Arigna Technology Limited v. Nissan Motor Company, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Arigna Technology Limited
Defendant: Nissan Motor Company, Ltd., Nissan North America, Inc., Tesla, Inc., Tesla Motors TX, Inc., Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor North America, Inc., General Motors LLC, ADC Automotive Distance Control Systems GmbH, Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH and Continental AG
Case Number: 2:2022cv00126
Filed: April 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Referring Judge: Roy S Payne
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 81 NOTICE by Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor North America, Inc. re #69 Order (Gray, Tonya)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 REDACTION to #68 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike Defendants' Untimely Marking Theory by Arigna Technology Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Danielle Nicholson, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9 Volume 1, #11 Exhibit 9 Volume 2, #12 Exhibit 9 Volume 3, #13 Exhibit 9 Volume 4, #14 Exhibit 10, #15 Exhibit 11, #16 Exhibit 12, #17 Exhibit 13, #18 Exhibit 14, #19 Exhibit 15, #20 Exhibit 16, #21 Text of Proposed Order)(Berry, Matthew)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY REDACTION to #68 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike Defendants' Untimely Marking Theory by Arigna Technology Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Danielle Nicholson, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9 V1, #11 Exhibit 9 V2, #12 Exhibit 9 V3, #13 Exhibit 9 V4, #14 Exhibit 10, #15 Exhibit 11, #16 Exhibit 12, #17 Exhibit 13, #18 Exhibit 14, #19 Exhibit 15, #20 Exhibit 16, #21 Text of Proposed Order)(Berry, Matthew) Modified on 6/24/2022 (nkl, ).
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 SEALED Opposition to Motion re #60 MOTION for Leave to Serve Subpoena on NXP USA, Inc. filed by Arigna Technology Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Andres Healy, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Berry, Matthew)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 79, REDACTION. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER - Status Conference set for 7/15/2022 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/22/2022. (nkl, )
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor North America, Inc. for proceedings held on June 21, 2022 before Judge Roy S. Payne. (Gray, Tonya) (Main Document 76 replaced with flattened version on 6/22/2022) (ljw, ).(Forwarded to Dipti Patel on 6/22/2022) (ljw, ).
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Nissan Motor Company, Ltd. for proceedings held on 06/21/2022 Telephonic Conference before Judge Roy S. Payne. (Smith, Melissa) (Forwarded to Dipti Patel on 6/22/2022) (ljw, ).
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by ADC Automotive Distance Control Systems GmbH, Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH, Continental AG for proceedings held on 6/21/22 Telephone Conference before Judge Hon. Roy S. Payne. (Blaszkowski, Christopher) (Main Document 74 replaced with flattened version on 6/22/2022) (ljw, ). (Forwarded to Dipti Patel on 6/22/2022) (ljw, ).
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Telephone Conference held on 6/21/2022. (bga)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #70 Motion to Enter the Amended Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/21/2022. (nkl, )
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 72 OBJECTION TO MEMORANDUM ORDER (DKT. 45) filed by ADC Automotive Distance Control Systems GmbH, Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH, Continental AG. (Blaszkowski, Christopher)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 REDACTION to #58 SEALED MOTION to Compel by Arigna Technology Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Andres Healy, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Berry, Matthew)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #49 Order, Partially Joint and Partially Unopposed Motion to Enter Amended Docket Control Order by ADC Automotive Distance Control Systems GmbH, Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH, Continental AG. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blaszkowski, Christopher)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER re #54 MOTION to Sever filed by Continental AG, ADC Automotive Distance Control Systems GmbH, Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/19/2022. (nkl, )
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR - was filed using the wrong docket event. Document # 64, MOTION to Compel. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct submitted document #65 does not contain a Certificate of Conference. Correction should be made by one business day. (nkl, )
June 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike Defendants' Untimely Marking Theory by Arigna Technology Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of D. Nicholson, #3 Exhibit 1 to Nicholson Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 to Nicholson Declaration, #5 Exhibit 3 to Nicholson Declaration, #6 Exhibit 4 to Nicholson Declaration, #7 Exhibit 5 to Nicholson Declaration, #8 Exhibit 6 to Nicholson Declaration, #9 Exhibit 7 to Nicholson Declaration, #10 Exhibit 8 to Nicholson Declaration, #11 Exhibit 9 to Nicholson Declaration, #12 Exhibit 10 to Nicholson Declaration, #13 Exhibit 11 to Nicholson Declaration, #14 Exhibit 12 to Nicholson Declaration, #15 Exhibit 13 to Nicholson Declaration, #16 Exhibit 14 to Nicholson Declaration, #17 Exhibit 15 to Nicholson Declaration, #18 Exhibit 16 to Nicholson Declaration)(Henry, Claire)
June 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting in part #62 Motion to Expedite, in that Plaintiff is directed to file its response by NOON on 6/24/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 06/19/2022. (no document attached) (Payne, Roy)
June 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #60 Motion for leave to serve a deposition subpoena. Defendant may proceed to serve the subpoena and schedule the deposition, but it shall not be taken until the Court rules on Plaintiff's objection to the deposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/19/2022. (no document attached) (Payne, Roy)
June 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 DEFICIENT DOCUMENT Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #49 Order, Partially Joint and Partially Unopposed Motion to Enter Amended Docket Control Order by ADC Automotive Distance Control Systems GmbH, Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH, Continental AG. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blaszkowski, Christopher) Modified on 6/21/2022 (nkl, ).
