Headwater Research LLC v. SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. et al
Plaintiff: Headwater Research LLC
Defendant: SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC., SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. and Samsung Display Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2023cv00103
Filed: March 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Referring Judge: Roy S Payne
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Grant K Schmidt on behalf of All Defendants (Schmidt, Grant)
April 6, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Qi Tong on behalf of Headwater Research LLC (Tong, Qi)
April 6, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Philip X Wang on behalf of Headwater Research LLC (Wang, Philip)
April 6, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul Anthony Kroeger on behalf of Headwater Research LLC (Kroeger, Paul)
April 6, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Neil Alan Rubin on behalf of Headwater Research LLC (Rubin, Neil)
April 6, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kristopher Ryan Davis on behalf of Headwater Research LLC (Davis, Kristopher)
April 6, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason Wietholter on behalf of Headwater Research LLC (Wietholter, Jason)
April 6, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Shrin Tsuei on behalf of Headwater Research LLC (Tsuei, James)
April 6, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James A Milkey on behalf of Headwater Research LLC (Milkey, James)
April 6, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Benjamin T Wang on behalf of Headwater Research LLC (Wang, Benjamin)
April 6, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian D Ledahl on behalf of Headwater Research LLC (Ledahl, Brian)
April 6, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amy Elizabeth Hayden on behalf of Headwater Research LLC (Hayden, Amy)
April 6, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Reza Mirzaie on behalf of Headwater Research LLC (Mirzaie, Reza)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Unopposed MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO MOVE, ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND WAIVER OF FOREIGN SERVICE REQUIREMENT. SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. answer due 7/3/2023; SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. answer due 7/3/2023; Samsung Display Co., Ltd. answer due 7/3/2023.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/3/2023. (ch, )
March 31, 2023 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO MOVE, ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND WAIVER OF FOREIGN SERVICE REQUIREMENT by SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC., SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD., Samsung Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
March 15, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Headwater Research LLC. SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. served on 3/14/2023, answer due 4/4/2023. (Fenster, Marc)
March 13, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.. (ch, )
March 13, 2023 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
March 13, 2023 Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, )
March 10, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Marc A Fenster on behalf of Headwater Research LLC (Fenster, Marc)
March 10, 2023 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Headwater Research LLC (Fenster, Marc)
March 10, 2023 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Fenster, Marc)
March 10, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC., SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD., Samsung Display Co., Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9397131.), filed by Headwater Research LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fenster, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Headwater Research LLC v. SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Headwater Research LLC
Represented By: Marc A Fenster
Represented By: Brian D Ledahl
Represented By: Philip X Wang
Represented By: Qi Tong
Represented By: Reza Mirzaie
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Hayden
Represented By: Benjamin T Wang
Represented By: James A Milkey
Represented By: James Shrin Tsuei
Represented By: Jason Wietholter
Represented By: Kristopher Ryan Davis
Represented By: Neil Alan Rubin
Represented By: Paul Anthony Kroeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Grant K Schmidt
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
Represented By: Grant K Schmidt
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Display Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Grant K Schmidt
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?