Daingean Technologies Ltd. v. AT&T Inc. et al
Defendant: AT&T Inc., AT&T Corp. and AT&T Communications LLC
Counter Defendant: Daingean Technologies Ltd.
Counter Claimant: AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Services Inc. and Nokia of America Corporation
Intervenor: Ericsson Inc.
Case Number: 2:2023cv00123
Filed: March 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Referring Judge: Roy S Payne
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2023 Filing 76 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Dunbar on behalf of Daingean Technologies Ltd. (Dunbar, Michael)
November 13, 2023 Filing 75 PLAINTIFF'S ANSWER to #67 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Daingean Technologies Ltd..(Bullwinkel, Robert)
November 13, 2023 Filing 74 PLAINTIFF'S ANSWER to #66 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Daingean Technologies Ltd..(Bullwinkel, Robert)
November 13, 2023 Filing 73 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deron R Dacus on behalf of Ericsson Inc. (Dacus, Deron)
November 13, 2023 Filing 72 PLAINTIFF'S ANSWER to #65 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Daingean Technologies Ltd..(Bullwinkel, Robert)
November 13, 2023 Filing 71 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deron R Dacus on behalf of Nokia of America Corporation (Dacus, Deron)
November 9, 2023 Filing 70 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory for International Judicial Assistance by AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc., Ericsson Inc., Nokia of America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Mathews, Nicholas)
November 9, 2023 Filing 69 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory for International Judicial Assistance by AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc., Ericsson Inc., Nokia of America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Mathews, Nicholas)
November 9, 2023 Filing 68 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Issuance of Letter Request for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to Hague Convention by AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc., Ericsson Inc., Nokia of America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Mathews, Nicholas)
November 1, 2023 Filing 67 ANSWER to #64 Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Daingean Technologies Ltd. by Nokia of America Corporation.(Mathews, Nicholas)
November 1, 2023 Filing 66 ANSWER to #64 Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Daingean Technologies Ltd. by Ericsson Inc..(Mathews, Nicholas)
November 1, 2023 Filing 65 ANSWER to #64 Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Daingean Technologies Ltd. by AT&T Services Inc., AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility LLC.(Mathews, Nicholas)
October 18, 2023 Filing 64 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc., filed by Daingean Technologies Ltd..(Bullwinkel, Robert)
September 19, 2023 Filing 63 PLAINTIFF'S ANSWER to #56 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Daingean Technologies Ltd..(Bullwinkel, Robert)
September 13, 2023 Filing 62 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Sorensen Hansen on behalf of AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc., Ericsson Inc., Nokia of America Corporation (Hansen, Eric)
September 13, 2023 Filing 61 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexander Jefferson Chern on behalf of AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc., Ericsson Inc., Nokia of America Corporation (Chern, Alexander)
September 13, 2023 Filing 60 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew T. Cameron on behalf of AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc., Ericsson Inc., Nokia of America Corporation (Cameron, Matthew)
September 13, 2023 Filing 59 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua Wright Budwin on behalf of AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc., Ericsson Inc., Nokia of America Corporation (Budwin, Joshua)
September 13, 2023 Filing 58 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Warren Henry Lipschitz on behalf of AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc., Ericsson Inc., Nokia of America Corporation (Lipschitz, Warren)
August 29, 2023 Filing 57 Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Nokia of America Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Nokia Solutions and Networks B.V., Other Affiliate Nokia Corporation, Other Affiliate Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy for Nokia of America Corporation. (Mathews, Nicholas)
August 29, 2023 Filing 56 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Daingean Technologies Ltd. by Nokia of America Corporation.(Mathews, Nicholas)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #54 Motion to Intervene. Accordingly, Nokia is permitted to intervene as a defendant in this action and is GRANTED LEAVE to promptly file its responsive pleading in intervention. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/25/2023. (daj, )
August 24, 2023 Filing 54 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene by Nokia of America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Mathews, Nicholas)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 PROTECTIVE ORDER granting #51 Joint MOTION for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/18/2023. (ch, )
August 18, 2023 Filing 52 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Daingean Technologies Ltd. Plaintiff's Notice of Compliance Regarding Initial and Additional Disclosures (Anaipakos, Demetrios)
August 17, 2023 Filing 51 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc., Ericsson Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mathews, Nicholas)
August 16, 2023 Filing 50 PLAINTIFF'S ANSWER to #37 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Daingean Technologies Ltd..(Bullwinkel, Robert)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 DISCOVERY ORDER granting #46 Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Discovery Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/11/2023. (ch, )
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER granting #45 Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Docket Control Order. ( Pretrial Conference set for 12/2/2024 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Jury Selection set for 1/6/2025 at 09:00AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Markman Hearing set for 7/23/2024 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Motions due by 11/12/2024., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/25/2024.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/11/2023. (ch, )
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #42 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File proposed Protective Order and Comply with Paragraphs 1 & 3 of the Discovery Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/11/2023. (ch, )
August 11, 2023 Filing 46 Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Discovery Order by Daingean Technologies Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Agreed Discovery Order)(Anaipakos, Demetrios)
August 11, 2023 Filing 45 Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Docket Control Order by Daingean Technologies Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Agreed Docket Control Order)(Anaipakos, Demetrios)
August 11, 2023 ***FILED IN ERROR. NEED TO FILE A MOTION AND NEEDS CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE Document # 44, Submission of DISCOVERY Order. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
August 11, 2023 ***FILED IN ERROR. NEED TO FILE MOTION AND NEEDS CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE Document # 43, Submission of Docket Control Order. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
August 10, 2023 Filing 44 ***FILED IN ERROR***Submission of Proposed Agreed Discovery order by Daingean Technologies Ltd. Joint Motion for Entry of Agreed Discovery Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Agreed Discovery Order)(Anaipakos, Demetrios) Modified on 8/11/2023 (ch, ).
