Pedroli v. Chapman et al
Plaintiff: Peter A Pedroli
Defendant: Everett Rogers, Justin M Chapman, James A Fontaine, Robert S Kirk, Barry Koch, Jeffrey A Kupp, Phillip D Peterson, Albert H Taddiken, Walter S Ciciora, James H Clardy, Steven Craddock, Anthony J LeVecchio, Bernard T Marren, William P Tai, A Travis White, Douglas J Bartek, Martin Englmeier, Rob-Roy J Graham, William L Housley, John P Norsworthy, Nancy A Richardson, Buddy Rogers, Harvey B Cash, Jack D Furst, Kenneth G Langone, Eric Lindberg, Lawrence D Stuart, Jr, Philippe von Stauffenberg and Microtune Inc
Petitioner: Brian Peter Zater, Jonathan Lee Riches and Mark Jordan
Case Number: 4:2007cv00043
Filed: January 31, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: Collin
Presiding Judge: Richard A Schell
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 78 m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2009. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2009 Filing 124 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Order #123 sent to MARK JORDAN returned marked "RETURN TO SENDER - ATTEMPTED NOT KNOWN - UNABLE TO FORWARD" (baf, )
December 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER DENYING #120 Motion for Reconsideration ; DENYING [] Motion to Intervene. Jonathan Lee Riches must obtain leave of Court prior to filing any additional pleadings in this action. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 12/22/2008. (baf, )
September 15, 2008 Filing 122 REPLY to Response to Motion re #120 MOTION for Reconsideration, MOTION to Intervene filed by Mark Jordan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Envelope)(baf, )
August 26, 2008 Filing 121 RESPONSE in Opposition re #120 MOTION for Reconsideration, MOTION to Intervene filed by Albert H Taddiken, Walter S Ciciora, James H Clardy, Steven Craddock, Anthony J LeVecchio, Bernard T Marren, William P Tai, A Travis White, Douglas J Bartek, Martin Englmeier, Rob-Roy J Graham, William L Housley, John P Norsworthy, Nancy A Richardson, Everett Rogers, Harvey B Cash, Jack D Furst, Kenneth G Langone, Eric Lindberg, Lawrence D Stuart, Jr, Philippe von Stauffenberg, Microtune Inc, Justin M Chapman, James A Fontaine, Robert S Kirk, Barry Koch, Jeffrey A Kupp, Phillip D Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Woodcock, David)
August 15, 2008 Filing 120 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Brian Peter Zater, Jonathan Lee Riches, and Mark Jordan. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(baf, )
August 15, 2008 TWO PLEADING DOCUMENT - SEE DKT #120 MOTION to Intervene as Plaintiffs under FRCP Rue 24(A)Z. (baf, )
June 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 119 FINAL JUDGMENT - It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's case is DISMISSED at the Plaintiff's cost. All claims not previously dismissed with prejudice are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 6/27/2008. (baf, )
June 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER denying #113 Motion for Approval of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 6/27/2008. (baf, )
June 24, 2008 Filing 117 RESPONSE in Opposition re #113 MOTION to Dismiss (Motion for Approval of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice) filed by Albert H Taddiken, Walter S Ciciora, James H Clardy, Steven Craddock, Anthony J LeVecchio, Bernard T Marren, William P Tai, A Travis White, Douglas J Bartek, Rob-Roy J Graham, Nancy A Richardson, Everett Rogers, Harvey B Cash, Justin M Chapman, James A Fontaine, Barry Koch, Jeffrey A Kupp, Phillip D Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Woodcock, David)
June 24, 2008 Filing 116 RESPONSE to Motion re #113 MOTION to Dismiss (Motion for Approval of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice) Microtune's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Approval of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Microtune Inc. (Mountz, Timothy)
June 12, 2008 Filing 115 REPLY to Response to Motion re #110 MOTION to Stay Pending the Consideration of a Demand on the Board of Directors of Nominal Defendant Microtune, Inc. filed by Peter A Pedroli. (Toups, Mitchell)
June 9, 2008 Filing 114 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #113 MOTION to Dismiss (Motion for Approval of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice).. (Toups, Mitchell)
June 9, 2008 Filing 113 MOTION to Dismiss (Motion for Approval of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice) by Peter A Pedroli. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Toups, Mitchell)
June 4, 2008 Filing 112 RESPONSE in Opposition re #110 MOTION to Stay Pending the Consideration of a Demand on the Board of Directors of Nominal Defendant Microtune, Inc. filed by Albert H Taddiken, Walter S Ciciora, James H Clardy, Steven Craddock, Anthony J LeVecchio, Bernard T Marren, William P Tai, A Travis White, Douglas J Bartek, Rob-Roy J Graham, Nancy A Richardson, Everett Rogers, Harvey B Cash, Microtune Inc, Justin M Chapman, James A Fontaine, Barry Koch, Jeffrey A Kupp, Phillip D Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Woodcock, David)
May 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting in part #110 Motion to Stay Pending the Consideration of a Demand on the Board of Directors of Nominal Defendant Microtune, Inc. By 5:00 p.m. on 6/16/2008, the Plaintiff may file an amended complaint in line with the reasoning noted in the Court's 3/31/2008 order, if the Plaintiff can do so in good faith and in compliance with Rule 11. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 5/22/2008. (baf, )
