Glass v. Upshur County Jail Medical et al
Plaintiff: Edward Benton Glass
Defendant: Upshur County Jail Medical, M.D. Bullard, Nurse R. Jones and M.D. Buller
Case Number: 2:2023cv00119
Filed: March 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Referring Judge: Roy S Payne
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TO ANSWER AND SCHEDULING ORDER - ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process and the Defendants Dr. Buller and Nurse R. Jones shall have thirty (30) days from the date of receipt of this order. ORDERED that, the Court having determined that appointment of the United States Marshal to serve process is necessary and appropriate in this case, service shall be perfected by the United States Marshal without cost to the Plaintiffat the Defendants business address: Upshur County Justice Center/405 North Titus P.O. Box 730, Gilmer, Texas 75644. ORDERED that within 60 days after the answer is filed with the Court, the Defendants shall file any motion for summary judgment which he may have limited to the defense of exhaustion of administrative remedies, if applicable. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/12/2023. (ch, )
April 24, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION Declaration for Entry of Default by Edward Benton Glass. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope(s))(ch, )
April 19, 2023 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against M.D. Buller, Nurse R. Jones, Upshur County Jail Medical, filed by Edward Benton Glass. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Envelope(s))(ch, )
April 11, 2023 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against M.D. Buller, Nurse R. Jones, Upshur County Jail Medical, filed by Edward Benton Glass. (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s))(ch, )
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #9 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/5/2023. (ch, )
April 5, 2023 Filing 11 COMPLAINT against M.D. Bullard, Nurse R. Jones, Upshur County Jail Medical, filed by Edward Benton Glass. (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s))(ch, )
April 3, 2023 Filing 10 Letter Requesting Representation from Edward Benton Glass (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s)) (ch, )
April 3, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Edward Benton Glass. (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s))(ch, )
April 3, 2023 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against M.D. Bullard, Nurse R. Jones, Upshur County Jail Medical, filed by Edward Benton Glass. (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s))(ch, )
April 3, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE - REGARDING SUMMONS by Edward Benton Glass (ch, )
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days from receipt of this order to file an amended complainton the standardized section 1983 formstating specific facts and details to support his claims. ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall send Plaintiff a blank copy of the standardized section 1983 form so that he may fill it out and return it to the Court in conformity with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/28/2023. (ch, )
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court shall mail a copy of this order to the Administrator of Inmate Accounts at the Upshur County Jail, 405 N. Tutus Street, Gilmer, Texas 75644. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/27/2023. (ch, )
March 24, 2023 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
March 22, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COURT by Edward Benton Glass (ch, )
March 22, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Edward Benton Glass. (ch, )
March 22, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against M.D. Bullard, Nurse R. Jones, Upshur County Jail Medical, filed by Edward Benton Glass. (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s))(ch, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glass v. Upshur County Jail Medical et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Benton Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Upshur County Jail Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Bullard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse R. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Buller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?