT PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Ratliff II, Preston) Modified on 4/11/2022 (ch, ).
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Informal Charge Conference held on 4/7/2022. No court reporter. (aeb)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 366 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Jury Trial Day 4 held on 4/7/2022. (Court Reporter Shawn McRoberts, RMR, CRR) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (aeb)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 365 SEALED MOTION DEFENDANTS RULE 50(a) MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ratliff II, Preston)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 364 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Jury Trial Day 3 held on 4/6/2022. (Court Reporter Shawn McRoberts, RMR, CRR) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (aeb)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 363 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Jury Trial Day 2 held on 4/5/2022. (Court Reporter Shawn McRoberts, RMR, CRR) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (aeb)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER granting #358 Motion to Designate Preston K. Ratliff II as Lead Counsel. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/5/2022. (nkl, )
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 361 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Jury Selection held on 4/4/2022, Jury Trial Day 1 held on 4/4/2022. (Court Reporter Shawn McRoberts, RMR, CRR) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (aeb)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 360 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jessica M Stauring on behalf of Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8860566. (Stauring, Jessica)
April 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 359 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #328 Sealed Patent Document,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6)(Mann, James)
April 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 358 Unopposed MOTION to Appoint Counsel Preston K. Ratliff II as Lead Counsel for Daiichi Sankyo Company, Limited by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ratliff II, Preston)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 357 REDACTION to #309 Sealed PATENT Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion, by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ratliff II, Preston)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 356 REDACTION to #308 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST SEAGEN INC. FOR VIOLATIONS OF THE COURT'S DISCOVERY ORDER AND PROTECTIVE ORDER by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7, #2 Exhibit 9, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Ratliff II, Preston)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ORDER granting #354 Motion to Appoint Ms. Madoka Murakami as Interpreter at Trial. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/30/2022. (nkl, )
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 354 Unopposed MOTION TO APPOINT MADOKA MURAKAMI AS AN INTERPRETER AT TRIAL by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ratliff II, Preston)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 353 Defendants' Second Amended Trial Witness List by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Ratliff II, Preston)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 352 Third Amended Trial Witness List by Seagen Inc.. (Hill, Jack)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 351 Defendants' First Amended Trial Witness List by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Ratliff II, Preston)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 350 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas W. Jordan on behalf of AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8836599. (Jordan, Nicholas)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 349 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ariell Bratton on behalf of Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd. (Bratton, Ariell)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 348 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Garrett J Schuman on behalf of Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8833522. (Schuman, Garrett)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER ON PRETRIAL MOTIONS AND MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/15/2022. (ch, )
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 346 NOTICE by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd. (Defendants' Notice Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 282) (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORDER granting #342 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michelle Marek Figueiredo and Junxiao Huang terminated. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/4/2022. (ch, )
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 344 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Pretrial Conference (Volume 2) Proceedings held on 02/25/2022 before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shawn McRoberts,Telephone number: (903) 923-8546.
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 343 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Pretrial Conference (Volume 1) Proceedings held on 02/24/2022 before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shawn McRoberts,Telephone number: (903) 923-8546.
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 342 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney on behalf of Michelle Marek Figueiredo and Junxiao Huang by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 341 REDACTION to #294 Sealed PATENT Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion, #253 Sealed Patent Motion to Strike the Second Expert Report of David Manspeizer and Any Reliance Thereon by DSC Witnesses by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Thompson, Gregory)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 340 REDACTION to #293 Sealed PATENT Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion, #252 Sealed Patent Motion to Strike Portions of the Expert Reports of John M. Lambert by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Thompson, Gregory)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 339 NOTICE by Seagen Inc. NOTICE OF LODGMENT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Melissa)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER granting #337 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Sean Kang terminated. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/1/2022. (ch, )
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 337 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Sean Kang by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 336 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Seagen Inc. for proceedings held on 2/25/2022 Pretrial Conference Day 2 before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (Smith, Melissa) (Main Document 336 replaced with flattened version on 2/25/2022) (Forwarded to Shawn McRoberts on 2/25/2022) (ljw, ).
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 335 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited for proceedings held on 2/25/2022 Pretrial Conference Day 2 before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Main Document 335 replaced with flattened version on 2/25/2022) (Forwarded to Shawn McRoberts on 2/25/2022) (ljw, ).
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 334 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Final Pretrial Conference Day 2 held on 2/25/2022. (Court Reporter Shawn McRoberts, RMR, CRR) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (aeb)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 333 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited for proceedings held on 2/24/2022 Pretrial Conference Day 1 before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Main Document 333 replaced with flattened version on 2/25/2022) (Forwarded to Shawn McRoberts on 2/25/2022) (ljw, ).
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 332 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Seagen Inc. for proceedings held on 2/24/2022 Pretrial Conference Day 1 before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (Smith, Melissa) (Main Document 332 replaced with flattened version on 2/25/2022) Forwarded to Shawn McRoberts on 2/24/2022 (ljw, ).
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 331 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Initial Pretrial Conference Day 1 held on 2/24/2022. (Court Reporter Shawn McRoberts, RMR, CRR) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (aeb)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference Day 2 set for 2/25/2022 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (aeb)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 330 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Thompson (Tom) Gorham on behalf of Seagen Inc. (Gorham, Andrew)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 329 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #327 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 23)(Ratliff II, Preston)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 328 SEALED PRETRIAL ORDER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Smith, Melissa)
February 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 327 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #314 SEALED MOTION Seagen's Motions In Limine filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8, #2 Exhibit 9, #3 Exhibit 10, #4 Exhibit 11, #5 Exhibit 12, #6 Exhibit 13, #7 Exhibit 14, #8 Exhibit 15, #9 Exhibit 16, #10 Exhibit 17, #11 Exhibit 18, #12 Exhibit 19, #13 Exhibit 20, #14 Exhibit 21, #15 Exhibit 22, #16 Exhibit 23, #17 Exhibit 24, #18 Text of Proposed Order 25)(Ratliff II, Preston)
February 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 326 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #319 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Motions In Limine filed by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
February 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 325 Joint MOTION in Limine by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
February 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 324 NOTICE by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd. re #315 Joint MOTION in Limine Joint Agreed Motions In Limine (Ratliff II, Preston)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 323 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Lucas L Kressel on behalf of Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8796929. (Kressel, Lucas)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 322 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Harry Lee Gillam, Jr on behalf of Seagen Inc. (Gillam, Harry)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 321 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Seagen Inc. (Hill, Jack)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 320 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #308 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST SEAGEN INC. FOR VIOLATIONS OF THE COURT'S DISCOVERY ORDER AND PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 319 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Motions In Limine by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Ratliff II, Preston)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 318 REDACTION to #299 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion, #267 Sealed Patent Motion Renewed Motion for Sanctions by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Thompson, Gregory)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 317 REDACTION to #279 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion, #255 Sealed Motion for Summary Judgment of Anticipation by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 23)(Thompson, Gregory)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 316 REDACTION to #278 Sealed Response to Motion, #262 Sealed Patent Motion for Leave to Use Certain Documents Produced by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd. in Co-Pending Proceeding by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Thompson, Gregory)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 315 Joint MOTION in Limine Joint Agreed Motions In Limine by Seagen Inc.. (Wilson, Bryan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/15/2022: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 314 SEALED MOTION Seagen's Motions In Limine by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilson, Bryan)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 313 submitted NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, )
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT*** SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Motions In Limine by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Ratliff II, Preston) Modified on 2/15/2022 (ch, ).