May 21, 2008 Filing 110 MOTION to Stay Pending the Consideration of a Demand on the Board of Directors of Nominal Defendant Microtune, Inc. by Peter A Pedroli. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Toups, Mitchell)
March 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - As to those defendants dismissed without prejudice, the Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint in line with the reasoning noted herein, if the Plaintiff can do so in good faith and in compliance with Rule 11. Any amended complaint must be filed within 60 days of this order. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/31/2008. (baf, )
March 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting #53 Motion to Strike. The Court, having considered Defendant Nancy A. Richardson's Motion to Strike Protions of Verfied Shareholder Derivative Complaint (Dkt. 53) pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.Rule 12(f), finds that the Motion is meritorious and that paragraphs 8, 9, 10, 11, 12, 69, 70, 75 and 76 in the derivative complaint should be striken. The matters noted therein are not specifically pertinent to this action, but rather the challenged paragraphs contain quotes regarding the illegality in general of fraudulently backdating stock options. As such, they bear no light on the specific facts or merits of this action. Furthermore, references to "criminal" charges and investigations involving third parties are irrelevant to the issues in this civil action. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/19/2008. (kls, )
January 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting #106 Motion for Leave to File a Second Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Defendant's Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 1/11/2008. (baf, )
January 11, 2008 Filing 106 MOTION for Leave to File Second Notice of Supplemental Authority in Supports of Motions to Dismiss (Unopposed) by Albert H Taddiken, Walter S Ciciora, James H Clardy, Steven Craddock, Anthony J LeVecchio, Bernard T Marren, William P Tai, A Travis White, Douglas J Bartek, Martin Englmeier, Rob-Roy J Graham, William L Housley, John P Norsworthy, Nancy A Richardson, Everett Rogers, Harvey B Cash, Jack D Furst, Kenneth G Langone, Eric Lindberg, Lawrence D Stuart, Jr, Philippe von Stauffenberg, Microtune Inc, Justin M Chapman, James A Fontaine, Robert S Kirk, Barry Koch, Jeffrey A Kupp, Phillip D Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Second Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of the Motions to Dismiss#2 Exhibit A to Second Notice of Supplemental Authority#3 Text of Proposed Order)(Woodcock, David)
January 10, 2008 Filing 105 ***PLEASE IGNORE THIS DOCUMENT - ATTORNEY FILED IN ERROR WITHOUT EXHIBIT A ATTACHED - ATTORNEY WILL CORRECT AND REFILE***MOTION for Leave to File Second Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Unopposed) by Albert H Taddiken, Walter S Ciciora, James H Clardy, Steven Craddock, Anthony J LeVecchio, Bernard T Marren, William P Tai, A Travis White, Douglas J Bartek, Martin Englmeier, Rob-Roy J Graham, William L Housley, John P Norsworthy, Nancy A Richardson, Everett Rogers, Harvey B Cash, Jack D Furst, Kenneth G Langone, Eric Lindberg, Lawrence D Stuart, Jr, Philippe von Stauffenberg, Microtune Inc, Justin M Chapman, James A Fontaine, Robert S Kirk, Barry Koch, Jeffrey A Kupp, Phillip D Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Second Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Defendants' Motions to Dismiss#2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Second Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Defendants' Motions to Dismiss)(Woodcock, David) Modified on 1/11/2008 (baf, ).
October 22, 2007 Filing 104 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed - Martin Englmeier served on 8/23/2007, answer due 9/12/2007. (baf, )
October 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting #102 Motion for Leave to File a Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 10/11/2007. (baf, )
October 11, 2007 Filing 102 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Unopposed) by Albert H Taddiken, Walter S Ciciora, James H Clardy, Steven Craddock, Anthony J LeVecchio, Bernard T Marren, William P Tai, A Travis White, Douglas J Bartek, Martin Englmeier, Rob-Roy J Graham, William L Housley, John P Norsworthy, Nancy A Richardson, Everett Rogers, Harvey B Cash, Jack D Furst, Kenneth G Langone, Eric Lindberg, Lawrence D Stuart, Jr, Philippe von Stauffenberg, Microtune Inc, Justin M Chapman, James A Fontaine, Robert S Kirk, Barry Koch, Jeffrey A Kupp, Phillip D Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Supplemental Authority#2 Text of Proposed Order)(Woodcock, David)
October 10, 2007 Filing 101 ***CORRECTED DOCUMENT REPLACES DOCUMENT #99 WHICH WAS FILED IN ERROR***MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Albert H Taddiken, Walter S Ciciora, James H Clardy, Steven Craddock, Anthony J LeVecchio, Bernard T Marren, William P Tai, A Travis White, Douglas J Bartek, Martin Englmeier, Rob-Roy J Graham, William L Housley, John P Norsworthy, Nancy A Richardson, Everett Rogers, Harvey B Cash, Jack D Furst, Kenneth G Langone, Eric Lindberg, Lawrence D Stuart, Jr, Philippe von Stauffenberg, Microtune Inc, Justin M Chapman, James A Fontaine, Robert S Kirk, Barry Koch, Jeffrey A Kupp, Phillip D Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Supplemental Authority# 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Woodcock, David) Modified on 10/10/2007 (baf, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 10/11/2007 (baf, ).
