Perritt et al v. The Cupcakery, et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Ricky B Perritt, The Cupcakery, Buster Baking and The Woodlands Baking, LLC
Defendant: The Cupcakery and Pamela F. Jenkins
Counter_claimant: The Cupcakery and Pamela F. Jenkins
Counter_defendant: Buster Baking, Ricky B Perritt, The Cupcakery and The Woodlands Baking, LLC
Case Number: 4:2011cv00023
Filed: January 14, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: Denton
Presiding Judge: Amos L. Mazzant
Presiding Judge: Michael H. Schneider
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2011 Filing 113 FINAL JUDGMENT. All relief not previously granetd is hereby denied. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 12/28/2011. (pad, )
December 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting 111 Motion to Dismiss Claims with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 12/28/2011. (pad, )
December 21, 2011 Filing 111 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Claims with Prejudice by Buster Baking, Custom Version Corporation, Pamela F. Jenkins, Ricky B Perritt, The Cupcakery, The Cupcakery, The Woodlands Baking, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Slater, Jodie)
October 26, 2011 Filing 110 REPORT of Mediation by Molly Buck Richard. Mediation result: Impasse(Richard, Molly)
August 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER GRANTING 108 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 8/24/2011. (baf, )
August 24, 2011 Filing 108 ***CORRECTED DOCUMENT REPLACES DOCUMENT 107 WHICH WAS FILED IN ERROR***MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Buster Baking, Ricky B Perritt, The Cupcakery, The Woodlands Baking, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wood, Richard) Modified on 8/25/2011 (baf, ).
August 24, 2011 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL submitted DOCUMENT 107 - NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
August 23, 2011 Filing 107 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - ATTORNEY MUST REFILE*** MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Buster Baking, Ricky B Perritt, The Cupcakery, The Woodlands Baking, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wood, Richard) Modified on 8/24/2011 (baf, ).
August 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 98 Report and Recommendations, DENYING 24 Motion to Change Venue filed by The Cupcakery, Pamela F. Jenkins. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 8/10/2011. (baf, )
August 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER WITHDRAWING 101 Motion for Protective Order; GRANTING 104 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 8/10/2011. (baf, )
August 9, 2011 Filing 104 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 101 Opposed MOTION for Protective Order by Buster Baking, Ricky B Perritt, The Cupcakery, The Woodlands Baking, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barnes, Stephanie)
August 8, 2011 Mediation packet, mediation letter, mediation order and docket sheet mailed to mediator. Mediation Report deadline set for 11/14/2011 (baf, )
August 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION - The Court hereby ORDERS that this case be submitted to mediation in accordance with this Court's Mediation Plan. The parties have agreed upon Molly Buck Richard to mediate this case. The mediation conference shall be conducted by the following date: 11/14/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 8/8/2011. (baf, )
August 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER GRANTING 100 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 67 Scheduling Order, filed by The Woodlands Baking, LLC, The Cupcakery, Ricky B Perritt, Buster Baking. It is ORDERD that all remaining deadlines (with the exception of the deadline to complete required mediation) contained in the Scheduling/docket control Order 67 are extended by 10 weeks; specifically, the following deadlines are amended as follows: the deadline to exchange privilege logs is 10/17/2011; Final Pretrial Conference and Trail Scheduling set for 7/9/2012 at 9:00 AM. Discovery Deadline 1/16/2012. Expert Witnesses and Reports on Issues for which the party bears the burden of proof is 11/16/2011. Expert Witnesses and Reports on Issues for which the party does not bear the burden of proof is 12/16/2011. The deadline to file any objections to or motions to strike or exclude expert testimony is 1/30/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 1/30/2012. The deadline for pretrial disclosures is 3/16/2012. The deadline to file pretrial materials is 6/11/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 8/8/2011. (baf, )
August 4, 2011 Filing 101 ***ORDER WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO ORDER 105 ***Opposed MOTION for Protective Order by Ricky B Perritt, The Cupcakery, The Woodlands Baking, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barnes, Stephanie) Modified on 8/10/2011 (baf, ).