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 312 NOTICE by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd. (Notice of Request for Real Time Reporting and Daily Transcripts of Court Proceedings) (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 311 NOTICE by Seagen Inc. OF REQUEST FOR DAILY TRIAL TRANSCRIPTS AND REAL TIME REPORTING (Smith, Melissa)
February 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 310 SECOND AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER Pretrial Conference set for 2/24/2022 09:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/21/2022. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/12/2022. (ch, )
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 309 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #262 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO USE CERTAIN DOCUMENTS PRODUCED BY DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD. IN CO-PENDING PROCEEDING filed by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Ratliff II, Preston)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 308 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST SEAGEN INC. FOR VIOLATIONS OF THE COURT'S DISCOVERY ORDER AND PROTECTIVE ORDER by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Ratliff II, Preston)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER granting #305 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Joseph M O'Malley, Jr terminated. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/10/2022. (ch, )
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER granting #304 MOTION Joint Expedited Permit Use of Certain Discovery Materials in a Pending Arbitration. #285 Motion for leave is Denied as moot. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/9/2022. (ch, ) Modified on 2/9/2022 (ch, ).
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 305 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (on behalf of Joseph M. O'Malley, Jr.) by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 304 MOTION Joint Expedited Motion for Leave to Permit Use of Certain Discovery Materials in a Pending Arbitration by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, Gregory)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER TO PURCHASE JURY MEALS. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/8/2022. (ch, )
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER REGARDING EXHIBITS. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/8/2022. (ch, )
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 301 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #283 Sealed PATENT Reply to Response to PATENT Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Smith, Melissa)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 300 REDACTION to #285 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Leave to Use Certain Discovery Materials in a Pending Arbitration by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mann, James)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 299 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #267 SEALED PATENT MOTION RENEWED MOTION FOR SANCTIONS filed by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Ratliff II, Preston) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/7/2022: #5 Revised Proposed Order) (nkl, ).
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 298 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #255 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF ANTICIPATION filed by Seagen Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 297 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Angela X Gao on behalf of AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8775628. (Gao, Angela)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 296 NOTICE by Seagen Inc. re #285 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Leave to Use Certain Discovery Materials in a Pending Arbitration NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION (Smith, Melissa)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER granting #284 Opposed Motion for Leave to FileReply in Support of Seagens Motion for Leave to Use Certain Documents Produced. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/3/2022. (ch, )
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 294 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #253 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO STRIKE THE SECOND EXPERT REPORT OF DAVID MANSPEIZER AND ANY RELIANCE THEREON BY DSC WITNESSES filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Ratliff II, Preston)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 293 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #252 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORTS OF JOHN M. LAMBERT filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Ratliff II, Preston)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 292 REDACTION to #284 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO FILE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF SEAGENS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO USE CERTAIN DOCUMENTS PRODUCED BY DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD IN CO-PENDING PROCEEDING by Seagen Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 291 REDACTION to #283 Sealed PATENT Reply to Response to PATENT Motion by Seagen Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 290 REDACTION to #281 Sealed Patent Document by Seagen Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 289 REDACTION to #276 Sealed PATENT Reply to Response to PATENT Motion by Seagen Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 288 REDACTION to #275 Sealed PATENT Reply to Response to PATENT Motion by Seagen Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 287 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Motion Proceedings held on 12/20/2021 before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shawn McRoberts,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464.
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER re #278 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 262 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO USE CERTAIN DOCUMENTS PRODUCED BY DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD. IN CO-PENDING PROCEEDING. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/2/2022. (ch, )
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 285 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Leave to Use Certain Discovery Materials in a Pending Arbitration by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ratliff II, Preston)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 284 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO FILE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF SEAGENS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO USE CERTAIN DOCUMENTS PRODUCED BY DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD IN CO-PENDING PROCEEDING by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 283 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re #262 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO USE CERTAIN DOCUMENTS PRODUCED BY DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD. IN CO-PENDING PROCEEDING filed by Seagen Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 282 FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File REPLY IN SUPPORT OF SEAGENS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO USE CERTAIN DOCUMENTS PRODUCED BY DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD IN CO-PENDING PROCEEDING by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) Modified on 2/2/2022 (nkl, ).
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 282, Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File REPLY IN SUPPORT OF SEAGENS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO USE CERTAIN DOCUMENTS PRODUCED BY DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD IN CO-PENDING PROCEEDING. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 281 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. NOTICE REGARDING ARBITRATORS ORDER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Melissa)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 280 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Seagen Inc. for proceedings held on December 20, 2021 (Telephonic Motion Hearing) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (Smith, Melissa) (Forwarded to Shawn McRoberts on 1/31/2022) (ljw, ).
