Christie et al v. Hankook Tire America Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Lee-Snow Christie and Allison LeeAnne Brennan
Defendant: Hankook Tire America Corporation, Hankook Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Hankook Tire Worldwide, Ltd., Hankook Tire Mfg. Co., Ltd.Daejeon Plant, Hankook Tire Company, Ltd., Hankook Tire Mfg. Co., Ltd., Hankook Tire Manufacturing Tennessee LP, Silver MetalX, Inc., Synergies Castings USA, LLC., Precision Castings, LLC., Hankook Tire & Technology Co., Ltd., Hankook Technology Group Co., Ltd., Hankook Tire Worldwide Company, Ltd., Silver MetalX agent of d/b/a SMX, Silver MetalX agent of d/b/a SMX-Wheels, Precision Castings, Inc., Dicastal North America, Inc., Sanmenxia Dicastal Wheel Manufacturing Co., Ltd. doing business as Sanmenxia Dicastal, Citic Dicastal Co., Ltd., Sanmenxia Dicastal Wheel Manufacturing Co Ltd and Synergies Castings USA, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv00067
Filed: March 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Referring Judge: Roy S Payne
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2022 Filing 18 SUMMONS Issued as to Precision Castings, Inc., Precision Castings, LLC., Silver MetalX, Silver MetalX, Inc., Synergies Castings USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es), #3 Summons(es), #4 Summons(es))(ch, )
April 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File 2nd Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/24/2022. (ch, )
April 21, 2022 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Allison LeeAnne Brennan, Joshua Lee-Snow Christie.(Wigington, Jeffrey)
April 21, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS Issued as to Dicastal North America, Inc.. (ch, )
April 21, 2022 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended against All Defendants, filed by Allison LeeAnne Brennan, Joshua Lee-Snow Christie.(Wigington, Jeffrey)
April 21, 2022 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File 2nd Amended Complaint by Allison LeeAnne Brennan, Joshua Lee-Snow Christie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A Motion for Leave, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Wigington, Jeffrey) Modified on 4/21/2022 (ch, ). Modified on 4/21/2022 (ch, ).
April 21, 2022 ***DISREGARD NOTICE OF DEFICIENTY** of Deficiency regarding the 13 submitted NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, ) Modified on 4/21/2022 (ch, ).
April 11, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Issued as to Precision Castings, Inc.. (ch, )
April 11, 2022 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
April 8, 2022 Filing 11 HANKOOK TIRE AMERICA CORPORATION'S ORIGINAL ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint, by Hankook Tire America Corporation.(Taylor, Raphael)
April 7, 2022 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiffs' First against Hankook Tire & Technology Co., Ltd., Hankook Tire America Corporation, Silver MetalX, Silver MetalX, Inc., Synergies Castings USA, LLC., Precision Castings, Inc., filed by Allison LeeAnne Brennan, Joshua Lee-Snow Christie.(Evans, Ross)
April 1, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tamer Tarek Abouras on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Abouras, Tamer)
March 31, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M Raymond Hatcher, II on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hatcher, M)
March 28, 2022 Filing 7 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Hankook Tire America Corporation.( Trent, T)
March 28, 2022 Filing 6 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Hankook Tire Manufacturing Tennessee LP.( Trent, T)
March 28, 2022 Filing 5 ***FILED IN ERROR***SUMMONS Issued as to Precision Castings, LLC.. (ch, ) Modified on 3/28/2022 (ch, ).
March 28, 2022 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Hankook Tire Manufacturing Tennessee LP to 4/8/2022. 10 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
March 28, 2022 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Hankook Tire America Corporation to 4/8/2022. 10 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
March 28, 2022 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 5, Summons Issued Precision Casting Inc. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
March 10, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Julian C Gomez on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8823193. (Gomez, Julian)
March 8, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Precision Castings, LLC. c/o its Chief Executive Officer, Mr. Murali Chirala (ch, )
March 8, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Hankook Tire America Corporation, Hankook Tire Manufacturing Tennessee LP, Precision Castings, LLC., Silver MetalX, Silver MetalX, Inc., Synergies Castings USA, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es), #3 Summons(es), #4 Summons(es), #5 Summons(es), #6 Summons(es))(ch, )
March 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8819133.), filed by Allison LeeAnne Brennan, Joshua Lee-Snow Christie. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wigington, Jeffrey)
March 7, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, )
March 7, 2022 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christie et al v. Hankook Tire America Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Lee-Snow Christie
Represented By: Jeffrey Glenn Wigington
Represented By: Julian C Gomez
Represented By: M Raymond Hatcher, II
Represented By: Tamer Tarek Abouras
Represented By: Ross William Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison LeeAnne Brennan
Represented By: Jeffrey Glenn Wigington
Represented By: Julian C Gomez
Represented By: M Raymond Hatcher, II
Represented By: Tamer Tarek Abouras
Represented By: Ross William Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hankook Tire America Corporation
Represented By: Raphael Charles Taylor
Represented By: T Christopher Trent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hankook Manufacturing Company, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hankook Tire Worldwide, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hankook Tire Mfg. Co., Ltd.Daejeon Plant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hankook Tire Company, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hankook Tire Mfg. Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hankook Tire Manufacturing Tennessee LP
Represented By: T Christopher Trent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silver MetalX, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synergies Castings USA, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precision Castings, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hankook Tire & Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hankook Technology Group Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hankook Tire Worldwide Company, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silver MetalX agent of d/b/a SMX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silver MetalX agent of d/b/a SMX-Wheels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precision Castings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dicastal North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanmenxia Dicastal Wheel Manufacturing Co., Ltd. doing business as Sanmenxia Dicastal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citic Dicastal Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanmenxia Dicastal Wheel Manufacturing Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synergies Castings USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?