Solas OLED Ltd. v. Samsung Display Co., Ltd.
Plaintiff: Solas OLED Ltd.
Defendant: Samsung Display Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc. and Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00104
Filed: March 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2021 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Samsung Display Co., Ltd. to 8/30/2021; Samsung Electronics America, Inc. to 8/30/2021; Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. to 8/30/2021. (nkl, )
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/20/2021. (nkl, )
May 13, 2021 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT AND WAIVER OF FOREIGN SERVICE REQUIREMENT by Samsung Display Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
May 13, 2021 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 13, Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT AND WAIVER OF FOREIGN SERVICE REQUIREMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
May 13, 2021 Filing 13 FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT AND WAIVER OF FOREIGN SERVICE REQUIREMENT by Samsung Display Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) Modified on 5/13/2021 (nkl, ).
May 12, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Solas OLED Ltd.. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. served on 5/11/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. (Mirzaie, Reza)
April 8, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Issued as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.)(nkl, )
April 6, 2021 Filing 10 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mirzaie, Reza)
April 6, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Solas OLED Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Summons(es), #5 Summons(es))(Mirzaie, Reza)
March 23, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued as to Samsung Display Co., Ltd.. (nkl, )
March 23, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )
March 23, 2021 Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, )
March 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Shrin Tsuei on behalf of Solas OLED Ltd. (Tsuei, James)
March 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Neil Alan Rubin on behalf of Solas OLED Ltd. (Rubin, Neil)
March 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marc A Fenster on behalf of Solas OLED Ltd. (Fenster, Marc)
March 22, 2021 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Solas OLED Ltd.. (Mirzaie, Reza)
March 22, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mirzaie, Reza)
March 22, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Solas OLED Ltd. (Mirzaie, Reza)
March 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Samsung Display Co., Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8311784.), filed by Solas OLED Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons(es))(Mirzaie, Reza)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solas OLED Ltd. v. Samsung Display Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Display Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Solas OLED Ltd.
Represented By: James Shrin Tsuei
Represented By: Neil Alan Rubin
Represented By: Reza Mirzaie
Represented By: Marc A Fenster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?