Dwyer v. Corinth et al
Plaintiff: Deanna Dwyer
Defendant: The City of Corinth, Debra Bradley, Kevin Tyson, Craig Hubbard, Carson Crowe and Taser International, Inc.
Mediator: Mary M Burdin
Case Number: 4:2009cv00198
Filed: October 23, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
Presiding Judge: Amos L. Mazzant
Presiding Judge: Michael H. Schneider
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE for: GRANTING 68 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Craig Hubbard, GRANTING 66 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by The City of Corinth, 104 Report and Recomm endations, GRANTING 67 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Carson Crowe, GRANTING IN PART DENIED IN PART 69 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Kevin Tyson. Plaintiffs cause of action for failure to intervene is dismissed. Plaintiffs cause of action for use of excessive force is not dismissed. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 8/18/10. (cm, )
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 11/17/2009. (pad, )
March 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION AND ORDER - For the reason stated herein, venue is proper in the Sherman Division, and the defendants have satisfied their burden of showing that the balance of convenience and justice substantially weighs in favor of transfer in this case. The defendants have shown good cause by demonstrating that the transferee venue is clearly more convenient. Accordingly, Defendants Motion to Transfer is GRANTED. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/30/09. (ch, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dwyer v. Corinth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanna Dwyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph Whitten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Corinth
Represented By: Stephen Douglas Henninger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Bradley
Represented By: Stephen Douglas Henninger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Tyson
Represented By: Stephen Douglas Henninger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Hubbard
Represented By: Stephen Douglas Henninger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carson Crowe
Represented By: Stephen Douglas Henninger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taser International, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Dickson Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: Mary M Burdin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?