October 9, 2007 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY submitted DKT #99 - NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE, PROPOSED ORDER HAS DATE AND SIGNATURE LINE AND DOCUMENT ATTY IS SEEKING LEAVE TO FILE IS NOT FILED AS AN ATTACHMENT TO THE MOTION. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
October 5, 2007 Filing 100 ***PLEASE IGNORE THIS DOCUMENT - LEAVE HAS NOT BEEN GRANTED TO FILE IT***NOTICE by Albert H Taddiken, Walter S Ciciora, James H Clardy, Steven Craddock, Anthony J LeVecchio, Bernard T Marren, William P Tai, A Travis White, Douglas J Bartek, Martin Englmeier, Rob-Roy J Graham, William L Housley, John P Norsworthy, Nancy A Richardson, Everett Rogers, Harvey B Cash, Jack D Furst, Kenneth G Langone, Eric Lindberg, Lawrence D Stuart, Jr, Philippe von Stauffenberg, Microtune Inc, Justin M Chapman, James A Fontaine, Robert S Kirk, Barry Koch, Jeffrey A Kupp, Phillip D Peterson of Supplemental Authority in Support of the Motions to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Woodcock, David) Modified on 10/9/2007 (baf, ).
October 5, 2007 Filing 99 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - ATTORNEY MUST CORRECT AND REFILE***MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority by Albert H Taddiken, Walter S Ciciora, James H Clardy, Steven Craddock, Anthony J LeVecchio, Bernard T Marren, William P Tai, A Travis White, Douglas J Bartek, Martin Englmeier, Rob-Roy J Graham, William L Housley, John P Norsworthy, Nancy A Richardson, Everett Rogers, Harvey B Cash, Jack D Furst, Kenneth G Langone, Eric Lindberg, Lawrence D Stuart, Jr, Philippe von Stauffenberg, Microtune Inc, Justin M Chapman, James A Fontaine, Robert S Kirk, Barry Koch, Jeffrey A Kupp, Phillip D Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Woodcock, David) Modified on 10/9/2007 (baf, ).
September 27, 2007 Filing 98 RESPONSE to Motion re #96 MOTION to Dismiss Shareholder Derivative Complaint and Joinder in Certain Directors and Officers Motion to Dismiss and Reply in Support of the Motion to Dismiss filed by Peter A Pedroli. (Toups, Mitchell)
September 12, 2007 Filing 97 ***PLEASE IGNORE THIS DOCUMENT - ATTORNEY FILED IN ERROR***Proposed Pretrial Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Shareholder Derivative Complaint by Martin Englmeier. (Woodcock, David) Modified on 9/12/2007 (baf, ).
September 12, 2007 Filing 96 MOTION to Dismiss Shareholder Derivative Complaint and Joinder in Certain Directors and Officers Motion to Dismiss and Reply in Support of the Motion to Dismiss by Martin Englmeier. (Woodcock, David) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/12/2007 (baf, ).
August 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting #92 Motion for Extension of Time within which to complete service on dft Martin Englmeier. The Court hereby extends the time for service on Martin Englmeier by 150 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 8/31/2007. (baf, )
August 31, 2007 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard A. Schell: Telephone Conference held on 8/31/2007 re #92 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File. A written order will be entered (dm, )
August 29, 2007 Filing 94 REPLY to Response to Motion re #92 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File /Complete Service on Defendant Martin Englmeier filed by Peter A Pedroli. (Toups, Mitchell)
August 22, 2007 Filing 93 RESPONSE in Opposition re #92 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File /Complete Service on Defendant Martin Englmeier filed by Albert H Taddiken, Walter S Ciciora, James H Clardy, Steven Craddock, Anthony J LeVecchio, Bernard T Marren, William P Tai, A Travis White, Douglas J Bartek, Rob-Roy J Graham, William L Housley, John P Norsworthy, Nancy A Richardson, Everett Rogers, Harvey B Cash, Jack D Furst, Kenneth G Langone, Eric Lindberg, Lawrence D Stuart, Jr, Philippe von Stauffenberg, Microtune Inc, Justin M Chapman, James A Fontaine, Robert S Kirk, Barry Koch, Jeffrey A Kupp, Phillip D Peterson. (Woodcock, David)
August 14, 2007 Filing 92 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File /Complete Service on Defendant Martin Englmeier by Peter A Pedroli. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order #2 Affidavit (Declaration) of Rick Hamilton)(Toups, Mitchell)
June 25, 2007 Filing 91 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #50 MOTION to Dismiss Verified Complaint.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Certain Defendants' Submission of Recent Decision in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint)(Woodcock, David)
June 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting #80 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages for Certain Directors and Officers' Reply in Support of their Motion to Dismiss. The page limit for their reply shall be extended to 20 pages. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 6/11/2007. (baf, )
June 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting in part #77 Motion for Extension of Time Within Which to Complete Service on Dft Martin Englmeier. The Plaintiff is given only a 75 day extension to serve dft Englmeier. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 6/11/2007. (baf, )
June 11, 2007 Filing 88 REPLY to Response to Motion re #43 MOTION to Dismiss Shareholder Derivative Complaint and Joinder in the Motion to Dismiss of Certain Directors and Officers filed by William L Housley. (Bessette, Paul)
June 11, 2007 Filing 87 REPLY to Response to Motion re #49 MOTION to Dismiss Shareholder Derivative Complaint filed by Microtune Inc. (Siebman, Clyde)
June 11, 2007 Filing 86 REPLY to Response to Motion re #50 MOTION to Dismiss Verified Complaint filed by Albert H Taddiken, Walter S Ciciora, James H Clardy, Steven Craddock, Anthony J LeVecchio, Bernard T Marren, William P Tai, A Travis White, John P Norsworthy, Harvey B Cash, Jack D Furst, Kenneth G Langone, Eric Lindberg, Lawrence D Stuart, Jr, Philippe von Stauffenberg, Justin M Chapman, James A Fontaine, Robert S Kirk, Barry Koch, Jeffrey A Kupp, Phillip D Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B)(Woodcock, David)
June 11, 2007 Filing 85 ***CORRECTED DOCUMENT REPLACES DOCUMENT #61 WHICH WAS FILED IN ERROR***REPLY to Response to Motion re #62 MOTION to Dismiss Replaces Motion #61 filed by Douglas J Bartek. (Even, Nicholas) Modified on 6/12/2007 (baf, ).
