Estech Systems IP, LLC v. Mitel Networks, Inc.
Plaintiff: Estech Systems IP, LLC
Defendant: Mitel Networks, Inc.
Consolidated Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Fiserv, Inc., Fiserv Solutions, LLC, Randstad US LLC, Randstad Professionals US LLC, Marriott International, Inc., Primoris Services Corporation, Primoris Design & Construction, Inc., SoFi Technologies, Inc., SoFi Mortgage, LLC, The Charles Schwab Corporation, BMW of North America, LLC, Petco Health and Wellness Company, Inc., Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Petco Animal Supplies Store. Inc., First American Financial Corporation and Republic Title of Texas, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00473
Filed: December 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Referring Judge: Roy S Payne
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2022 Filing 38 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nathan Robert Curtis on behalf of Petco Animal Supplies Store. Inc., Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Petco Health and Wellness Company, Inc. (Curtis, Nathan)
March 2, 2022 Filing 37 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Parth H Matalia on behalf of Randstad Professionals US LLC, Randstad US LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8813125. (Matalia, Parth)
March 2, 2022 Filing 36 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Laura M Kanouse on behalf of Randstad Professionals US LLC, Randstad US LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8813115. (Kanouse, Laura)
March 2, 2022 Filing 35 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan K Walsh on behalf of Randstad Professionals US LLC, Randstad US LLC (Walsh, Ryan)
February 28, 2022 Filing 34 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Mitel Networks, Inc. (Smith, Melissa)
February 28, 2022 Filing 33 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(c) by Mitel Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit B. Weed, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit A-1, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
February 28, 2022 Filing 32 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by First American Financial Corporation, Republic Title of Texas, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
February 28, 2022 Filing 31 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Republic Title of Texas, Inc. (Smith, Melissa)
February 28, 2022 Filing 30 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by First American Financial Corporation (Smith, Melissa)
February 28, 2022 Filing 29 ANSWER to Complaint AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, COUNTERCLAIM against Estech Systems IP, LLC by First American Financial Corporation, Republic Title of Texas, Inc..(Smith, Melissa)
February 28, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Benjamin E Weed on behalf of First American Financial Corporation, Republic Title of Texas, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8807954. (Weed, Benjamin)
February 28, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Gina A. Johnson on behalf of First American Financial Corporation, Republic Title of Texas, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8807932. (Johnson, Gina)
February 24, 2022 Filing 26 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re The Charles Schwab Corporation.( Clements, Janis)
February 24, 2022 Defendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for The Charles Schwab Corporation to 3/16/2022. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
February 22, 2022 Defendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Petco Health and Wellness Company, Inc. to 3/15/2022. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
February 22, 2022 Defendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Petco Animal Supplies, Inc. to 3/15/2022. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
February 22, 2022 Defendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Petco Animal Supplies Store. Inc. to 3/15/2022. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
February 22, 2022 Defendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Fiserv Solutions, LLC to 3/15/2022; Fiserv, Inc. to 3/15/2022. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
February 21, 2022 Filing 25 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Fiserv Solutions, LLC, Fiserv, Inc..( Ravel, J)
February 18, 2022 Filing 24 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Petco Animal Supplies, Inc..( Buroker, Brian)
February 18, 2022 Filing 23 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Petco Animal Supplies Store. Inc..( Buroker, Brian)
February 18, 2022 Filing 22 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Petco Health and Wellness Company, Inc..( Buroker, Brian)
February 18, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Brinn Hall on behalf of Primoris Design & Construction, Inc., Primoris Services Corporation (Hall, Eric)
February 18, 2022 Filing 20 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re SoFi Technologies, Inc. (Findlay, Eric)
February 18, 2022 Filing 19 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Primoris Design & Construction, Inc., Primoris Services Corporation.(Findlay, Eric)
February 18, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Anthony David Brzozowski, II on behalf of Petco Animal Supplies Store. Inc., Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Petco Health and Wellness Company, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8795534. (Brzozowski, Anthony)
February 18, 2022 Defendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for SoFi Technologies, Inc. to 3/14/2022. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
February 18, 2022 Defendant's Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Primoris Design & Construction, Inc. to 3/14/2022; Primoris Services Corporation to 3/14/2022. SECOND Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