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 FILED IN ERROR MOTION to Compel by Arigna Technology Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Andres Healy, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Berry, Matthew) Modified on 6/21/2022 (nkl, ).
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 SEALED Exhibit B1 to #60 MOTION for Leave to Serve Subpoena on NXP USA, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B1)(Gray, Tonya)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Agreed MOTION to Expedite Briefing by Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gray, Tonya)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ***FILED IN ERROR***SEALED Exhibit B1 to #60 MOTION for Leave to Serve Subpoena on NXP USA, Inc. . (Gray, Tonya) Modified on 6/17/2022 (ch, ).
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION for Leave to Serve Subpoena on NXP USA, Inc. by Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit B1 (Slipsheet), #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Gray, Tonya)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. NEED COVER PAGE AND CERTIFICATES Document # 61, Sealed additional attachment. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Omowunmi Soyinka on behalf of Nissan Motor Company, Ltd., Nissan North America, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-8976321. (Soyinka, Omowunmi)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 SEALED MOTION to Compel by Arigna Technology Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Andres Healy, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Berry, Matthew)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor North America, Inc. for proceedings held on 6/10/2022 before Judge Hon. Roy S. Payne. (Gray, Tonya) (Main Document 57 replaced with flattened version on 6/14/2022) (ljw, ). (Forwarded to Shawn McRoberts on 6/14/2022)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor North America, Inc. for proceedings held on 6/8/2022 before Judge Hon. Roy S. Payne. (Gray, Tonya) (Main Document 56 replaced with flattened version on 6/14/2022) (ljw, ). (Forwarded to Shawn McRoberts on 6/14/2022)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Arigna Technology Limited for proceedings held on Telephonic Status Conference 6/8/2022 before Judge Roy S. Payne. (Berry, Matthew)(Forwarded to Shawn McRoberts on 6/14/2022)(ljw, ).
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MOTION to Sever by ADC Automotive Distance Control Systems GmbH, Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH, Continental AG. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher H. Blaszkowski, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Blaszkowski, Christopher)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Nissan Motor Company, Ltd. for proceedings held on 6-10-2022 Telephonic Status Conference before Judge Roy S. Payne. (Smith, Melissa) (Forwarded to Shawn McRoberts on 6/13/2022)(ljw, ).
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Nissan Motor Company, Ltd. for proceedings held on Telephonic Status Conference 6/8/2022 before Judge Roy S. Payne. (Smith, Melissa) (Forwarded to Shawn McRoberts on 6/13/2022) (ljw, ).
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Status Conference Proceedings held on 06/10/2022 before Judge Roy S. Payne. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shawn McRoberts,Telephone number: (903) 923-8546. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Motion to Redact due 7/4/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/11/2022. (smm, )
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Status Conference Proceedings held on 06/08/2022 before Judge Roy S. Payne. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shawn McRoberts,Telephone number: (903) 923-8546. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Motion to Redact due 7/4/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/11/2022. (smm, )
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER RE TO THE JUNE 10 TELECONFERENCE - ORDERS Continental to complete the production of its ESI no later than June 17, 2022. ORDERED that Continental is make available its 30(b)(6) representatives for depositions that are to occur on agreeable dates between June 23 and June 29 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/10/2022. (ch, )
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by ADC Automotive Distance Control Systems GmbH, Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH, Continental AG for proceedings held on 06/10/2022 Telephone Conference before Judge Hon. Roy S. Payne. (Blaszkowski, Christopher) (Main Document 48 replaced with flattened version on 6/10/2022) (ljw, ). (Forwarded to Shawn McRoberts on 6/10/2022) (ljw, ).