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 279 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #255 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF ANTICIPATION filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 23)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 278 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #262 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO USE CERTAIN DOCUMENTS PRODUCED BY DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD. IN CO-PENDING PROCEEDING filed by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Ratliff II, Preston)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER granting #269 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/28/2022. (ch, )
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 276 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re #253 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO STRIKE THE SECOND EXPERT REPORT OF DAVID MANSPEIZER AND ANY RELIANCE THEREON BY DSC WITNESSES filed by Seagen Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 275 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re #252 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORTS OF JOHN M. LAMBERT filed by Seagen Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 274 REDACTION to #266 Sealed Response to Motion, by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Preston K. Ratliff II, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, Gregory)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 273 REDACTION to #265 Sealed Response to Motion, by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Preston K. Ratliff II, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, Gregory)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 272 REDACTION to #262 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO USE CERTAIN DOCUMENTS PRODUCED BY DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD. IN CO-PENDING PROCEEDING by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 271 REDACTION to #267 SEALED PATENT MOTION RENEWED MOTION FOR SANCTIONS by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 270 REDACTION to #263 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,, by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 9, #7 Exhibit 10, #8 Exhibit 11, #9 Exhibit 12, #10 Exhibit 13, #11 Exhibit 16, #12 Exhibit 17, #13 Exhibit 18, #14 Exhibit 19, #15 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 269 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Pieter de Ganon by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER granting #264 Motion to Withdraw #254 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO PROVISIONAL RIGHTS OR PRE-ISSUANCE DAMAGES. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/25/2022. (ch, )
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 267 SEALED PATENT MOTION RENEWED MOTION FOR SANCTIONS by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 266 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #253 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO STRIKE THE SECOND EXPERT REPORT OF DAVID MANSPEIZER AND ANY RELIANCE THEREON BY DSC WITNESSES filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Preston K. Ratliff II, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Ratliff II, Preston)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 265 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #252 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORTS OF JOHN M. LAMBERT filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Preston K. Ratliff II, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Ratliff II, Preston)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 264 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #254 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO PROVISIONAL RIGHTS OR PRE-ISSUANCE DAMAGES by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ratliff II, Preston)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 263 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #255 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF ANTICIPATION filed by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Affidavit Bertozzi, #25 Exhibit A, #26 Affidavit Senter, #27 Exhibit B, #28 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 262 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO USE CERTAIN DOCUMENTS PRODUCED BY DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD. IN CO-PENDING PROCEEDING by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 261 REDACTION to #255 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF ANTICIPATION by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 6, #3 Exhibit 9, #4 Exhibit 10, #5 Exhibit 16, #6 Exhibit 17, #7 Exhibit 19, #8 Exhibit 20, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, Gregory)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 260 REDACTION to #254 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO PROVISIONAL RIGHTS OR PRE-ISSUANCE DAMAGES by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Preston K. Ratliff II, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, Gregory)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 259 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: suspended (Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd. AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP and AstraZeneca UK Limited)(Folsom, David)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 258 REDACTION to #252 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORTS OF JOHN M. LAMBERT by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit 9, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 256, Redaction. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 257 REDACTION to #253 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO STRIKE THE SECOND EXPERT REPORT OF DAVID MANSPEIZER AND ANY RELIANCE THEREON BY DSC WITNESSES by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 256 FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY REDACTION to #252 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORTS OF JOHN M. LAMBERT by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit 6, #4 Exhibit 9, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) Modified on 1/14/2022 (nkl, ).
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 255 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF ANTICIPATION by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ***WITHDRAWN PER #268*** SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO PROVISIONAL RIGHTS OR PRE-ISSUANCE DAMAGES by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Preston K Ratliff II, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Ratliff II, Preston) Modified on 1/26/2022 (ch, ).
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 253 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO STRIKE THE SECOND EXPERT REPORT OF DAVID MANSPEIZER AND ANY RELIANCE THEREON BY DSC WITNESSES by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 252 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORTS OF JOHN M. LAMBERT by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER granting #250 Motion to Withdraw #236 Motion to Redact re #228 Transcript. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/4/2022. (ch, )
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 250 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #236 Unopposed MOTION to Redact #228 Transcript,,, by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Redact Confidential Information from the Motion Hearing Transcript (Dkt. 236))(Thompson, Gregory)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 249 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF SEAGEN INC.S NOTICE OF REMAINING ISSUES FOR ITS MOTION TO COMPEL (Smith, Melissa)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of TELEPHONIC Motion Hearing: Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2021 10:30 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. ***NOTE: Only the time has changed.(aeb)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap: TELEPHONIC Motion Hearing held on 12/20/2021. Court held telephonic motion hearing. Counsel announced attendance. Mr. Chivvis spoke on behalf of the Plaintiff, and Mr. Ratliff and Mr. Dacus spoke on behalf of the Defendants. Discussion held re: Dkt. No. 234 as well as discovery and related scheduling issues. Directives and guidelines provided by the Court. (Court Reporter Shawn McRoberts, RMR, CRR) (aeb)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 248 FIRST AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER.Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/17/2021. (slo, )
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER - The telephonic hearing on Seagens Motion currently set for December 17, 2021 is CONTINUED to 12/20/2021 10:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/17/2021. (nkl, )
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 246 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #55 Protective Order by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order First Amended Protective Order)(Ratliff II, Preston) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/17/2021: #2 Revised Proposed Order) (nkl, ).
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 245 NOTICE by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd. Notice Regarding Motion to Compel (Thompson, Gregory)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER denying #237 MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF ARBITRATION EXPERT REPORTS AND TESTIMONY. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/15/2021. (ch, )
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 243 REDACTION to #240 Sealed Response to Motion To Compel Production of Expert Reports and Testimony of Two Non-Testifying Experts in A Private Arbitration by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, Gregory)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 242 REDACTION to #239 Sealed Response to Motion, To Compel Production of Alleged Development Documents and For Relief Under Rule 37 by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, Gregory)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER Setting TELEPHONIC MOTION HEARING #234 SEALED PATENT MOTION SEAGEN INC.S RENEWED MOTION TO COMPEL DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD.S PRODUCTION OF DEVELOPMENT DOCUMENTS AND FOR RELIEF UNDER RULE 37 : TELEPHONIC Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2021 10:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/13/2021. (ch, )
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 240 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #237 MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF ARBITRATION EXPERT REPORTS AND TESTIMONY filed by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ratliff II, Preston)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 239 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #234 SEALED PATENT MOTION SEAGEN INC.S RENEWED MOTION TO COMPEL DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD.S PRODUCTION OF DEVELOPMENT DOCUMENTS AND FOR RELIEF UNDER RULE 37 filed by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ratliff II, Preston)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER re #237 MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF ARBITRATION EXPERT REPORTS AND TESTIMONY. ORDERED that Daiichi Sankyo Company, Ltd.s response in opposition to the Motion shall be filed no later than 11:59pm on December 10, 2021. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/8/2021. (ch, )
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 237 MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF ARBITRATION EXPERT REPORTS AND TESTIMONY by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ****WITHDRAWN PER ORDER #251***Unopposed MOTION to Redact #228 Transcript,,, by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, Gregory) Modified on 1/4/2022 (ch, ).
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER granted as modified #233 Motion for Leave to File Renewed Motion to Compel and for Expedited Briefing. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/7/2021. (nkl, )
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 234 SEALED PATENT MOTION SEAGEN INC.S RENEWED MOTION TO COMPEL DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD.S PRODUCTION OF DEVELOPMENT DOCUMENTS AND FOR RELIEF UNDER RULE 37 by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 233 MOTION for Leave to File RENEWED MOTION TO COMPEL AND FOR EXPEDITED BRIEFING by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 232 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jessamyn Berniker on behalf of AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8684836. (Berniker, Jessamyn)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 231 NOTICE by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction (Thompson, Gregory)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER MEMORIALIZING MOTIONS. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/16/2021. (ch, )
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 229 FIRST AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER granting #209 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/16/2021. (ch, )
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 228 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing Proceedings held on 11/10/2021 before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shawn McRoberts,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464.