June 11, 2007 Filing 84 RESPONSE in Support re #40 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Supporting Brief filed by Everett Rogers. (Collins, Bruce)
June 11, 2007 Filing 83 REPLY to Response to Motion re #44 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support Thereof filed by Rob-Roy J Graham. (Flegle, Jim)
June 11, 2007 Filing 82 REPLY to Response to Motion re #53 MOTION to Strike portions of verified shareholder derivative complaint filed by Nancy A Richardson. (Resley, Susan)
June 11, 2007 Filing 81 REPLY to Response to Motion re #47 MOTION to Dismiss VERIFIED SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT AS AGAINST DEFENDANT NANCY A. RICHARDSON filed by Nancy A Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Susan D. Resley#2 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Resley, Susan)
June 8, 2007 Filing 80 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Certain Directors and Officers' Reply in Support of their Motion to Dismiss by Albert H Taddiken, Walter S Ciciora, James H Clardy, Steven Craddock, Anthony J LeVecchio, Bernard T Marren, William P Tai, A Travis White, John P Norsworthy, Harvey B Cash, Jack D Furst, Kenneth G Langone, Eric Lindberg, Lawrence D Stuart, Jr, Philippe von Stauffenberg, Justin M Chapman, James A Fontaine, Robert S Kirk, Barry Koch, Jeffrey A Kupp, Phillip D Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Woodcock, David)
June 5, 2007 Filing 78 RESPONSE to Motion re #77 MOTION for Extension of Time to File or Complete Service on Defendant Martin Englmeier Partial Opposition filed by Albert H Taddiken, Walter S Ciciora, James H Clardy, Steven Craddock, Anthony J LeVecchio, Bernard T Marren, William P Tai, A Travis White, Douglas J Bartek, Rob-Roy J Graham, William L Housley, John P Norsworthy, Nancy A Richardson, Everett Rogers, Harvey B Cash, Jack D Furst, Kenneth G Langone, Eric Lindberg, Lawrence D Stuart, Jr, Philippe von Stauffenberg, Microtune Inc, Justin M Chapman, James A Fontaine, Robert S Kirk, Barry Koch, Jeffrey A Kupp, Phillip D Peterson. (Woodcock, David)
June 1, 2007 Filing 79 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Martin Englmeier. (baf, )
May 30, 2007 Filing 77 MOTION for Extension of Time to File or Complete Service on Defendant Martin Englmeier by Peter A Pedroli. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Toups, Mitchell)
May 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting #75 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply In Support of the Motion to Dismiss. All Defendants to file their replies in support of the motions to dismiss by 6/11/2007. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 5/24/2007. (pad, )
May 23, 2007 Filing 75 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Support of the Motions to Dismiss by Albert H Taddiken, Walter S Ciciora, James H Clardy, Steven Craddock, Anthony J LeVecchio, Bernard T Marren, William P Tai, A Travis White, Douglas J Bartek, Rob-Roy J Graham, William L Housley, John P Norsworthy, Nancy A Richardson, Everett Rogers, Harvey B Cash, Jack D Furst, Kenneth G Langone, Eric Lindberg, Lawrence D Stuart, Jr, Philippe von Stauffenberg, Microtune Inc, Justin M Chapman, James A Fontaine, Robert S Kirk, Barry Koch, Jeffrey A Kupp, Phillip D Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Woodcock, David)
May 21, 2007 Filing 74 RESPONSE in Opposition re #43 MOTION to Dismiss Shareholder Derivative Complaint and Joinder in the Motion to Dismiss of Certain Directors and Officers, #62 MOTION to Dismiss Replaces Motion #61, #50 MOTION to Dismiss Verified Complaint, #47 MOTION to Dismiss VERIFIED SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT AS AGAINST DEFENDANT NANCY A. RICHARDSON, #40 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Supporting Brief, #44 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support Thereof, #49 MOTION to Dismiss Shareholder Derivative Complaint filed by Peter A Pedroli. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss#2 Exhibit A#3 Exhibit B#4 Exhibit C#5 Exhibit D#6 Exhibit E#7 Exhibit F)(Toups, Mitchell)
May 21, 2007 Filing 73 RESPONSE in Opposition re #53 MOTION to Strike portions of verified shareholder derivative complaint filed by Peter A Pedroli. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Toups, Mitchell)
May 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #64 Motion to Suspend Requirement for Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 5/17/2007. (baf, )
May 16, 2007 Filing 71 RESPONSE in Support re #64 MOTION to Suspend Requirement for Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Albert H Taddiken, Walter S Ciciora, James H Clardy, Steven Craddock, Anthony J LeVecchio, Bernard T Marren, William P Tai, A Travis White, Douglas J Bartek, Rob-Roy J Graham, William L Housley, John P Norsworthy, Nancy A Richardson, Everett Rogers, Harvey B Cash, Jack D Furst, Kenneth G Langone, Eric Lindberg, Lawrence D Stuart, Jr, Philippe von Stauffenberg, Microtune Inc, Justin M Chapman, James A Fontaine, Robert S Kirk, Barry Koch, Jeffrey A Kupp, Phillip D Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B)(Woodcock, David)
