Wireless Alliance, LLC v. AT&T Mobility LLC et al
Plaintiff: Wireless Alliance, LLC
Defendant: AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc. and AT&T Corp.
Consolidated Defendant: T-Mobile USA, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc. and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless
Intervenor Defendant: Nokia of America Corporation and Ericsson Inc.
Case Number: 2:2023cv00095
Filed: March 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Roy S Payne
Referring Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2023 Filing 61 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dale Chang on behalf of Wireless Alliance, LLC (Chang, Dale)
September 18, 2023 Filing 60 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deron R Dacus on behalf of Ericsson Inc., Nokia of America Corporation (Dacus, Deron)
September 12, 2023 Filing 59 NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE by AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Ericsson Inc., Nokia of America Corporation, T-Mobile USA, Inc. with P.R. 3-3 & 3-4 Disclosures (Frist, David)
September 11, 2023 Filing 58 RESPONSE to #52 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, ANSWER TO INTERVERNOR NOKIA OF AMERICA CORPORATIONS COUNTERCLAIMS FOR DEFENDANTS VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC. AND CELLCO PARTNERSHIP D/B/A VERIZON WIRELESS by Wireless Alliance, LLC. (Wang, Benjamin)
September 11, 2023 Filing 57 RESPONSE to #51 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim ANSWER TO INTERVERNOR NOKIA OF AMERICA CORPORATIONS COUNTERCLAIMS FOR DEFENDANTS T-MOBILE US, INC. AND T-MOBILE USA, INC. by Wireless Alliance, LLC. (Wang, Benjamin)
September 11, 2023 Filing 56 RESPONSE to #50 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim ANSWER TO INTERVERNOR NOKIA OF AMERICA CORPORATIONS COUNTERCLAIMS FOR DEFENDANTS AT&T SERVICES, INC., AT&T MOBILITY LLC, AND AT&T CORP. by Wireless Alliance, LLC. (Wang, Benjamin)
September 11, 2023 Filing 55 RESPONSE to #48 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim ANSWER TO INTERVERNOR ERICSSON, INC.S COUNTERCLAIMS FOR DEFENDANTS VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC., AND CELLCO PARTNERSHIP D/B/A VERIZON WIRELESS by Wireless Alliance, LLC. (Wang, Benjamin)
September 11, 2023 Filing 54 RESPONSE to #47 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim ANSWER TO INTERVERNOR ERICSSON, INC.S COUNTERCLAIMS FOR DEFENDANTS T-MOBILE US, INC. AND T-MOBILE USA, INC. by Wireless Alliance, LLC. (Wang, Benjamin)
September 11, 2023 Filing 53 RESPONSE to #46 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim ANSWER TO INTERVERNOR ERICSSON, INC.S COUNTERCLAIMS FOR DEFENDANTS AT&T SERVICES, INC., AT&T MOBILITY LLC, AND AT&T CORP. by Wireless Alliance, LLC. (Wang, Benjamin)
August 28, 2023 Filing 52 Nokia of America Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint against Verizon Communications, Inc., and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, COUNTERCLAIM against Wireless Alliance, LLC by Nokia of America Corporation.(Frist, David)
August 28, 2023 Filing 51 Nokia of America Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint against T-Mobile US, Inc., and T-Mobile USA, Inc., COUNTERCLAIM against Wireless Alliance, LLC by Nokia of America Corporation.(Frist, David)
August 28, 2023 Filing 50 Nokia of America Corporation's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, against AT&T Services, Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, and AT&T Corp., COUNTERCLAIM against Wireless Alliance, LLC by Nokia of America Corporation.(Frist, David)
August 28, 2023 Filing 49 Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Nokia of America Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Nokia Corporation, Corporate Parent Nokia Solutions and Networks B.V. for Nokia of America Corporation. (Frist, David)
August 28, 2023 Filing 48 Ericsson Intervenor's ANSWER to Complaint against Verizon Communications, Inc., and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, COUNTERCLAIM against Wireless Alliance, LLC by Ericsson Inc..(Frist, David)
August 28, 2023 Filing 47 Ericsson Intervenor's ANSWER to Complaint against T-Mobile US, Inc., and T-Mobile USA, Inc., COUNTERCLAIM against Wireless Alliance, LLC by Ericsson Inc..(Frist, David)
August 28, 2023 Filing 46 Ericsson Intervenor's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Wireless Alliance, LLC by Ericsson Inc..(Frist, David)
August 28, 2023 Filing 45 Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Ericsson Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, Corporate Parent Ericsson Holding II Inc. for Ericsson Inc.. (Frist, David)
August 28, 2023 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #38 Motion to Intervene; granting #39 Motion to Intervene; granting #40 Motion to Intervene; granting #41 Motion to Intervene; granting #43 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 08/24/2023. (klc, )
August 23, 2023 Filing 43 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene by Ericsson Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1)(Frist, David)