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by ADC Automotive Distance Control Systems GmbH, Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH, Continental AG for proceedings held on 06/08/2022 Telephone Conference before Judge Hon. Roy S. Payne. (Blaszkowski, Christopher) (Forwarded to Shawn McRoberts on 6/10/2022) (ljw, ).
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Telephone Conference held on 6/10/2022. (Court Reporter Shawn McRoberts.) (bga)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Telephone Conference held on 6/8/2022. (bga)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 6/10/2022 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE by ADC Automotive Distance Control Systems GmbH, Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH, Continental AG of Completed Briefing Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions (Heartfield, J)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMORANDUM ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 06/07/2022. (klc, )
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 6/8/2022 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Plaintiff's counsel is responsible for setting up the call.(bga)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 RESPONSE to #38 Objection to Claim Construction filed by ADC Automotive Distance Control Systems GmbH, Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH, Continental AG. (Blaszkowski, Christopher)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #34 Opposed SEALED MOTION For Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions filed by ADC Automotive Distance Control Systems GmbH, Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH, Continental AG. (Blaszkowski, Christopher)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 REDACTION to #41 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion by Arigna Technology Limited. (Berry, Matthew)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 SEALED REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS re #34 Opposed SEALED MOTION For Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions filed by Arigna Technology Limited. (Berry, Matthew)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE by Arigna Technology Limited JOINT NOTICE REGARDING PENDING MOTIONS AND MEDIATION (Berry, Matthew)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 RESPONSE in Opposition re #34 Opposed SEALED MOTION For Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions filed by ADC Automotive Distance Control Systems GmbH, Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH, Continental AG. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Koopman, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Blaszkowski, Christopher)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 OBJECTION TO CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPINION AND ORDER [DKT. 33] filed by Arigna Technology Limited. (Berry, Matthew)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 REDACTION to #34 Opposed SEALED MOTION For Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions by Arigna Technology Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Danielle Nicholson, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Text of Proposed Order)(Berry, Matthew)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #34 Unopposed Motion to Expedite Briefing on Plaintiffs Opposed Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/16/2022. (ch, )
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite Briefing by Arigna Technology Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berry, Matthew)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Opposed SEALED MOTION For Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions by Arigna Technology Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit D. Nicholson in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Text of Proposed Order)(Berry, Matthew) Modified on 6/7/2022 (klc, ).
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/9/2022. (nkl, )
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER re #22 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Order, #12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File JOINT PROPOSED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER Joint Motion to Enter Partially Disputed Amended Docket Control Order filed by Arigna Technology Limited, #12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File JOINT PROPOSED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER filed by Continental AG, Tesla, Inc., Toyota Motor Corporation, ADC Automotive Distance Control Systems GmbH, General Motors LLC, Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH, Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Nissan North America, Inc., Tesla Motors TX, Inc., Nissan Motor Company, Ltd.., Pretrial Conference set for 10/7/2022 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Jury Selection set for 10/31/2022 09:00AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Motions in Limine due by 9/19/2022., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/3/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/9/2022. (nkl, )
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Benjamin E Leace on behalf of ADC Automotive Distance Control Systems GmbH, Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH, Continental AG. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8906091. (Leace, Benjamin)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Matthew R Berry on behalf of Arigna Technology Limited (Berry, Matthew)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew R Berry on behalf of Arigna Technology Limited (Berry, Matthew)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan S Tse on behalf of General Motors LLC (Tse, Jonathan)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Christopher H Blaszkowski on behalf of ADC Automotive Distance Control Systems GmbH, Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH, Continental AG. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8901835. (Blaszkowski, Christopher)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Danielle M Nicholson on behalf of Arigna Technology Limited (Nicholson, Danielle)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Oleg Elkhunovich on behalf of Arigna Technology Limited (Elkhunovich, Oleg)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marissa Rachel Ducca on behalf of General Motors LLC (Ducca, Marissa)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Meng Xi on behalf of Arigna Technology Limited (Xi, Meng)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Order, #12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File JOINT PROPOSED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER Joint Motion to Enter Partially Disputed Amended Docket Control Order by Arigna Technology Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Healy, Andres)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bryce Thomas Barcelo on behalf of Arigna Technology Limited (Barcelo, Bryce)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven M Seigel on behalf of Arigna Technology Limited (Seigel, Steven)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rachel S. Black on behalf of Arigna Technology Limited (Black, Rachel)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Emily Anne Parsons on behalf of Arigna Technology Limited (Parsons, Emily)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aamir A Kazi on behalf ofTesla, Inc. and Tesla Motors TX, Inc.(Kazi, Aamir) Modified on 5/5/2022 (nkl, ).