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 227 Order granting Motion to Withdraw #221 #223 #224 #225 , withdrawing motions #179 #187 #202 #213 . Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/12/2021. (ch, )
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 225 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #187 SEALED PATENT MOTION MOTION TO COMPEL DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD.S PRODUCTION OF DEVELOPMENT DOCUMENTS AND FOR RELIEF UNDER RULE 37 (RENEWED) by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 224 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #202 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL ASTRAZENCA TO PRODUCE RESPONSIVE COMMUNICATIONS WITH DSC AND OTHER DOCUMENTS OVER WHICH PRIVILEGE CLAIMS HAVE BEEN WAIVED, #211 SEALED MOTION to Compel Seagen to Produce Documents and Testimony Over Which Privilege Has Been Waived, #201 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD TO PRODUCE ALLEGED COMMON INTEREST AGREEMENT AND WITHHELD DOCUMENTS by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 223 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #213 MOTION to Compel Seagen to Produce Dr. Peter Senters Arbitration Testimony and Related Materials, #188 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS OF TOSHINORI AGATSUMA, YUKI ABE, YUJI KASUYA, AND KOJI MORITA by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 226 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Motion Hearing held on 11/10/2021 re #213 MOTION to Compel Seagen to Produce Dr. Peter Senters Arbitration Testimony and Related Materials filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, #186 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF SUNAO MANABE filed by Seagen Inc., #202 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL ASTRAZENCA TO PRODUCE RESPONSIVE COMMUNICATIONS WITH DSC AND OTHER DOCUMENTS OVER WHICH PRIVILEGE CLAIMS HAVE BEEN WAIVED filed by Seagen Inc., #211 SEALED MOTION to Compel Seagen to Produce Documents and Testimony Over Which Privilege Has Been Waived filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, #178 SEALED MOTION To Compel The Deposition of Clay Siegall, PH.D., Exhibit A and [Proposed] Order filed by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd., #179 SEALED MOTION To Compel Seagen Inc.'s Discovery Production, Exhibit A and [Proposed Order] filed by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd., #187 SEALED PATENT MOTION MOTION TO COMPEL DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD.S PRODUCTION OF DEVELOPMENT DOCUMENTS AND FOR RELIEF UNDER RULE 37 (RENEWED) filed by Seagen Inc., #188 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS OF TOSHINORI AGATSUMA, YUKI ABE, YUJI KASUYA, AND KOJI MORITA filed by Seagen Inc., #201 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD TO PRODUCE ALLEGED COMMON INTEREST AGREEMENT AND WITHHELD DOCUMENTS filed by Seagen Inc.. (Court Reporter Shawn McRoberts, RMR, CRR.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (aeb)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 222 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD WITH DEPOSITION OF DR. NAITO IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS TO COMPEL by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 221 Unopposed SEALED MOTION TO WITHDRAW DEFENDANT DAIICHI SANKYO COMPANY, LIMITED'S MOTION TO COMPEL SEAGEN INC.'S DISCOVERY PRODUCTION (Dkt. 179) by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ratliff II, Preston)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 220 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #211 SEALED MOTION to Compel Seagen to Produce Documents and Testimony Over Which Privilege Has Been Waived filed by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 219 RESPONSE in Opposition re #213 MOTION to Compel Seagen to Produce Dr. Peter Senters Arbitration Testimony and Related Materials filed by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 218 STATUS REPORT Regarding Motions to Compel by Seagen Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 217 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #201 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD TO PRODUCE ALLEGED COMMON INTEREST AGREEMENT AND WITHHELD DOCUMENTS filed by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ratliff II, Preston)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 216 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #202 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL ASTRAZENCA TO PRODUCE RESPONSIVE COMMUNICATIONS WITH DSC AND OTHER DOCUMENTS OVER WHICH PRIVILEGE CLAIMS HAVE BEEN WAIVED filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #213 MOTION to Compel Seagen to Produce Dr. Peter Senters Arbitration Testimony and Related Materials, #211 SEALED MOTION to Compel Seagen to Produce Documents and Testimony Over Which Privilege Has Been Waived : Motion Hearing set for 11/10/2021 02:30 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/9/2021. (nkl, )
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER granting #208 Motion to Exclude Lead Counsel. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/8/2021. (nkl, )
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 213 WITHDRAWN PER ORDER 227 MOTION to Compel Seagen to Produce Dr. Peter Senters Arbitration Testimony and Related Materials by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer) Modified on 11/15/2021 (ch, ).
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 212 NOTICE by Seagen Inc. re #202 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL ASTRAZENCA TO PRODUCE RESPONSIVE COMMUNICATIONS WITH DSC AND OTHER DOCUMENTS OVER WHICH PRIVILEGE CLAIMS HAVE BEEN WAIVED (NOTICE OF AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE) (Attachments: #1 CORRECTED CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE)(Smith, Melissa)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 211 SEALED MOTION to Compel Seagen to Produce Documents and Testimony Over Which Privilege Has Been Waived by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 210 NOTICE by Seagen Inc. re #201 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD TO PRODUCE ALLEGED COMMON INTEREST AGREEMENT AND WITHHELD DOCUMENTS (NOTICE OF AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE) (Attachments: #1 CORRECTED CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE)(Smith, Melissa)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 209 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 208 Unopposed MOTION TO EXCUSE LEAD COUNSEL FROM HEARING by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #201 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD TO PRODUCE ALLEGED COMMON INTEREST AGREEMENT AND WITHHELD DOCUMENTS, #202 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL ASTRAZENCA TO PRODUCE RESPONSIVE COMMUNICATIONS WITH DSC AND OTHER DOCUMENTS OVER WHICH PRIVILEGE CLAIMS HAVE BEEN WAIVED : Motion Hearing set for 11/10/2021 02:30 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., The Court ORDERS that lead and local counsel for the parties meet and confer in-person in an effort to resolve these disputes beginning at 9:00 a.m. central time on November 10, 2021 and continuing until the Court takes up these matters on their merits. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/8/2021. (klc, )
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 206 REDACTION to #197 Sealed Response to Motion, by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Ratliff II, Preston)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 205 REDACTION to #199 Sealed Response to Motion by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Ratliff II, Preston)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 204 REDACTION to #198 Sealed Response to Motion, by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Ratliff II, Preston)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 203 FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY REDACTION to #188 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS OF TOSHINORI AGATSUMA, YUKI ABE, YUJI KASUYA, AND KOJI MORITA by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Ratliff II, Preston) Modified on 11/8/2021 (nkl, ).