August 10, 2023 Filing 43 ***FILED IN ERROR***Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by Daingean Technologies Ltd. Joint Motion for Entry of Agreed Docket Control Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Agreed Docket Control Order)(Anaipakos, Demetrios) Modified on 8/11/2023 (ch, ).
August 10, 2023 Filing 42 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File proposed Protective Order and Comply with Paragraphs 1 & 3 of the Discovery Order by Daingean Technologies Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fair, Andrea)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #40 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Discovery Order and Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/3/2023. (ch, )
August 2, 2023 Filing 40 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Discovery Order and Docket Control Order by Daingean Technologies Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fair, Andrea)
July 31, 2023 Filing 39 NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael F Heim (Heim, Michael)
July 26, 2023 Filing 38 Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Ericsson Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, Corporate Parent Ericsson Holding II Inc. for Ericsson Inc.. (Mathews, Nicholas)
July 26, 2023 Filing 37 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Daingean Technologies Ltd. by Ericsson Inc..(Mathews, Nicholas)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/25/2023. (ch, )
July 24, 2023 Filing 35 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene by Ericsson Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Mathews, Nicholas)
July 20, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Scheduling Conference/Case Management Conference held on 7/20/2023. Counsel for the parties appeared. Court asked whether they consented to trial before the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Court then gave counsel Claim Construction and Jury Selection/Trial dates. (Court Reporter Shawn McRoberts) (aeb)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Motion to Withdraw #28 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims under Rule 12(b)(6)
July 14, 2023 Filing 33 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #28 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims under Rule 12(b)(6) by Daingean Technologies Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Anaipakos, Demetrios)
July 14, 2023 Filing 32 ANSWER to #22 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiff's Answer to Defendants' Counterclaims (Dkt. 22) by Daingean Technologies Ltd..(Alavi, Amir)
July 7, 2023 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #28 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by AT&T Communications LLC, AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mathews, Nicholas)
July 7, 2023 Filing 30 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Daingean Technologies Ltd. (P.R. 3-1 and P.R. 3-2 Disclosures) (Fair, Andrea)
June 28, 2023 Filing 29 NOTICE of Change of Address by Amir H. Alavi (Alavi, Amir)
June 22, 2023 Filing 28 ***WITHDRAWN PER #34*** MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims under Rule 12(b)(6) by Daingean Technologies Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Anaipakos, Demetrios) Modified on 7/17/2023 (ch, ).
June 21, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Leigh Truelove on behalf of All Defendants (Truelove, Jennifer)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER - Scheduling/Case Management Conference set for 7/20/2023 09:30 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/14/2023. (nkl, )
June 6, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by Daingean Technologies Ltd. (Anaipakos, Demetrios)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #21 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to AT&T Communications LLC and AT&T Inc. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/5/2023. (ch, )
June 1, 2023 Filing 23 Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc. identifying Corporate Parent SBC Long Distance, LLC, Corporate Parent BellSouth Mobile Data, Inc., Corporate Parent New Cingular Wireless Services, Inc., Corporate Parent AT&T Investment & Tower Holdings, LLC for AT&T Mobility LLC; Corporate Parent BellSouth Mobile Data, Inc. for AT&T Mobility II LLC. (Mathews, Nicholas)
June 1, 2023 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Daingean Technologies Ltd. by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Corp., AT&T Services Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC.(Mathews, Nicholas)
June 1, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Daingean Technologies Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Anaipakos, Demetrios)
April 6, 2023 Filing 20 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re AT&T Communications LLC, AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc..( Dacus, Deron)
April 6, 2023 Filing 19 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re AT&T Corp..( Dacus, Deron)
April 6, 2023 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for AT&T Mobility II LLC to 6/1/2023; AT&T Communications LLC to 6/1/2023; AT&T Services Inc. to 6/1/2023; AT&T Inc. to 6/1/2023; AT&T Mobility LLC to 6/1/2023. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
April 6, 2023 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for AT&T Corp. to 6/1/2023. 44 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
March 31, 2023 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daingean Technologies Ltd.. AT&T Inc. served on 3/27/2023, answer due 4/17/2023. (Heim, Michael)
March 31, 2023 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daingean Technologies Ltd.. AT&T Services Inc. served on 3/27/2023, answer due 4/17/2023. (Heim, Michael)
