Correct Transmission, LLC v. Nokia Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Correct Transmission, LLC
Defendant: Nokia Corporation, Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy and Nokia of America Corporation
Case Number: 2:2022cv00343
Filed: September 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Referring Judge: Roy S Payne
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas W Davison on behalf of Nokia Corporation, Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy, Nokia of America Corporation (Davison, Thomas)
October 28, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David S Frist on behalf of Nokia Corporation, Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy, Nokia of America Corporation (Frist, David)
October 28, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Scott Stevens on behalf of Nokia Corporation, Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy, Nokia of America Corporation (Stevens, Matthew)
October 28, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Daniel Haynes on behalf of Nokia Corporation, Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy, Nokia of America Corporation (Haynes, John)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER- Scheduling Conference set for 11/17/2022 10:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/18/2022. (klc, )
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Waiver of Foreign Service Requirement. Nokia Corporation answer due 12/14/2022; Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy answer due 12/14/2022; Nokia of America Corporation answer due 12/14/2022.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/4/2022. (ch, )
October 3, 2022 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Waiver of Foreign Service Requirement by Nokia Corporation, Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy, Nokia of America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
September 21, 2022 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Nokia of America Corporation on September 15, 2022, filed by Correct Transmission, LLC. (Liddle, Bradley)
September 9, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Nokia Corporation, Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy, Nokia of America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy, #2 Summons(es) Nokia Corporation)(nkl, )
September 7, 2022 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Correct Transmission, LLC (Liddle, Bradley)
September 7, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Liddle, Bradley)
September 7, 2022 Filing 2 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #1 Complaint,.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Liddle, Bradley)
September 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Nokia Corporation, Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy, Nokia of America Corporation ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9107637.), filed by Correct Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Liddle, Bradley)
September 2, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, )
September 2, 2022 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Correct Transmission, LLC v. Nokia Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Correct Transmission, LLC
Represented By: Bradley David Liddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nokia Corporation
Represented By: John Daniel Haynes
Represented By: David S Frist
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Matthew Scott Stevens
Represented By: Thomas W Davison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy
Represented By: John Daniel Haynes
Represented By: David S Frist
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Matthew Scott Stevens
Represented By: Thomas W Davison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nokia of America Corporation
Represented By: John Daniel Haynes
Represented By: David S Frist
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Matthew Scott Stevens
Represented By: Thomas W Davison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?