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #186 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF SUNAO MANABE, #187 SEALED PATENT MOTION MOTION TO COMPEL DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD.S PRODUCTION OF DEVELOPMENT DOCUMENTS AND FOR RELIEF UNDER RULE 37 (RENEWED), #179 SEALED MOTION To Compel Seagen Inc.'s Discovery Production, Exhibit A and [Proposed Order], #188 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS OF TOSHINORI AGATSUMA, YUKI ABE, YUJI KASUYA, AND KOJI MORITA, #178 SEALED MOTION To Compel The Deposition of Clay Siegall, PH.D., Exhibit A and [Proposed] Order : Motion Hearing set for 11/10/2021 02:30 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (klc, )
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 203, Redaction. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 202 WITHDRAWN PER ORDER #227 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL ASTRAZENCA TO PRODUCE RESPONSIVE COMMUNICATIONS WITH DSC AND OTHER DOCUMENTS OVER WHICH PRIVILEGE CLAIMS HAVE BEEN WAIVED by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) Modified on 11/15/2021 (ch, ).
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 201 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD TO PRODUCE ALLEGED COMMON INTEREST AGREEMENT AND WITHHELD DOCUMENTS by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER re Motions Hearing for #178 , #179 , #186 , #187 , and #189 . Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/5/2021. (jrg3, )
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 199 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #186 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF SUNAO MANABE filed by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Ratliff II, Preston)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 198 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #188 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS OF TOSHINORI AGATSUMA, YUKI ABE, YUJI KASUYA, AND KOJI MORITA filed by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Ratliff II, Preston)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 197 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #187 SEALED PATENT MOTION MOTION TO COMPEL DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD.S PRODUCTION OF DEVELOPMENT DOCUMENTS AND FOR RELIEF UNDER RULE 37 (RENEWED) filed by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Ratliff II, Preston)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 196 REDACTION to #190 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Melissa)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 195 REDACTION to #189 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion, by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Chivvis, #2 Exhibit A)(Smith, Melissa)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 194 REDACTION to #188 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS OF TOSHINORI AGATSUMA, YUKI ABE, YUJI KASUYA, AND KOJI MORITA by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Melissa)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 193 REDACTION to #187 SEALED PATENT MOTION MOTION TO COMPEL DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD.S PRODUCTION OF DEVELOPMENT DOCUMENTS AND FOR RELIEF UNDER RULE 37 (RENEWED) by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Smith, Melissa)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 192 REDACTION to #186 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF SUNAO MANABE by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Smith, Melissa)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER re #186 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF SUNAO MANABE filed by Seagen Inc., #187 SEALED PATENT MOTION MOTION TO COMPEL DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD.S PRODUCTION OF DEVELOPMENT DOCUMENTS AND FOR RELIEF UNDER RULE 37 (RENEWED) filed by Seagen Inc., #188 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS OF TOSHINORI AGATSUMA, YUKI ABE, YUJI KASUYA, AND KOJI MORITA filed by Seagen Inc. ORDERED that Defendant Daiichi Sankyo Company, Ltd.s responsesin opposition to the Motions shall be filed on or before November 4, 2021. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/2/2021. (ch, )
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 190 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #178 SEALED MOTION To Compel The Deposition of Clay Siegall, PH.D. filed by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 189 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #179 SEALED MOTION To Compel Seagen Inc.'s Discovery Production filed by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit M. Chivvis, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 188 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS OF TOSHINORI AGATSUMA, YUKI ABE, YUJI KASUYA, AND KOJI MORITA by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 187 WITHDRAWN PER ORDER #227 SEALED PATENT MOTION MOTION TO COMPEL DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD.S PRODUCTION OF DEVELOPMENT DOCUMENTS AND FOR RELIEF UNDER RULE 37 (RENEWED) by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) Modified on 11/15/2021 (ch, ).
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 186 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF SUNAO MANABE by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 185 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jessica L Pahl on behalf of AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8644789. (Pahl, Jessica)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 184 REDACTION to #178 SEALED MOTION To Compel The Deposition of Clay Siegall, PH.D., Exhibit A and [Proposed] Order by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ratliff II, Preston)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 183 REDACTION to #179 SEALED MOTION To Compel Seagen Inc.'s Discovery Production, Exhibit A and [Proposed Order] by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ratliff II, Preston)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT Document # 181, Motion to Compel. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT Document # 182, Motion to Compel. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ***FILED IN ERROR*** MOTION to Compel The Deposition of Clay Siegall, PH.D. by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ratliff II, Preston) Modified on 10/27/2021 (ch, ).
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ***FILED IN ERROR*** MOTION to Compel Seagen Inc.'s Discovery Production by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ratliff II, Preston) Modified on 10/27/2021 (ch, ).
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER - the court issues this order sua sponte. Re: Motion to Compel the Deposition of Clay Siegall, Ph.D. (Dkt. No. 178) and Motion toCompel Seagen Inc.s Discovery Production (Dkt. No. 179). Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/25/2021. (ch, )
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 179 WITHDRAWN PER #227SEALED MOTION To Compel Seagen Inc.'s Discovery Production, Exhibit A and [Proposed Order] by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Ratliff II, Preston) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/25/2021: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ). Modified on 11/15/2021 (ch, ).
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 178 SEALED MOTION To Compel The Deposition of Clay Siegall, PH.D., Exhibit A and [Proposed] Order by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Ratliff II, Preston) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/25/2021: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 177 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michelle Marek Figueiredo on behalf of Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd. (Figueiredo, Michelle)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 176 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Susan S. Hwang on behalf of Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8630995. (Hwang, Susan)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 175 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Dana Weir on behalf of Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8628882. (Weir, Dana)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 174 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Sean Kang on behalf of Seagen Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8628443. (Kang, Sean)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 173 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Alexandra J. Cho on behalf of Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8628421. (Cho, Alexandra)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 172 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Amanda L. Pober on behalf of Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8628416. (Pober, Amanda)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 171 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Michael J Fisher on behalf of Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8628410. (Fisher, Michael)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 170 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jacob A. Silvers on behalf of Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8628405. (Silvers, Jacob)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 169 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Junxiao Huang on behalf of Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8628399. (Huang, Junxiao)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 168 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Kevin P. Broughel on behalf of Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8628391. (Broughel, Kevin)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 167 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jayson L Cohen on behalf of Seagen Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8623951. (Cohen, Jayson)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 166 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Matthew I Kreeger on behalf of Seagen Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8622868. (Kreeger, Matthew)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. The Court hereby appoints the Hon. David Folsom as mediator in the above referenced case. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/12/2021. (nkl, )
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 164 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Sumaiya Sharmeen on behalf of Seagen Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8620705. (Sharmeen, Sumaiya)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 163 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Evelyn Li-Jin Chang on behalf of Seagen Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8610737. (Chang, Evelyn)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 162 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Karl M Johnston on behalf of Seagen Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8610701. (Johnston, Karl)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 161 NOTICE by Seagen Inc. JOINT NOTICE REGARDING MEDIATION (Smith, Melissa)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 160 NOTICE by Seagen Inc. of Compliance Regarding Supplemental Initial and Additional Disclosures (Smith, Melissa)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ***FILED IN ERROR***Letter Brief filed by Seagen Inc. (Smith, Melissa) Modified on 9/23/2021 (ch, ).
