Cerence Operating Company v. SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. et al
Plaintiff: Cerence Operating Company
Defendant: SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. and SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.
Case Number: 2:2023cv00482
Filed: October 13, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Referring Judge: Roy S Payne
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND WAIVER OF FOREIGN SERVICE REQUIREMENT, #1 Complaint,. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/1/2023. (nkl, )
November 1, 2023 Answer Due Deadline Updated for SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. to 2/5/2024; SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. to 2/5/2024. (nkl, )
October 31, 2023 Filing 10 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND WAIVER OF FOREIGN SERVICE REQUIREMENT by SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC., SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
October 24, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cerence Operating Company. SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. served on 10/17/2023. (Wang, Benjamin)
October 13, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shani M Tutt on behalf of Cerence Operating Company (Tutt, Shani)
October 13, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Qi Tong on behalf of Cerence Operating Company (Tong, Qi)
October 13, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew D Weiss on behalf of Cerence Operating Company (Weiss, Andrew)
October 13, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC., SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Additional Attachment(s))(ch, )
October 13, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Benjamin T Wang on behalf of Cerence Operating Company (Wang, Benjamin)
October 13, 2023 Filing 3 Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Cerence Operating Company identifying Corporate Parent Cerence Inc. for Cerence Operating Company. (Fenster, Marc)
October 13, 2023 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Fenster, Marc)
October 13, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC., SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9756526.), filed by Cerence Operating Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fenster, Marc)
October 13, 2023 Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, )
October 13, 2023 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cerence Operating Company v. SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cerence Operating Company
Represented By: Andrew D Weiss
Represented By: Benjamin T Wang
Represented By: Qi Tong
Represented By: Shani M Tutt
Represented By: Marc A Fenster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?