Clems Ye Olde Homestead Farms Ltd et al v. Briscoe et al

Plaintiff: Clarence T Clem, Jr, Kelly Clem, Clems Ye Olde Homestead Farms Ltd, Bettye Crider Clem and Clarence Truman Clem
Defendant: Bill Briscoe, Hensley Industries Inc, Robert Ramirez and LBJ Trucking Co Inc
Case Number: 4:2007cv00285
Filed: June 12, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: Denton
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Don D. Bush
Presiding Judge: Richard A. Schell
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:6901 Environmental Cleanup Expenses
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 277 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Janet Briscoe. (re: 333 Report and Recommendations). "...Janet Briscoe's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 277) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part." Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 7/27/09. (cm, )
February 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 294 MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE for 244 Report and Recommendations, re: DENYING 97 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Clarence T Clem, Jr, GRANTING 179 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by Hensley Industries Inc, DENYING 112 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Clems Ye Olde Homestead Farms Ltd, GRANTING as to the "A" claim 180 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by LBJ Trucking Co Inc, Robert Ramirez, G RANTING as to the "A" claim 118 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Hensley Industries Inc. "All motions for Summary Judgement on the "B" violation are DENIED; and Clem's Ltd's complaint for tort is DISMISSED for lack of standing." Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 2/13/09. (cm, ) Modified on 7/8/2009 (ttm, ).
December 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 244 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Partial, Against Hensley Industries, Inc. filed by Clarence T Clem, Jr, 179 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Plaintiffs f iled by Hensley Industries Inc, 112 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Partial, Against Bill Briscoe and Brief in Support filed by Clems Ye Olde Homestead Farms Ltd, 180 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Plaintiffs filed by LBJ Trucking Co Inc, Robert Ramirez, 118 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against Plaintiffs) filed by Hensley Industries Inc, ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Partial, Agains t Hensley Industries, Inc., 179 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Plaintiffs, 112 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Partial, Against Bill Briscoe and Brief in Support, 180 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against P laintiffs, 118 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against Plaintiffs), 216 MOTION to Continue Abate or Alternatively, to Extend Defendants' Expert Designation Deadlines and for Continuance :( M otion Hearing set for 12/10/2008 02:30 PM in Ctrm 108 (Plano) before Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush. on Defendant Hensley Industries Motion to Abate). Signed by Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush on 12/6/2008. (pad, ) Modified on 12/29/2008 (fnt, ). Modified on 7/8/2009 (ttm, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clems Ye Olde Homestead Farms Ltd et al v. Briscoe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence T Clem, Jr
Represented By: James B McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Clem
Represented By: James B McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clems Ye Olde Homestead Farms Ltd
Represented By: James B McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bettye Crider Clem
Represented By: James B McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Truman Clem
Represented By: James B McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Briscoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hensley Industries Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LBJ Trucking Co Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?