August 23, 2023 Filing 42 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene by Ericsson Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1)(Frist, David)
August 23, 2023 Filing 41 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene by Ericsson Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1)(Frist, David)
August 23, 2023 Filing 40 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene by Nokia of America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1)(Frist, David)
August 23, 2023 Filing 39 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene by Nokia of America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1)(Frist, David)
August 23, 2023 Filing 38 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene by Nokia of America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1)(Frist, David)
August 8, 2023 Filing 37 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan D Link on behalf of Wireless Alliance, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-9639832. (Link, Jonathan)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 PROTECTIVE ORDER granting #35 Joint MOTION FOR ENTRY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/4/2023. (ch, )
August 3, 2023 Filing 35 Joint MOTION FOR ENTRY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER by Wireless Alliance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Protective Order)(Wang, Benjamin)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #31 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/28/2023. (ch, )
July 28, 2023 Filing 33 NOTICE by Wireless Alliance, LLC OF COMPLAINCE REGARDING SERVICE OF INITIAL AND ADDITIONAL DISCLOSURES (Wang, Benjamin)
July 28, 2023 Filing 32 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Welch, Emily)
July 27, 2023 Filing 31 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order by AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Welch, Emily)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 DISCOVERY ORDER granting #27 Joint MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/24/2023. (ch, )
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - ORDER granting #26 Joint MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DOCKET CONTROL ORDER AND EXTENSION Pretrial Conference set for 9/16/2024 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Amended Pleadings due by 1/24/2024., Discovery due by 7/8/2024., Jury Selection set for 10/21/2024 at 09:00AM before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III., Markman Hearing set for 4/10/2024 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Motions due by 8/24/2024., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/9/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/24/2023. (ch, )
July 24, 2023 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Phillip Love on behalf of Wireless Alliance, LLC (Love, Gregory)
July 21, 2023 Filing 27 Joint MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DISCOVERY ORDER by Wireless Alliance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wang, Benjamin)
July 21, 2023 Filing 26 Joint MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DOCKET CONTROL ORDER AND EXTENSION by Wireless Alliance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wang, Benjamin)
July 10, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert William Weber on behalf of T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Weber, Robert)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting Stipulation of Dismissal as to Verizon Communications, Inc. (Consolidated from 2:23-cv-97) filed in the member consolidated case.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/7/2023. (ch, )
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues with the LEAD CASE, Case No. 2:23-cv-00095. All parties are instructed to file any future filings in the LEAD CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/6/2023. (ch, )
July 6, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Roy Payne: Scheduling Conference held on 7/6/23. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to a trial before the magistrate judge. The parties were then given Markman and jury selection dates. The parties were directed to meet and confer regarding any changes to the Courts proposed docket control order and discovery order, and the parties are to submit the proposed orders within fourteen days. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Greg Love; Defense - Adam Ahnhut. (No exhibits)(Court Reporter Not Recorded.) (bga)
June 22, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE by Wireless Alliance, LLC Notice of Compliance with P.R. 3-1 (Wang, Benjamin)
June 12, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam Bertram Ahnhut on behalf of AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc. (Ahnhut, Adam)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER - Scheduling/Case Management Conference set for 7/6/2023 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/8/2023. (ch, )
June 8, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Emily Chambers Welch on behalf of AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc. (Welch, Emily)
