Morgan et al v. Plano Independent School District et al
Case Number: 4:2004cv00447
Filed: December 15, 2004
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
Presiding Judge: Don D. Bush
Presiding Judge: Richard A. Schell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 354 MEMORANDUM ORDER ADOPTING IN PART REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE for 331 Motion to Dismiss filed by Lynn Swanson. The claims against Defendant Swanson are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and Defendant shall recover her costs from Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 2/13/2013. (baf, )
September 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 348 MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE DENYING 298 Motion for Entry of Judgment for 345 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 9/28/2012. (baf, )
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 345 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 298 MOTION for Entry of Judgment - Swanson filed by Lynn Swanson.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush on 7/17/2012. (baf, )
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 328 MEMORANDUM ADOPTING IN PART REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE - GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 278 PISD's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 286 Supplement to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/29/2012. (baf, )
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 308 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush on 2/1/2012. (baf, )
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 277 MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION THE UNITED STATED MAGISTRATE JUDGE for 274 Report and Recommendations DENYING 27 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and GRANTING 53 PISD's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment related to the facial constitutionality of the 2004 PISD Policy. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/28/2011. (baf, )
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 235 MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE for 173 Motion to Dismiss filed by Jackie Bomchill, Lynn Swanson, 230 Report and Recommendations. The Court adopts the findings and conclusions of the Magistrate Judge as the findings and conclusions of this court, and 173 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss based on Qualified Immunity is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/30/2009. (baf, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgan et al v. Plano Independent School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?