May 15, 2007 Filing 70 RESPONSE in Opposition re #64 MOTION to Suspend Requirement for Rule 26(f) Conference, #67 MOTION for Joinder in Certain Defendants' Expedited Motion to Suspend Requirements for Rule 26(f) Conference (Replaces Docket No. 69) filed by Peter A Pedroli. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Toups, Mitchell)
May 15, 2007 Filing 69 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE, TO BE REFILED*** RESPONSE in Opposition re #64 MOTION to Suspend Requirement for Rule 26(f) Conference, #67 MOTION for Joinder in Certain Defendants' Expedited Motion to Suspend Requirements for Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Peter A Pedroli. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Denying Certain Defendants' Expedited Motion to Suspend Requirement for Rule 26(f) Conference)(Toups, Mitchell) Modified on 5/15/2007 (ttm, ).
May 15, 2007 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 69, Response to motion. PLEASE IGNORE. To be Refiled *** (ttm, )
May 14, 2007 Filing 68 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Martin Englmeier. (baf, )
May 14, 2007 Filing 67 ***CORRECTED DOCUMENT REPLACES DOCUMENT #66 WHICH WAS FILED IN ERROR***NOTICE OF JOINDER in Certain Defendants' EXPEDITED MOTION to Suspend Requirements for Rule 26(f) Conference by Douglas J Bartek. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Even, Nicholas) Modified on 5/15/2007 (baf, ).
May 14, 2007 Filing 66 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - ATTORNEY MUST REFILE***MOTION for Joinder in Certain Defendants' Expedited Motion to Suspend Requirement for Rule 26(f) Conference by Douglas J Bartek. (Even, Nicholas) Modified on 5/14/2007 (baf, ).
May 14, 2007 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the MOTION FOR JOINDER IN CERTAIN DEFENDANT'S EXPEDITED MOTION TO SUSPEND REQUIREMENT FOR RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE submitted DOCUMENT #66 - MOTION DOES NOT HAVE A CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE - ALSO NO PROPOSED ORDER IS ATTACHED. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
May 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER that the plaintiff shall file an EXPEDITED RESPONSE to the EXPEDITED MOTION TO SUSPEND REQUIREMENT FOR RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE DKT #64 . The plaintiff must file his response with the court by Tuesday, May 15, 2007 at 5:00 p.m. re #64 MOTION to Suspend Requirement for Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Microtune Inc,, Everett Rogers,, Nancy A Richardson,, William L Housley,, James A Fontaine,, James H Clardy,, William P Tai,, Harvey B Cash,, Walter S Ciciora,, Steven Craddock,, Anthony J LeVecchio,, Justin M Chapman,, Robert S Kirk,, Barry Koch,, Jeffrey A Kupp,, Phillip D Peterson,, Albert H Taddiken,, Bernard T Marren,, A Travis White,, Rob-Roy J Graham,, John P Norsworthy,, Jack D Furst,, Kenneth G Langone,, Eric Lindberg,, Lawrence D Stuart, Jr, Philippe von Stauffenberg. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 5/11/2007. (baf, )
May 10, 2007 Filing 64 MOTION to Suspend Requirement for Rule 26(f) Conference by Albert H Taddiken, Walter S Ciciora, James H Clardy, Steven Craddock, Anthony J LeVecchio, Bernard T Marren, William P Tai, A Travis White, Rob-Roy J Graham, William L Housley, John P Norsworthy, Nancy A Richardson, Everett Rogers, Harvey B Cash, Jack D Furst, Kenneth G Langone, Eric Lindberg, Lawrence D Stuart, Jr, Philippe von Stauffenberg, Microtune Inc, Justin M Chapman, James A Fontaine, Robert S Kirk, Barry Koch, Jeffrey A Kupp, Phillip D Peterson. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Woodcock, David) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/14/2007 (baf, ).
May 8, 2007 Filing 63 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Martin Englmeier. (baf, )
May 8, 2007 Filing 62 MOTION to Dismiss Replaces Motion #61 by Douglas J Bartek. (Attachments: #1 Appendix #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Even, Nicholas)
May 8, 2007 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Motion to Dismiss #61 submitted, the attorney's log in and password doesn't match the signing attorney. Correction should be made by one business day (ttm, )
May 7, 2007 Filing 61 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, ATTORNEY MUST REFILE*** MOTION to Dismiss by Douglas J Bartek. (Attachments: #1 Appendix In Support of Motion to Dismiss by Douglas J. Bartek)(Howell, Barrett) Modified on 5/8/2007 (ttm, ).
