Winegarner v. Cinemark Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Peter David Winegarner
Defendant: Cinemark Holdings, Inc., Cinemark Movies 8 of Lewisville, TX, Sarah Van Zandt, Roy Williams, Daniel Spears, City of Lewisville, TX, Lewisville TX Police Department and Ryan Maly
Case Number: 4:2009cv00627
Filed: December 18, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: Denton
Presiding Judge: Amos L. Mazzant
Presiding Judge: Michael H. Schneider
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 2/29/2012. (pad, )
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 72 Report and Recommendations, it is ORDERED that the City of Lewisville, Texas, City of Lewisville Police Department, City of Lewisville Police Chief Russ Kerbow, City of Lewisville City Manager Claude King and City of Lewisville Police Detective Ryan Maly's motion to dismiss is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff's case against the City of Lewisville, Texas, City of Lewisville Police Department, City of Lewisville Police Chief Russ Kerbow, City of Lewisville City Manager Claude King and City of Lewisville Police Detective Ryan Maly should be DISMISSED with prejudice. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 01/04/2010. (lhj, )
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 10 Motion to Dismiss, Motion for More Definite Statement filed by Cinemark Holdings, Inc., 23 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Lewisville TX Police Department, Ryan Maly, City of Lewisville, TX are DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 07/21/2010. (lhj, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winegarner v. Cinemark Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter David Winegarner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cinemark Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cinemark Movies 8 of Lewisville, TX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Van Zandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Spears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Lewisville, TX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewisville TX Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Maly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?