March 31, 2023 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daingean Technologies Ltd.. AT&T Mobility LLC served on 3/27/2023, answer due 4/17/2023. (Heim, Michael)
March 31, 2023 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daingean Technologies Ltd.. AT&T Mobility II LLC served on 3/27/2023, answer due 4/17/2023. (Heim, Michael)
March 31, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daingean Technologies Ltd.. AT&T Corp. served on 3/28/2023, answer due 4/18/2023. (Heim, Michael)
March 31, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daingean Technologies Ltd.. AT&T Communications LLC served on 3/27/2023, answer due 4/17/2023. (Heim, Michael)
March 28, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea Leigh Fair on behalf of Daingean Technologies Ltd. (Fair, Andrea)
March 24, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Issued as to AT&T Communications LLC may be served through its registered agent, The Corporation Trust Company, AT&T Corp. may be served through its registered agent, CT Corporation System, AT&T Inc. may be served through its registered agent, CT Corporation System, AT&T Mobility II LLC may be served through its registered agent, The Corporation Trust Company, AT&T Mobility LLC, may be served through its registered agent, The Corporation Trust Company, AT&T Services Inc. may be served through its registered agent, The Corporation Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es), #3 Summons(es), #4 Summons(es), #5 Summons(es))(nkl, )
March 24, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Dean McBride on behalf of Daingean Technologies Ltd. (McBride, Michael)
March 24, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amir H. Alavi on behalf of Daingean Technologies Ltd. (Alavi, Amir)
March 24, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Demetrios Anaipakos on behalf of Daingean Technologies Ltd. (Anaipakos, Demetrios)
March 24, 2023 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Daingean Technologies Ltd. (Heim, Michael)
March 24, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Blaine Andrew Larson on behalf of Daingean Technologies Ltd. (Larson, Blaine)
March 24, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alden Harris on behalf of Daingean Technologies Ltd. (Harris, Alden)
March 24, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric James Enger on behalf of Daingean Technologies Ltd. (Enger, Eric)
March 24, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Allan Bullwinkel on behalf of Daingean Technologies Ltd. (Bullwinkel, Robert)
March 24, 2023 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Heim, Michael)
March 24, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9419697.), filed by Daingean Technologies ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Heim, Michael)
March 24, 2023 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
March 24, 2023 Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daingean Technologies Ltd. v. AT&T Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Daingean Technologies Ltd.
Represented By: Demetrios Anaipakos
Represented By: Alden Harris
Represented By: Robert Allan Bullwinkel
Represented By: Michael F Heim
Represented By: Amir H. Alavi
Represented By: Blaine Andrew Larson
Represented By: Eric James Enger
Represented By: Michael Dean McBride
Represented By: Andrea Leigh Fair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Inc.
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Nicholas M Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Corp.
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Nicholas M Mathews
Represented By: Jennifer Leigh Truelove
Represented By: Alexander Jefferson Chern
Represented By: Joshua Wright Budwin
Represented By: Warren Henry Lipschitz
Represented By: Eric Sorensen Hansen
Represented By: Matthew T. Cameron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Communications LLC
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Nicholas M Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: AT&T Mobility LLC
Represented By: Nicholas M Mathews
Represented By: Alexander Jefferson Chern
Represented By: Eric Sorensen Hansen
Represented By: Matthew T. Cameron
Represented By: Joshua Wright Budwin
Represented By: Warren Henry Lipschitz
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Jennifer Leigh Truelove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: AT&T Mobility II LLC
Represented By: Nicholas M Mathews
Represented By: Warren Henry Lipschitz
Represented By: Alexander Jefferson Chern
Represented By: Eric Sorensen Hansen
Represented By: Joshua Wright Budwin
Represented By: Matthew T. Cameron
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Jennifer Leigh Truelove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: AT&T Services Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas M Mathews
Represented By: Alexander Jefferson Chern
Represented By: Eric Sorensen Hansen
Represented By: Joshua Wright Budwin
Represented By: Matthew T. Cameron
Represented By: Warren Henry Lipschitz
Represented By: Jennifer Leigh Truelove
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Nokia of America Corporation
Represented By: Nicholas M Mathews
Represented By: Alexander Jefferson Chern
Represented By: Eric Sorensen Hansen
Represented By: Joshua Wright Budwin
Represented By: Matthew T. Cameron
Represented By: Warren Henry Lipschitz
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Ericsson Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas M Mathews
Represented By: Alexander Jefferson Chern
Represented By: Eric Sorensen Hansen
Represented By: Matthew T. Cameron
Represented By: Warren Henry Lipschitz
Represented By: Joshua Wright Budwin
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?