April 18, 2007 Filing 60 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Martin Englmeier. (baf, )
April 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER TO CONDUCT RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE - Rule 26 Meeting Joint Written Report due by 6/4/2007. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 4/17/2007. (baf, )
April 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING #57 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #40 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Supporting Brief, #53 MOTION to Strike portions of verified shareholder derivative complaint, #50 MOTION to Dismiss Verified Complaint, #44 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support Thereof, #47 MOTION to Dismiss VERIFIED SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT AS AGAINST DEFENDANT NANCY A. RICHARDSON, #49 MOTION to Dismiss Shareholder Derivative Complaint, #43 MOTION to Dismiss Shareholder Derivative Complaint and Joinder in the Motion to Dismiss of Certain Directors and Officers. Responses due by 5/21/2007. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 4/17/2007. (baf, )
April 16, 2007 Filing 57 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #43 MOTION to Dismiss Shareholder Derivative Complaint and Joinder in the Motion to Dismiss of Certain Directors and Officers, #50 MOTION to Dismiss Verified Complaint, #47 MOTION to Dismiss VERIFIED SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT AS AGAINST DEFENDANT NANCY A. RICHARDSON, #40 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Supporting Brief, #53 MOTION to Strike portions of verified shareholder derivative complaint, #44 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support Thereof, #49 MOTION to Dismiss Shareholder Derivative Complaint by Peter A Pedroli. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Extending Deadlines)(Toups, Mitchell)
April 12, 2007 Filing 56 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed - Everett Rogers waiver sent on 3/8/2007, answer due 5/7/2007. (baf, )
April 10, 2007 Filing 55 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Shawn Cleveland on behalf of Everett Rogers (Cleveland, Christopher)
April 10, 2007 Filing 54 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bruce William Collins on behalf of Everett Rogers (Collins, Bruce)
April 5, 2007 Filing 53 MOTION to Strike portions of verified shareholder derivative complaint by Nancy A Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Motion to strike portions of verified shareholder derivative complaint by Nancy A. Richardson#2 Errata Correction to previously filed motion to strike)(Resley, Susan)
April 5, 2007 Filing 52 NOTICE by Albert H Taddiken, Walter S Ciciora, James H Clardy, Steven Craddock, Anthony J LeVecchio, Bernard T Marren, William P Tai, A Travis White, John P Norsworthy, Harvey B Cash, Jack D Furst, Kenneth G Langone, Eric Lindberg, Lawrence D Stuart, Jr, Philippe von Stauffenberg, Justin M Chapman, James A Fontaine, Robert S Kirk, Barry Koch, Jeffrey A Kupp, Phillip D Peterson re #50 MOTION to Dismiss Verified Complaint (Woodcock, David)
April 4, 2007 Filing 51 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed - Douglas J Bartek waiver sent on 3/8/2007, answer due 5/7/2007. (baf, )
April 4, 2007 Filing 50 MOTION to Dismiss Verified Complaint by Albert H Taddiken, Walter S Ciciora, James H Clardy, Anthony J LeVecchio, Bernard T Marren, William P Tai, A Travis White, John P Norsworthy, Harvey B Cash, Jack D Furst, Kenneth G Langone, Eric Lindberg, Lawrence D Stuart, Jr, Philippe von Stauffenberg, Justin M Chapman, James A Fontaine, Robert S Kirk, Barry Koch, Jeffrey A Kupp, Phillip D Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of David R. Woodcock, Jr.#2 Exhibit Index#3 Exhibit 1#4 Exhibit 2#5 Exhibit 3#6 Exhibit 4#7 Exhibit 5#8 Exhibit 6#9 Exhibit 7#10 Exhibit 8#11 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Woodcock, David)
April 4, 2007 Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss Shareholder Derivative Complaint by Microtune Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
April 4, 2007 Filing 48 ***ATTORNEY FILED IN ERROR - PLEASE IGNORE***MOTION to Strike PORTIONS OF VERIFIED SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT by Nancy A Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT NANCY A. RICHARDSON'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF VERIFIED SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT)(Resley, Susan) Modified on 4/5/2007 (baf, ).
April 4, 2007 Filing 47 MOTION to Dismiss VERIFIED SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT AS AGAINST DEFENDANT NANCY A. RICHARDSON by Nancy A Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT)(Resley, Susan)
April 4, 2007 Filing 46 ***PLEASE IGNORE - THESE ARE ONLY PROPOSED ORDERS FOR DKT #44***Additional Attachments to Main Document: #44 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support Thereof.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wray, Wilson) Modified on 4/5/2007 (baf, ).
April 4, 2007 Filing 45 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #44 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support Thereof.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix #2 Exhibit 1#3 Exhibit 2#4 Exhibit 3#5 Exhibit 4#6 Exhibit 5#7 Exhibit 6#8 Exhibit 7#9 Exhibit 8)(Wray, Wilson)
April 4, 2007 Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support Thereof by Rob-Roy J Graham. (Wray, Wilson) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/5/2007 (baf, ).