February 17, 2022 Filing 17 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Randstad Professionals US LLC, Randstad US LLC.(Hill, Jack)
February 17, 2022 Filing 16 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Marriott International, Inc..( Smith, Melissa)
February 17, 2022 Filing 15 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re BMW of North America, LLC.( Green, Eric)
February 17, 2022 Defendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Randstad US LLC to 3/15/2022; Randstad Professionals US LLC to 3/15/2022. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
February 17, 2022 Defendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for BMW of North America, LLC to 3/13/2022. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
February 17, 2022 Defendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Marriott International, Inc. to 3/12/2022. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
February 16, 2022 Filing 14 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Abbott Laboratories.(Findlay, Eric)
February 16, 2022 Defendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Abbott Laboratories to 3/10/2022. 12 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
February 15, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Randstad Professionals US LLC, Randstad US LLC (Hill, Jack)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 3/16/2022 02:00 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/16/2022. (ch, )
February 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned case is hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues with the LEAD CASE, Case No. 2:21-cv-00473. All parties are instructed to file any future filings in the LEAD CASE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/12/2022. (ch, )
January 14, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Benjamin E Weed on behalf of Mitel Networks, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8747204. (Weed, Benjamin)
January 14, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Gina A. Johnson on behalf of Mitel Networks, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8747198. (Johnson, Gina)
January 14, 2022 Filing 8 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Mitel Networks, Inc..( Smith, Melissa)
January 14, 2022 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Mitel Networks, Inc. to 2/26/2022. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
January 12, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Todd Eric Landis on behalf of Estech Systems IP, LLC (Landis, Todd)
January 12, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Wittenzellner on behalf of Estech Systems IP, LLC (Wittenzellner, John)
January 10, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Simons on behalf of Estech Systems IP, LLC (Simons, Michael)
January 3, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Mitel Networks, Inc.. (ch, )
January 3, 2022 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
January 3, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, )
December 30, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Estech Systems IP, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Estech Systems, Inc. for Estech Systems IP, LLC. (Williams, Fred)
December 30, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Williams, Fred)
December 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Mitel Networks, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8727164.), filed by Estech Systems IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Williams, Fred)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estech Systems IP, LLC v. Mitel Networks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estech Systems IP, LLC
Represented By: Fred Irvin Williams
Represented By: John Wittenzellner
Represented By: Michael Simons
Represented By: Todd Eric Landis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitel Networks, Inc.
Represented By: Gina A. Johnson
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Benjamin E Weed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Fiserv, Inc.
Represented By: J Stephen Ravel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Fiserv Solutions, LLC
Represented By: J Stephen Ravel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Randstad US LLC
Represented By: Ryan K Walsh
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Randstad Professionals US LLC
Represented By: Ryan K Walsh
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Marriott International, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Primoris Services Corporation
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Represented By: Eric Brinn Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Primoris Design & Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Represented By: Eric Brinn Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: SoFi Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: SoFi Mortgage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: The Charles Schwab Corporation
Represented By: Scott J Bornstein
Represented By: Elana Beth Araj
Represented By: Janis E Clements
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: BMW of North America, LLC
Represented By: Eric Conley Green
Represented By: Richard S Zembek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Petco Health and Wellness Company, Inc.
Represented By: Brian M Buroker
Represented By: Anthony David Brzozowski, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Petco Animal Supplies, Inc.
Represented By: Brian M Buroker
Represented By: Anthony David Brzozowski, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Petco Animal Supplies Store. Inc.
Represented By: Brian M Buroker
Represented By: Anthony David Brzozowski, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: First American Financial Corporation
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Republic Title of Texas, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?