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Edward Schiltz on behalf of Arigna Technology Limited (Schiltz, John)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael A Oakes on behalf of Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor North America, Inc. (Oakes, Michael)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andres C Healy on behalf of Arigna Technology Limited (Healy, Andres)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tonya M. Gray on behalf of Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor North America, Inc. (Gray, Tonya)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File JOINT PROPOSED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER by ADC Automotive Distance Control Systems GmbH, Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH, Continental AG, General Motors LLC, Nissan Motor Company, Ltd., Nissan North America, Inc., Tesla Motors TX, Inc., Tesla, Inc., Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Alden Vincent on behalf of Tesla Motors TX, Inc., Tesla, Inc. (Vincent, Michael)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel Robert Gopenko on behalf of Tesla Motors TX, Inc., Tesla, Inc. (Gopenko, Daniel)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward, Jr on behalf of Arigna Technology Limited (Ward, Thomas)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of Arigna Technology Limited (Henry, Claire)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mary Jane Peal on behalf of Nissan Motor Company, Ltd., Nissan North America, Inc. (Peal, Mary)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Basil Trent Webb on behalf of Nissan Motor Company, Ltd., Nissan North America, Inc. (Webb, Basil)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Wynne Morehan on behalf of Nissan Motor Company, Ltd., Nissan North America, Inc. (Morehan, David)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M. Dru Montgomery on behalf of ADC Automotive Distance Control Systems GmbH, Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH, Continental AG (Montgomery, M.)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Thad Heartfield on behalf of ADC Automotive Distance Control Systems GmbH, Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH, Continental AG (Heartfield, J)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Mark Mann on behalf of General Motors LLC (Mann, James)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER SEVERING CASE CIVIL ACTION 2:21CV54. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/27/2022. (nkl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arigna Technology Limited v. Nissan Motor Company, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arigna Technology Limited
Represented By: Matthew R Berry
Represented By: Andrea Leigh Fair
Represented By: Andres C Healy
Represented By: Bryce Thomas Barcelo
Represented By: Claire Abernathy Henry
Represented By: Danielle M Nicholson
Represented By: Emily Anne Parsons
Represented By: John Edward Schiltz
Represented By: Johnny Ward, Jr
Represented By: Meng Xi
Represented By: Oleg Elkhunovich
Represented By: Rachel S. Black
Represented By: Steven M Seigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan Motor Company, Ltd.
Represented By: Patrick A Lujin
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Basil Trent Webb
Represented By: David Wynne Morehan
Represented By: Mary Jane Peal
Represented By: Omowunmi Soyinka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick A Lujin
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Basil Trent Webb
Represented By: David Wynne Morehan
Represented By: Mary Jane Peal
Represented By: Omowunmi Soyinka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesla, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Ruffin B Cordell
Represented By: Aamir A Kazi
Represented By: Daniel Robert Gopenko
Represented By: Michael Alden Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesla Motors TX, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Ruffin B Cordell
Represented By: Aamir A Kazi
Represented By: Daniel Robert Gopenko
Represented By: Michael Alden Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Corporation
Represented By: Andrew David Kasnevich
Represented By: Michael A Oakes
Represented By: Tonya M. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor North America, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew David Kasnevich
Represented By: Michael A Oakes
Represented By: Tonya M. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Represented By: Victoria Fishman Maroulis
Represented By: Gregory Blake Thompson
Represented By: James Mark Mann
Represented By: Jonathan S Tse
Represented By: Marissa Rachel Ducca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADC Automotive Distance Control Systems GmbH
Represented By: Andrew Koopman
Represented By: Christopher H Blaszkowski
Represented By: Benjamin E Leace
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: M. Dru Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH
Represented By: Andrew Koopman
Represented By: Christopher H Blaszkowski
Represented By: Benjamin E Leace
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: M. Dru Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental AG
Represented By: Andrew Koopman
Represented By: Christopher H Blaszkowski
Represented By: Benjamin E Leace
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: M. Dru Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?