April 4, 2007 Filing 43 MOTION to Dismiss Shareholder Derivative Complaint and Joinder in the Motion to Dismiss of Certain Directors and Officers by William L Housley. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bessette, Paul) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/11/2007 (baf, ).
April 4, 2007 Filing 42 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy W Mountz on behalf of Microtune Inc (Mountz, Timothy)
April 4, 2007 Filing 41 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mary L Scott on behalf of Microtune Inc (Scott, Mary)
April 4, 2007 Filing 40 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Supporting Brief by Everett Rogers. (Shumway, Sharon) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/4/2007 (pad, ).
March 30, 2007 Filing 39 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Susan D Resley for Nancy A Richardson (FEE PAID). (baf, )
March 30, 2007 Filing 38 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jason L Krajcer (FEE PAID). (baf, )
March 28, 2007 Filing 37 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by William L Housley waiver sent on 3/19/2007, answer due 5/18/2007. (baf, )
March 26, 2007 Filing 36 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed - Steven Craddock waiver sent on 3/8/2007, answer due 5/7/2007. (baf, )
March 26, 2007 Filing 35 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed - A Travis White waiver sent on 3/8/2007, answer due 5/7/2007. (baf, )
March 26, 2007 Filing 34 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed - John P Norsworthy waiver sent on 3/8/2007, answer due 5/7/2007. (baf, )
March 26, 2007 Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed - Robert S Kirk waiver sent on 3/8/2007, answer due 5/7/2007. (baf, )
March 26, 2007 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed - Phillip D Peterson waiver sent on 3/8/2007, answer due 5/7/2007. (baf, )
March 12, 2007 Filing 31 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed Eric Lindberg served on 3/6/2007, answer due 3/26/2007. (baf, )
February 28, 2007 Filing 30 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed Kenneth G Langone served on 2/22/2007, answer due 3/14/2007. (baf, )
February 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 2/26/2007. (baf, )
February 23, 2007 Filing 28 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James E Miller. (FEE PAID) (baf, )
February 23, 2007 Filing 27 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Karen M Leser. (FEE PAID) (baf, )
February 23, 2007 Filing 26 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nathan C Zipperian. (FEE PAID) (baf, )
February 23, 2007 Filing 21 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or Otherwise Respond by Albert H Taddiken, Walter S Ciciora, James H Clardy, Steven Craddock, Anthony J LeVecchio, Bernard T Marren, William P Tai, A Travis White, John P Norsworthy, Jack D Furst, Eric Lindberg, Lawrence D Stuart, Jr, Philippe von Stauffenberg, Justin M Chapman, James A Fontaine, Robert S Kirk, Barry Koch, Jeffrey A Kupp, Phillip D Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond)(Hirschman, Karen)
February 22, 2007 Filing 25 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Eric Lindberg on 2/22/2007. THE PREVIOUS SUMMONS #3 ISSUED TO ERIC LINDBERG WAS INADVERTENTLY ISSUED TO THE WRONG PERSON WITH THE SAME NAME. (baf, )
February 22, 2007 Filing 24 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed A Travis White served on 2/12/2007, answer due 3/5/2007. (baf, ) (baf, ).
February 22, 2007 Filing 23 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed Lawrence D Stuart, Jr served on 2/14/2007, answer due 3/6/2007. (baf, )
February 22, 2007 Filing 22 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed Philippe von Stauffenberg served on 2/13/2007, answer due 3/5/2007. (baf, )
February 16, 2007 Filing 20 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed Jack D Furst served on 2/8/2007, answer due 2/28/2007. (baf, )
February 16, 2007 Filing 19 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed Anthony J LeVecchio served on 2/14/2007, answer due 3/6/2007. (baf, )
February 16, 2007 Filing 18 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed Jeffrey A Kupp served on 2/14/2007, answer due 3/6/2007. (baf, )
February 15, 2007 Filing 17 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed William P Tai served on 2/12/2007, answer due 3/5/2007. (baf, )
February 15, 2007 Filing 16 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed Bernard T Marren served on 2/12/2007, answer due 3/5/2007. (baf, )
February 15, 2007 Filing 15 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed Albert H Taddiken served on 2/12/2007, answer due 3/5/2007. (baf, )
February 15, 2007 Filing 14 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed Barry Koch served on 2/12/2007, answer due 3/5/2007. (baf, )
February 15, 2007 Filing 13 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed Nancy A Richardson served on 2/12/2007, answer due 3/5/2007. (baf, )
February 15, 2007 Filing 12 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed Rob-Roy J Graham served on 2/12/2007, answer due 3/5/2007. (baf, )
February 15, 2007 Filing 11 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed James H Clardy served on 2/9/2007, answer due 3/1/2007. (baf, )
February 15, 2007 Filing 10 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed Walter S Ciciora served on 2/13/2007, answer due 3/5/2007. (baf, )
February 15, 2007 Filing 9 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed Harvey B Cash served on 2/12/2007, answer due 3/05/2007. (baf, ) Modified on 2/16/2007 (baf, ).
February 14, 2007 Filing 8 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed James A Fontaine served on 2/9/2007, answer due 3/1/2007. (baf, )
February 14, 2007 Filing 7 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed Justin M Chapman served on 2/7/2007, answer due 2/27/2007. (baf, )
February 6, 2007 Filing 6 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Re-Issued as to A Travis White with amended address. (dlc, )
February 5, 2007 Filing 5 Affidavit in Support of #1 Complaint.. (Toups, Mitchell) Modified on 2/5/2007 (fal, ).