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 159, Letter Brief. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 158 NOTICE by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd. Notice of Compliance of Service of First Amended Initial and Additional Disclosures (Mann, James)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 157 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited (Amended Initial & Additional Disclosures) (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER - Court has received Mr. Nelsons invoice for services through September 15, 2021, the court hereby ORDERS payment to be promptly made as follows. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/15/21. (ch, )
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/14/2021. (ch, )
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 154 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Markman Hearing Proceedings held on 08/27/2021 before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shawn McRoberts,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464.
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 153 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd. for proceedings held on Markman Hearing on 08/27/2021 before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (Thompson, Gregory) (Forwarded to Shawn McRoberts on 8/30/2021) (ljw, ).
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 152 NOTICE by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd. Notice of Filing Hearing Presentation (Attachments: #1 Markman Presentation)(Thompson, Gregory)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 151 NOTICE by Seagen Inc. Notice of Filing Hearing Presentation (Attachments: #1 Markman Presentation)(Smith, Melissa)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 150 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Seagen Inc. for proceedings held on August 27, 2021 Markman Hearing before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (Smith, Melissa) (Forwarded to Shawn McRoberts on 8/27/2021) (ljw, ).
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Markman Hearing held on 8/27/2021. (Court Reporter Shawn McRoberts, RMR, CRR.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (aeb)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 148 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Kathryn S Kayali on behalf of AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8556998. (Kayali, Kathryn)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT NEED TO FILE UNDER PHV NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Document # 147, Notice of Attorny Appearance. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ***FILED IN ERROR***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kathryn S Kayali on behalf of AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited (Kayali, Kathryn) Modified on 8/27/2021 (ch, ).
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER denying #94 MOTION to Quash Subpoena. ORDERED that MD Andersons Motion to Quash is DENIED-AS-MOOT and the status hearing on MD Andersons Motion to Quash, which is scheduled for August 27, 2021 at 1:30 p.m., is hereby CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/26/2021. (ch, )
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Markman Hearing set for 8/27/2021 09:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 145 NOTICE by Seagen Inc. re #94 MOTION to Quash Subpoena (JOINT NOTICE OF MOOTNESS) (Smith, Melissa)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #94 MOTION to Quash Subpoena : Motion Hearing set for 8/27/2021 01:30 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/24/2021. (ch, )
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 143 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Justin T Fleischacker on behalf of AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8549091. (Fleischacker, Justin)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER denying #139 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Claim Construction Brief. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/16/2021. (ch, )
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 141 Joint Claim Construction Chart by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Melissa)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ***STRICKEN PER ORDER #142***CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Thompson, Gregory) Modified on 8/24/2021 (ch, ).
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 139 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Claim Construction Brief by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply Claim Construction Brief)(Thompson, Gregory)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 138 REDACTION to #135 Sealed Patent Document by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit MacLean, #2 Exhibit 26 Part 1, #3 Exhibit 26 Part 2, #4 Exhibit 27, #5 Exhibit 28, #6 Exhibit 29)(Smith, Melissa)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 137 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Kevin D Hoagland-Hanson on behalf of AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8527353. (Hoagland-Hanson, Kevin)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 136 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited (Initial and Additional Disclosures) (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 135 SEALED REPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit MacLean, #2 Exhibit 25, #3 Exhibit 26 Part 1, #4 Exhibit 26 Part 2, #5 Exhibit 27, #6 Exhibit 28, #7 Exhibit 29)(Smith, Melissa)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 134 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Kyotaro Ozawa on behalf of Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8525927. (Ozawa, Kyotaro)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 133 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited identifying Corporate Parent AstraZeneca PLC for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited. (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 132 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Andrew Hoffman on behalf of AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8519248. (Hoffman, Andrew)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 131 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by David I Berl on behalf of AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8517678. (Berl, David)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 130 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Ratliff II, Preston)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited.(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting #126 Motion to Intervene. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/28/2021. (ch, )
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 127 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Thomas S Fletcher on behalf of AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8511052. (Fletcher, Thomas)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Answer to Complaint), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER - Court hereby appoints Mr. Shane A. Nelson as the Courts technical advisor. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/19/2021. (ch, )
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 124 NOTICE by Seagen Inc. of Compliance Regarding Privilege Log (Smith, Melissa)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 123 REDACTION to #121 Sealed Patent Document,, by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Trail, #2 Affidavit MacLean, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24)(Smith, Melissa)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 122 NOTICE by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd. of Compliance Regarding Technical Tutorial (Thompson, Gregory)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 121 SEALED CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Trial, #2 Affidavit MacLean, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24)(Smith, Melissa)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 120 NOTICE by Seagen Inc. Notice of Compliance Regarding Technical Tutorial (Smith, Melissa)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting #117 MOTION Second Unopposed Motion for Leave to Conduct Deposition of Dr. Trail After Close of Claim-Construction Discovery. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/13/2021. (ch, )
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 118 Defendant Daiichi Sankyo Company, Limited's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd..(Ratliff II, Preston)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MOTION Second Unopposed Motion for Leave to Conduct Deposition of Dr. Trail After Close of Claim-Construction Discovery by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, Gregory)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting #115 Motion for Extension. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/2/2021. (jrg3, )
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Unopposed MOTION For Leave to Conduct Deposition of Dr. Trail After Close of Claim-Construction Discovery by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mann, James)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/28/2021. (ch, )
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 113 Unopposed MOTION for Hearing re #24 SEALED MOTION TO TRANSFER, #22 SEALED MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION AND LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION RENEWED MOTION by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 112 REDACTION to #111 Sealed Document by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Dacus, Deron)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 111 Sealed Document. - Defendant's Notice of Subpoenas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Dacus, Deron)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 110 REDACTION to #105 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion, by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Dacus, Deron)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 109 REDACTION to #104 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion, by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 13)(Dacus, Deron)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 108 REDACTION to #100 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,, by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Chivvis)(Smith, Melissa)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 REDACTION to #99 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion, by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Chivvis)(Smith, Melissa)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 101, Redaction. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 102, Redaction. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 103, Sealed Supplemental Reply. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement Pursuant to Patent Rule 4-3 by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Smith, Melissa)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 105 SEALED SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY to Response to Motion re #22 SEALED MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION AND LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION filed by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 10, #3 Exhibit 11, #4 Exhibit 12, #5 Exhibit 13, #6 Exhibit 14)(Dacus, Deron)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 104 SEALED SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY to Response to Motion re #24 SEALED MOTION TO TRANSFER filed by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 9, #3 Exhibit 10, #4 Exhibit 11, #5 Exhibit 12, #6 Exhibit 13)(Dacus, Deron)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ***FILED IN ERROR***SEALED SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY to Response to Motion re #24 SEALED MOTION TO TRANSFER filed by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Dacus, Deron) Modified on 6/7/2021 (ch, ).
