Davis et al v. Kaeser Compressors, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ezekiel "Zeke&quot Davis and Megan Davis
Defendant: Kaeser Compressors, Inc. and PLUMETTAZ AMERICA, CORP.
Case Number: 2:2022cv00058
Filed: February 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Kaeser Compressors, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Kaeser Kompressoren for Kaeser Compressors, Inc.. (Alexander, Hylmar)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, PROPOSED DEADLINES FOR DOCKET CONTROL ORDER AND DISCOVERY ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 5/18/2022 02:30 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/14/2022. (nkl, )
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Edward Johnson, II on behalf of PLUMETTAZ AMERICA, CORP. (Johnson, Joseph)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gerardo Adrian Galvan on behalf of PLUMETTAZ AMERICA, CORP. (Galvan, Gerardo)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Its Manufacturing Defect Claim Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. Kaeser Compressors Inc DISMISSED-WITHOUT-PREJUDICE.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/12/2022. (ch, )
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Subject to its Motion to Dismiss Design Defect, Manufacturing Defect, and Marketing Defect Claims Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. 12B6 by PLUMETTAZ AMERICA, CORP..(Mayer, Zachary)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Design Defect, Manufacturing Defect, and Marketing Defect Claims Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12B6 by PLUMETTAZ AMERICA, CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Plumettaz America, Corp.'s Motion to Dismiss Design Defect, Manufacturing Defect, and Marketing Defect Claims Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12B6)(Mayer, Zachary)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Stipulation to Extend Plumettaz America Corp Deadline to file Responsive Pleading. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/11/2022. (ch, )
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Its Manufacturing Defect Claim Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) by Kaeser Compressors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Alexander, Hylmar)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION to Extend Defendant Plumettaz America, Corp's Deadline to File Responsive Pleadings by PLUMETTAZ AMERICA, CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Stipulation to Extend Defendant Plumettaz America, Corp.'s Deadline to File Responsive Pleadings)(Mayer, Zachary)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Subject to Motion to Dismiss Manufacturing Defect Claim pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by Kaeser Compressors, Inc..(Alexander, Hylmar)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Manufacturing Defect Claim Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by Kaeser Compressors, Inc.. (Alexander, Hylmar) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/18/2022: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ezekiel "Zeke" Davis, Megan Davis. Kaeser Compressors, Inc. served on 3/3/2022, answer due 3/24/2022. (Sloan, John)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ezekiel "Zeke" Davis, Megan Davis. PLUMETTAZ AMERICA, CORP. served on 2/28/2022, answer due 3/21/2022. (Sloan, John)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Kaeser Compressors, Inc., PLUMETTAZ AMERICA, CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) KAESER COMPRESSORS, INC.)(nkl, )
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8798330.), filed by Ezekiel "Zeke" Davis, Megan Davis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sloan, John)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, )
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis et al v. Kaeser Compressors, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ezekiel "Zeke&quot Davis
Represented By: John Dale Sloan, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Davis
Represented By: John Dale Sloan, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaeser Compressors, Inc.
Represented By: Hylmar Scott Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLUMETTAZ AMERICA, CORP.
Represented By: Zachary Thomas Mayer
Represented By: Gerardo Adrian Galvan
Represented By: Joseph Edward Johnson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?