January 31, 2007 Filing 4 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to A Travis White and returned to attorney for service. (ttm, )
January 31, 2007 Filing 3 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Albert H Taddiken, Walter S Ciciora, James H Clardy, Steven Craddock, Anthony J LeVecchio, Bernard T Marren, William P Tai, Douglas J Bartek, Martin Englmeier, Rob-Roy J Graham, William L Housley, John P Norsworthy, Nancy A Richardson, Everett Rogers, Harvey B Cash, Jack D Furst, Kenneth G Langone, Eric Lindberg, Lawrence D Stuart, Jr, Philippe von Stauffenberg, Microtune Inc, Justin M Chapman, James A Fontaine, Robert S Kirk, Barry Koch, Jeffrey A Kupp, Phillip D Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Fontaine summons#2 Kirk summons#3 Koch summons#4 Kupp summons#5 Peterson summons#6 Taddiken summons#7 Ciciora summons#8 Clardy summons#9 Craddock summons#10 Levecchio summons#11 Marren summons#12 Tai summons#13 Bartek summons#14 Englmeier sumons#15 Graham summons#16 Housley summons#17 Norsworthy summons#18 Richardson summons#19 Rogers summons#20 Cash summons#21 Furst summons#22 Langone summons#23 Lindberg summons#24 Stuart summons#25 von Stauffenberg summons#26 Microtune Inc summons)(baf, )
January 31, 2007 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form and Notice of Case Assignment e-mailed to Peter A Pedroli (Attachments: #1 Notice of Case Assignment) (baf, )
January 31, 2007 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants (Filing fee $ 350;receipt #4-1-1420), filed by Peter A Pedroli. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(baf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pedroli v. Chapman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everett Rogers
Represented By: Bruce William Collins
Represented By: C Shawn Cleveland
Represented By: David R Woodcock, Jr
Represented By: Sharon Julie Shumway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin M Chapman
Represented By: David R Woodcock, Jr
Represented By: Karen Lee Hirschman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A Fontaine
Represented By: David R Woodcock, Jr
Represented By: Karen Lee Hirschman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert S Kirk
Represented By: David R Woodcock, Jr
Represented By: Karen Lee Hirschman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Koch
Represented By: David R Woodcock, Jr
Represented By: Karen Lee Hirschman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey A Kupp
Represented By: David R Woodcock, Jr
Represented By: Karen Lee Hirschman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip D Peterson
Represented By: David R Woodcock, Jr
Represented By: Karen Lee Hirschman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert H Taddiken
Represented By: David R Woodcock, Jr
Represented By: Karen Lee Hirschman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter S Ciciora
Represented By: David R Woodcock, Jr
Represented By: Karen Lee Hirschman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James H Clardy
Represented By: David R Woodcock, Jr
Represented By: Karen Lee Hirschman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Craddock
Represented By: David R Woodcock, Jr
Represented By: Karen Lee Hirschman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony J LeVecchio
Represented By: David R Woodcock, Jr
Represented By: Karen Lee Hirschman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard T Marren
Represented By: David R Woodcock, Jr
Represented By: Karen Lee Hirschman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P Tai
Represented By: David R Woodcock, Jr
Represented By: Karen Lee Hirschman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Travis White
Represented By: David R Woodcock, Jr
Represented By: Karen Lee Hirschman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas J Bartek
Represented By: Nicholas Even
Represented By: Barrett Reid Howell
Represented By: David R Woodcock, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Englmeier
Represented By: David R Woodcock, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob-Roy J Graham
Represented By: David R Woodcock, Jr
Represented By: Jim L Flegle
Represented By: Wilson E Wray, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William L Housley
Represented By: David R Woodcock, Jr
Represented By: Paul Richard Bessette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John P Norsworthy
Represented By: David R Woodcock, Jr
Represented By: Karen Lee Hirschman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A Richardson
Represented By: David R Woodcock, Jr
Represented By: Jason L Krajcer
Represented By: Susan D Resley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buddy Rogers
Represented By: Bruce William Collins
Represented By: C Shawn Cleveland
Represented By: David R Woodcock, Jr
Represented By: Sharon Julie Shumway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvey B Cash
Represented By: David R Woodcock, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack D Furst
Represented By: David R Woodcock, Jr
Represented By: Karen Lee Hirschman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth G Langone
Represented By: David R Woodcock, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Lindberg
Represented By: David R Woodcock, Jr
Represented By: Karen Lee Hirschman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence D Stuart, Jr
Represented By: David R Woodcock, Jr
Represented By: Karen Lee Hirschman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philippe von Stauffenberg
Represented By: David R Woodcock, Jr
Represented By: Karen Lee Hirschman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microtune Inc
Represented By: Timothy W Mountz
Represented By: Clyde Moody Siebman
Represented By: David R Woodcock, Jr
Represented By: Mary L Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter A Pedroli
Represented By: Mitchell A Toups
Represented By: James E Miller
Represented By: Karen M Leser
Represented By: Nathan C Zipperian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brian Peter Zater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jonathan Lee Riches
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mark Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?