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ***FILED IN ERROR***REDACTION to #100 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,, by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Chivvis, #2 Exhibit P, #3 Exhibit Q)(Smith, Melissa) Modified on 6/8/2021 (ch, ).
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ***FILED IN ERROR***REDACTION to #99 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion, by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Chivvis)(Smith, Melissa) Modified on 6/8/2021 (ch, ).
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 SEALED PATENT SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #24 SEALED MOTION TO TRANSFER filed by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Chivvis, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 SEALED PATENT SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #22 SEALED MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION AND LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION filed by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Chivvis, #2 Exhibit 30, #3 Exhibit 31, #4 Exhibit 32, #5 Exhibit 33, #6 Exhibit 34, #7 Exhibit 35, #8 Exhibit 36, #9 Exhibit 37, #10 Exhibit 38, #11 Exhibit 39, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 RESPONSE in Opposition re #94 MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Chivvis, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 NOTICE by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd. Notice of Compliance of Service of P.R. 4-2 Preliminary Claim Constructions (Mann, James)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 NOTICE by Seagen Inc. of Compliance Regarding P.R. 4-2 (Smith, Melissa)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Hyun Kyu Christopher Han on behalf of Seagen Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8411321. (Han, Hyun)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Non-Party The University of Texas MD Anderson Cancer Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena Served on Non-Party UT MD Anderson Cancer Center, #2 Text of Proposed Order Protective Order, #3 Text of Proposed Order Order Quashing Subpoena)(Ross, Ted)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting #92 Motion to Withdraw #79 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.s Discovery Responses and Production. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/6/2021. (ch, )
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #79 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.s Discovery Responses and Production by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 NOTICE by Seagen Inc. REGARDING RELATED PROCEEDING (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Melissa)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting #88 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct SCHEDULE FOR VENUE AND JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY AND BRIEFING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO TRANSFER. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/4/2021. (ch, )
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 RESPONSE to Motion re #79 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.s Discovery Responses and Production filed by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Ratliff II, Preston)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct SCHEDULE FOR VENUE AND JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY AND BRIEFING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO TRANSFER by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 NOTICE by Seagen Inc. NOTICE OF UPDATED SUBPOENA TO THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS, M.D. ANDERSON CANCER CENTER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Melissa)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 NOTICE by Seagen Inc. of Compliance Regarding P.R. 4-1 (Smith, Melissa)
April 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 NOTICE by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd. Notice of Compliance of P.R. 4-1 (Mann, James)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 REDACTION to #79 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.s Discovery Responses and Production by Seagen Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 REDACTION to #77 Sealed PATENT Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion, by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Chivvis)(Smith, Melissa)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 REDACTION to #76 Sealed PATENT Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion by Seagen Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #58 MOTION to Compel Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.'s Discovery Responses and Production Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/19/2021. (ch, ) Modified on 4/23/2021 (ch, ).
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Unopposed MOTION for Hearing re #24 SEALED MOTION TO TRANSFER, #22 SEALED MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION AND LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ***WITHDRAWN PER #93***Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.s Discovery Responses and Production by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Underwood, James) Modified on 5/7/2021 (ch, ).
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Travis Underwood on behalf of Seagen Inc. (Underwood, James)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #22 SEALED MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION AND LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION filed by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Chivvis, #2 Exhibit 28, #3 Exhibit 29)(Smith, Melissa)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #24 SEALED MOTION TO TRANSFER filed by Seagen Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 REDACTION to #67 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,,, by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Chivvis)(Smith, Melissa)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 REDACTION to #66 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,,, by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Chivvis)(Smith, Melissa)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 REDACTION to #69 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion, by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 6)(Dacus, Deron)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 REDACTION to #70 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion, by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit 5, #4 Exhibit 8)(Dacus, Deron)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Unopposed MOTION for Hearing re #58 MOTION to Compel Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.'s Discovery Responses and Production by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #24 SEALED MOTION TO TRANSFER filed by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Dacus, Deron)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #22 SEALED MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION AND LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION filed by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9)(Dacus, Deron)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTICE by Seagen Inc. NOTICE OF SUBPOENAS TO ASD SPECIALTY HEALTHCARE, LLC AND TO THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS, M.D. ANDERSON CANCER CENTER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Smith, Melissa)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #22 SEALED MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION AND LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION filed by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Chivvis, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25 Part 1, #27 Exhibit 25 Part 2, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #24 SEALED MOTION TO TRANSFER filed by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Chivvis, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Affidavit Simpson, #41 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/16/2021. (ch, )
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Joint MOTION FOR ENTRY OF UNOPPOSED ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd. Notice of Compliance Regarding Service of Invalidity Contentions on Plaintiff (Mann, James)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 REDACTION to #60 Sealed Response to Motion to Compel Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.'s Discovery Responses and Production by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ratliff II, Preston)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #59 Motion to Expedite Briefing. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/26/2021. (ch, )
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #58 MOTION to Compel Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.'s Discovery Responses and Production filed by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ratliff II, Preston)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Agreed MOTION to Expedite Briefing by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Fair, Andrea)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MOTION to Compel Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.'s Discovery Responses and Production by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpts, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Fair, Andrea)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Janet S Kim on behalf of Seagen Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8253770. (Kim, Janet)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Teresa Angela MacLean on behalf of Seagen Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8253765. (MacLean, Teresa)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/12/21. (ch, )
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd. Notice of Compliance Regarding Service of Initial and Additional Disclosures on Plaintiff (Mann, James)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Seagen Inc. Regarding Initial and Additional Disclosures (Smith, Melissa)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Joint MOTION FOR ENTRY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER [OPPOSED IN PART] by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/9/2021. (ch, )
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #47 Unopposed MOTION FOR ENTRY OF UNOPPOSED SCHEDULE TO GOVERN DISCOVERY AND BRIEFING PERTAINING TO JURISDICTION AND VENUE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/9/2021. (ch, )
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Michael A Jacobs on behalf of Seagen Inc. (Jacobs, Michael)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER granting #45 Joint MOTION FOR ENTRY OF UNOPPOSED PROPOSED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Pretrial Conference set for 2/28/2022 09:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Amended Pleadings due by 6/11/2021., Jury Selection set for 4/4/2022 09:00AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Markman Hearing set for 8/27/2021 09:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Motions due by 2/7/2022., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/22/2022. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/8/2021. (ch, )
