Beatty v. Director, TDCJ-CID
Defendant: Director, TDCJ-CID
Petitioner: Tracy Lane Beatty
Case Number: 4:2009cv00225
Filed: May 13, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: Smith
Presiding Judge: Richard A. Schell
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT re 45 MOTION to Alter Judgment Under Rule 60(b)(6) filed by Tracy Lane Beatty. Petitioners motion for relief from the judgment pursuant to Federal Rule ofCivil Procedure 60(b)(6) (docket entry #45) is DENIED. A certificate of appealability should be denied. All motions not previously ruled on are DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/31/17. (cm, )
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. ORDERED that the petition for a writ of habeas corpus is DENIED and the case is DISMISSED with prejudice. It is further ORDERED that a certificate of appealability is DENIED. It is finally ORDERED that all motions not previously ruled on are DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 7/16/2013. (kls, )
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ***DISREGARD DOCKETED IN WRONG CASE***ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS It is therefore, ORDERED that Defendant's Renewed Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 03/03/2010. (lhj, ) Modified on 3/4/2010 (lhj, ).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beatty v. Director, TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tracy Lane Beatty
Represented By: Jeff Lynn Haas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?