McKinney v. Vilsack et al
Plaintiff: Jarrod McKinney
Defendant: Thomas J Vilsack and Zach Ducheneaux
Amicus Curiae: National Black Farmers Association and Association of American Indian Farmers
Case Number: 2:2021cv00212
Filed: June 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Referring Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2021 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Jarrod McKinney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order, Holman v Vilsack, #2 Exhibit 2 - Joint Report, Miller v Vilsack, #3 Text of Proposed Order denying Motion for Stay)(Fa, Wencong)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Stay and Defendants' Answer (Time Sensitive). Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 7/26/2021. (nkl, )
July 22, 2021 Filing 30 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Stay and Defendants' Answer (Time Sensitive) by Jarrod McKinney. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fa, Wencong)
July 16, 2021 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Jarrod McKinney. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Denying Motion)(Fa, Wencong)
July 15, 2021 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #25 MOTION to Stay (Administrative) (TIME SENSITIVE) filed by Zach Ducheneaux, Thomas J Vilsack. (Knapp, Michael)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER re #25 MOTION to Stay (Administrative) (TIME SENSITIVE) filed by Zach Ducheneaux, Thomas J Vilsack. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 7/13/2021. (nkl, )
July 13, 2021 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #25 MOTION to Stay (Administrative) (TIME SENSITIVE) filed by Jarrod McKinney. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fa, Wencong)
July 12, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION to Stay (Administrative) (TIME SENSITIVE) by Zach Ducheneaux, Thomas J Vilsack. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Primary), #2 Text of Proposed Order (Alternative))(Knapp, Michael)
July 12, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Zach Ducheneaux, Thomas J Vilsack. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Miller Order, #2 Exhibit B - Faust Order, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Knapp, Michael)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Responses due by 7/13/2021 Replies due by 7/27/2021.. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 7/8/2021. (nkl, )
July 6, 2021 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene Conditionally and MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Association of American Indian Farmers, National Black Farmers Association. (Attachments: #1 Exh. 1 - J. Boyd Decl., #2 Exh. 2 - K. Boyd Decl., #3 Exh. 3 - I. Williams Decl., #4 Exh. 4 - S. Lewis Decl., #5 Proposed Answer)(Chen, Randolph)
July 6, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jessica L Culpepper on behalf of Association of American Indian Farmers, National Black Farmers Association. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8482101. (Culpepper, Jessica)
July 6, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by David S Muraskin on behalf of Association of American Indian Farmers, National Black Farmers Association. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8482087. (Muraskin, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/6/2021: #1 Sealed Attachment) (nkl, ).
July 6, 2021 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply submitted document #18 does not contain a Certificate of Conference. Correction should be made by one business day.(nkl, )
July 2, 2021 Filing 19 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (CORRECTED) by Zach Ducheneaux, Thomas J Vilsack. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Knapp, Michael)
July 2, 2021 Filing 18 DEFICIENT DOCUMENT Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Zach Ducheneaux, Thomas J Vilsack. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Knapp, Michael) Modified on 7/6/2021 (nkl, ).
July 2, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE by Association of American Indian Farmers, National Black Farmers Association re #16 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction - Amicus Curiae Brief (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. 1 - J. Boyd Decl., #2 Exhibit Exh. 2 - K. Boyd Decl., #3 Exhibit Exh. 3 - I. Williams Decl., #4 Exhibit Exh. 4 - S. Lewis Decl.)(Chen, Randolph)
July 2, 2021 Filing 16 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Association of American Indian Farmers, National Black Farmers Association. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief)(Chen, Randolph)
July 2, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Randolph T Chen on behalf of National Black Farmers Association, Association of American Indian Farmers. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8480466. (Chen, Randolph)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Substitute LeadAttorney. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 6/24/2021. (ch, )
June 22, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Michael F Knapp on behalf of Zach Ducheneaux, Thomas J Vilsack. (nkl, )
June 21, 2021 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Lead Attorney by Jarrod McKinney. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fa, Wencong)
June 18, 2021 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Declaration of Jarrod McKinney, Exhibit 1, and Proposed Order by certified mail, served on Thomas Vilsack, Zach Ducheneaux, Merrick Garland, and Nicholas Ganjei on 6/18/2021, filed by Jarrod McKinney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Mail Receipts)(Fa, Wencong)
June 17, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Jarrod McKinney. (Fa, Wencong)
June 17, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Jarrod McKinney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Decision Granting TRO, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Fa, Wencong)
June 16, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jarrod McKinney. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Mail Receipts)(Fa, Wencong)
June 15, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Glenn E Roper on behalf of Jarrod McKinney. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8455962. (Roper, Glenn)
June 14, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Wencong Fa on behalf of Jarrod McKinney. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8453670. (Fa, Wencong)
June 14, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Christopher M. Kieser on behalf of Jarrod McKinney. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8453633. (Kieser, Christopher)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Rodney Gilstrap recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/11/2021. (ch, )
June 10, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by Jarrod McKinney of Related Cases in other Districts (Thompson, Joshua)
June 10, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Zach Ducheneaux, Thomas J Vilsack. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) Zach Ducheneaux)(nkl, )
June 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8449551.), filed by Jarrod McKinney. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Thompson, Joshua)
June 10, 2021 Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, )
June 10, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKinney v. Vilsack et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarrod McKinney
Represented By: Joshua Paul Thompson
Represented By: Wencong Fa
Represented By: Christopher M. Kieser
Represented By: Glenn E Roper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J Vilsack
Represented By: Michael F Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zach Ducheneaux
Represented By: Michael F Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Black Farmers Association
Represented By: Randolph T Chen
Represented By: David S Muraskin
Represented By: Jessica L Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Association of American Indian Farmers
Represented By: Randolph T Chen
Represented By: David S Muraskin
Represented By: Jessica L Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?