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Unopposed MOTION FOR ENTRY OF UNOPPOSED SCHEDULE TO GOVERN DISCOVERY AND BRIEFING PERTAINING TO JURISDICTION AND VENUE by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Joint MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DISCOVERY ORDER [OPPOSED IN PART] by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Joint MOTION FOR ENTRY OF UNOPPOSED PROPOSED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #42 Motion to Withdraw Designation as Lead Counsel. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/2/2021. (nkl, )
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Designation as Lead Counsel by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
January 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #41 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #22 SEALED MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION AND LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION, #24 SEALED MOTION TO TRANSFER Responses due by 2/10/2021. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/31/2021. (ch, )
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #24 SEALED MOTION TO TRANSFER, #22 SEALED MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION AND LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd. of Second Post-Grant Review Petition (Dacus, Deron)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #38 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #22 SEALED MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION AND LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION, #24 SEALED MOTION TO TRANSFER Responses due by 2/3/2021. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/22/2021. (ch, )
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Scheduling Conference held on 1/20/2021. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to a trial before the United States Magistrate Judge. The Court then gave the parties Markman and Jury Selection dates. (Court Reporter Susan Zielie, RMR, FCRR.) (aeb)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #24 SEALED MOTION TO TRANSFER, #22 SEALED MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION AND LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph M O'Malley, Jr on behalf of Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd. (O'Malley, Joseph)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Ashley Mays-Williams on behalf of Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8195217. (Mays-Williams, Ashley)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey A. Pade on behalf of Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8195015. (Pade, Jeffrey)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Isaac S Ashkenazi on behalf of Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8194970. (Ashkenazi, Isaac)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 REDACTION to #24 SEALED MOTION TO TRANSFER by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration - Miki, #2 Declaration - Switzer, #3 Declaration - Smith, #4 Declaration - Bucci, #5 Declaration - Ratliff, #6 Exhibit 1, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 REDACTION to #22 SEALED MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION AND LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Seal; granting #27 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/7/2021. (ch, )
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shannon Marie Dacus on behalf of Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd. (Dacus, Shannon)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE by Seagen Inc. of Compliance Regarding P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 (Smith, Melissa)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Preston K Ratliff II on behalf of Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd. (Ratliff II, Preston)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Motion to Transfer (Dkt. 24) by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 22) by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 23 submitted NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, )
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 21 submitted NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, )
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd. (Dacus, Deron)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SEALED MOTION TO TRANSFER by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration - Miki, #2 Declaration - Switzer, #3 Declaration - Smith, #4 Declaration - Bucci, #5 Declaration - Ratliff, #6 Exhibit 1, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT***Unopposed MOTION to Seal MOTION TO TRANSFER by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) Modified on 1/6/2021 (ch, ).
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SEALED MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION AND LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT***Unopposed MOTION to Seal MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION AND LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) Modified on 1/6/2021 (ch, ).
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Mark Mann on behalf of Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd. (Mann, James)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Blake Thompson on behalf of Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd. (Thompson, Gregory)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deron R Dacus on behalf of Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd. (Dacus, Deron)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE by Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd. Notice of Post-Grant Review Petition (Dacus, Deron)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 1/20/2021 09:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/22/2020. (ch, )
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 13 Summons Returned Executed AND TO SUBSTITUTE WAIVER OF SERVICE FORM. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/23/2020. (ch, )
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd. to 1/5/2021. (ch, )
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #13 Summons Returned Executed AND TO SUBSTITUTE WAIVER OF SERVICE FORM by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ***WITHDRAWN PER ORDER #15***SUMMONS Returned Executed by Seagen Inc.. Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd. served on 10/22/2020, answer due 11/12/2020. (Smith, Melissa) Modified on 11/23/2020 (ch, ).
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Pieter de Ganon on behalf of Seagen Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8066475. (de Ganon, Pieter)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew A Chivvis on behalf of Seagen Inc. (Chivvis, Matthew)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bryan Joseph Wilson on behalf of Seagen Inc. (Wilson, Bryan)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael A Jacobs on behalf of Seagen Inc. (Jacobs, Michael)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Seagen Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Seagen Inc. (Smith, Melissa)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Smith, Melissa)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Everingham, IV on behalf of Seagen Inc. (Everingham, Charles)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward, Jr on behalf of Seagen Inc. (Ward, Thomas)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea Leigh Fair on behalf of Seagen Inc. (Fair, Andrea)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.. (ch, )
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-8061761.), filed by Seagen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seagen Inc. v. Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daiichi Sankyo Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Preston K. Ratliff II
Represented By: Alexandra J. Cho
Represented By: Amanda L. Pober
Represented By: Ariell Bratton
Represented By: Ashley Mays-Williams
Represented By: Dana Weir
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Garrett J Schuman
Represented By: Gregory Blake Thompson
Represented By: Isaac S Ashkenazi
Represented By: Jacob A. Silvers
Represented By: James Mark Mann
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Pade
Represented By: Jessica M Stauring
Represented By: Joseph M O'Malley, Jr.
Represented By: Junxiao Huang
Represented By: Justin T Fleischacker
Represented By: Kevin P. Broughel
Represented By: Kyotaro Ozawa
Represented By: Lucas L Kressel
Represented By: Michael J Fisher
Represented By: Michelle Marek Figueiredo
Represented By: Nicholas Lane Evoy
Represented By: Shannon Marie Dacus
Represented By: Susan S. Hwang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seagen Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Andrea Leigh Fair
Represented By: Thomas John Ward, Jr
Represented By: Charles Everingham, IV
Represented By: Bryan Joseph Wilson
Represented By: Michael A Jacobs
Represented By: Pieter de Ganon
Represented By: Matthew A Chivvis
Represented By: Andrew Thompson (Tom) Gorham
Represented By: Evelyn Li-Jin Chang
Represented By: Harry Lee Gillam, Jr
Represented By: Hyun Kyu Christopher Han
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Represented By: Sumaiya Sharmeen
Represented By: Teresa Angela MacLean
Represented By: James Travis Underwood
Represented By: Janet S Kim
Represented By: Jayson L Cohen
Represented By: Johnny Ward, Jr
Represented By: Karl M Johnston
Represented By: Matthew I Kreeger
Represented By: Sean Kang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: David Folsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Shane A Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP
Represented By: Thomas S Fletcher
Represented By: David I Berl
Represented By: Andrew Hoffman
Represented By: Angela X Gao
Represented By: Jennifer Parker Ainsworth
Represented By: Jessamyn Berniker
Represented By: Jessica L Pahl
Represented By: Kathryn S Kayali
Represented By: Kevin D Hoagland-Hanson
Represented By: Matthew T Milam
Represented By: Nicholas Lane Evoy
Represented By: Nicholas W. Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: AstraZeneca UK Limited
Represented By: David I Berl
Represented By: Andrew Hoffman
Represented By: Angela X Gao
Represented By: Jennifer Parker Ainsworth
Represented By: Jessamyn Berniker
Represented By: Jessica L Pahl
Represented By: Kathryn S Kayali
Represented By: Kevin D Hoagland-Hanson
Represented By: Matthew T Milam
Represented By: Nicholas Lane Evoy
Represented By: Nicholas W. Jordan
Represented By: Thomas S Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Non-Party The University of Texas MD Anderson Cancer Center
Represented By: Ted Anthony Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?