June 8, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sloane Sueanne Kyrazis on behalf of AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc. (Kyrazis, Sloane)
June 8, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Daniel Haynes on behalf of AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc. (Haynes, John)
June 8, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David S Frist on behalf of AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc. (Frist, David)
June 8, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Clayton Deane on behalf of AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc. (Deane, Michael)
June 8, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ross Ritter Barton on behalf of AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc. (Barton, Ross)
May 31, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by Wireless Alliance, LLC (Wang, Benjamin)
May 30, 2023 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )
May 26, 2023 Filing 12 Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent SBC Long Distance, LLC, Corporate Parent BellSouth Mobile Data, Inc., Corporate Parent New Cingular Wireless Services, Inc., Corporate Parent AT&T Investment & Tower Holdings, LLC for AT&T Mobility LLC; Corporate Parent AT&T Inc. for AT&T Corp., AT&T Services, Inc.. (Frist, David)
May 26, 2023 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc..(Frist, David)
March 29, 2023 Filing 10 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc..( Dacus, Deron)
March 29, 2023 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for AT&T Corp. to 5/26/2023. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
March 29, 2023 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for AT&T Services, Inc. to 5/26/2023; AT&T Mobility LLC to 5/26/2023. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
March 22, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wireless Alliance, LLC. AT&T Services, Inc. served on 3/21/2023, answer due 4/11/2023. (Wang, Benjamin)
March 22, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wireless Alliance, LLC. AT&T Mobility LLC served on 3/21/2023, answer due 4/11/2023. (Wang, Benjamin)
March 22, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wireless Alliance, LLC. AT&T Corp. served on 3/21/2023, answer due 4/11/2023. (Wang, Benjamin)
March 8, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es))(ch, )
March 8, 2023 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
March 8, 2023 Case assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, )
March 7, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Qi Tong on behalf of Wireless Alliance, LLC (Tong, Qi)
March 7, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew D Weiss on behalf of Wireless Alliance, LLC (Weiss, Andrew)
March 7, 2023 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Wireless Alliance, LLC (Wang, Benjamin)
March 7, 2023 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Wang, Benjamin)
March 7, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9389703.), filed by Wireless Alliance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wang, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wireless Alliance, LLC v. AT&T Mobility LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wireless Alliance, LLC
Represented By: Andrew D Weiss
Represented By: Qi Tong
Represented By: Benjamin T Wang
Represented By: Gregory Phillip Love
Represented By: Jonathan D Link
Represented By: Dale Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility LLC
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Adam Bertram Ahnhut
Represented By: David S Frist
Represented By: Emily Chambers Welch
Represented By: John Daniel Haynes
Represented By: Michael Clayton Deane
Represented By: Ross Ritter Barton
Represented By: Sloane Sueanne Kyrazis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Services, Inc.
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Adam Bertram Ahnhut
Represented By: David S Frist
Represented By: Emily Chambers Welch
Represented By: Michael Clayton Deane
Represented By: John Daniel Haynes
Represented By: Ross Ritter Barton
Represented By: Sloane Sueanne Kyrazis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Corp.
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Adam Bertram Ahnhut
Represented By: David S Frist
Represented By: Michael Clayton Deane
Represented By: Emily Chambers Welch
Represented By: Ross Ritter Barton
Represented By: John Daniel Haynes
Represented By: Sloane Sueanne Kyrazis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: T-Mobile USA, Inc.
Represented By: David S Frist
Represented By: Robert William Weber
Represented By: Adam Bertram Ahnhut
Represented By: Emily Chambers Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Verizon Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless
Represented By: Adam Bertram Ahnhut
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Emily Chambers Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Nokia of America Corporation
Represented By: David S Frist
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Ericsson Inc.
Represented By: David S Frist
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?