August 4, 2011 Filing 100 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 67 Scheduling Order, by Buster Baking, Ricky B Perritt, The Cupcakery, The Woodlands Baking, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barnes, Stephanie)
July 29, 2011 Filing 99 NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Molly Buck Richard, filed by Buster Baking, Ricky B Perritt, The Cupcakery, The Woodlands Baking, LLC. (Barnes, Stephanie)
July 18, 2011 Filing 98 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 24 MOTION to Change Venue filed by The Cupcakery, Pamela F. Jenkins. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 7/18/2011. (baf, )
July 11, 2011 Filing 97 NOTICE by Buster Baking, Ricky B Perritt, The Cupcakery, The Woodlands Baking, LLC re 90 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Supplemental Surreply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue (Notice of Filing of Supplemental Certificate of Conference) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Barnes, Stephanie)
July 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER GRANTING 92 Motion to Seal Document 93 Sealed Response to Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 7/11/2011. (baf, )
July 8, 2011 Filing 95 REPLY to Response to Motion re 90 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Supplemental Surreply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Buster Baking, Ricky B Perritt, The Cupcakery, The Woodlands Baking, LLC. (Barnes, Stephanie)
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER GRANTING 89 Sealed Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 7/8/2011. (baf, )
July 8, 2011 Filing 93 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 90 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Supplemental Surreply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Pamela F. Jenkins, The Cupcakery. (Slater, Jodie)
July 8, 2011 Filing 92 MOTION to Seal Document by Pamela F. Jenkins, The Cupcakery. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Slater, Jodie)
July 7, 2011 Filing 91 SEALED SUPPLEMENTAL SURREPLY to Response to Motion re 24 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Buster Baking, Ricky B Perritt, The Cupcakery, The Woodlands Baking, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Barnes, Stephanie)
July 7, 2011 Filing 90 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Supplemental Surreply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue by Buster Baking, Ricky B Perritt, The Cupcakery, The Woodlands Baking, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barnes, Stephanie)
July 7, 2011 Filing 89 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave and Supplemental Surreply Brief In Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue by Buster Baking, Ricky B Perritt, The Cupcakery, The Woodlands Baking, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barnes, Stephanie)
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting 86 Motion to Seal Plaintiff's Surreply Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 7/5/2011. (pad, )
June 27, 2011 Filing 87 SEALED SURREPLY to Motion re 24 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Buster Baking, Ricky B Perritt, The Cupcakery, The Woodlands Baking, LLC. (Siebman, Clyde)
June 27, 2011 Filing 86 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Surreply Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue by Buster Baking, Ricky B Perritt, The Cupcakery, The Woodlands Baking, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER GRANTING 83 Motion to Seal Document. It is ORDERED that plaintiffs may file Plaintiffs' Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Defendants' Amended Counterclaims under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 6/20/2011. (baf, )
June 17, 2011 Filing 84 Sealed Document. Plaintiffs' Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Defendants' Amended Counterclaims. (Siebman, Clyde)
June 17, 2011 Filing 83 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document (Plaintiffs' Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Defendants' Amended Counterlcaims by Buster Baking, Ricky B Perritt, The Cupcakery, The Woodlands Baking, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
June 17, 2011 Filing 82 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 24 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Pamela F. Jenkins, The Cupcakery. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Pamela Jenkins)(Slater, Jodie)
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 81 PROTECTIVE ORDER CONCERNING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 6/16/2011. (baf, )
June 10, 2011 Filing 80 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 64 Opposed MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Confidential Information filed by Buster Baking, Ricky B Perritt, The Cupcakery, The Woodlands Baking, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Siebman, Clyde)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER deferring ruling on 64 Motion for Protective Order and the parties shall submit a proposed joint protective order by noon on Friday, June 10, 2011. If agreement cannot be reached, the parties shall submit the portions that are agreed and note the sections that are contested.Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 6/6/11. (Mazzant, Amos)
June 2, 2011 Filing 79 REPLY to Response to Motion re 64 Opposed MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Confidential Information filed by Pamela F. Jenkins, The Cupcakery. (Slater, Jodie)
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER GRANTING 76 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Plead or otherwise Respond to Defendants' Amended Counterclaims. Plaintiff's shall have through 6/17/2011 to Answer, Plead, or otherwise respond to defendants' Amended Counterclaims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 6/2/2011. (baf, )
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER GRANTING 75 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 24 MOTION to Change Venue. Replies due by 6/17/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 6/2/2011. (baf, )
June 1, 2011 Filing 76 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, or Plead, or Otherwise Respond to Defendants' Amended Counterclaims by Buster Baking, Ricky B Perritt, The Cupcakery, The Woodlands Baking, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
June 1, 2011 Filing 75 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 24 MOTION to Change Venue, 73 Sealed Response to Motion, by Pamela F. Jenkins, The Cupcakery. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Slater, Jodie)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER GRANTING 72 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 5/31/2011. (baf, )
May 27, 2011 Filing 73 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 24 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Buster Baking, Ricky B Perritt, The Cupcakery, The Woodlands Baking, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Perritt Declaration, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
May 27, 2011 Filing 72 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Response Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue by Buster Baking, Ricky B Perritt, The Cupcakery, The Woodlands Baking, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
May 26, 2011 Filing 71 RESPONSE in Opposition re 64 Opposed MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Confidential Information filed by Buster Baking, Ricky B Perritt, The Cupcakery, The Woodlands Baking, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
May 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER GRANTING 69 Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue. The deadline to respond is extended to 5/27/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 5/23/2011. (baf, )
May 21, 2011 Filing 69 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Deadline to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue by Buster Baking, Ricky B Perritt, The Cupcakery, The Woodlands Baking, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
May 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/5/2012 09:00 AM in Ctrm A01 (Sherman - Annex) before Judge Michael H. Schneider. Amended Pleadings due by 6/23/2011. Discovery due by 11/7/2011. Joinder of Parties due by 6/23/2011. Mediation Completion due by 11/14/2011. Motions due by 11/21/2011. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/6/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 5/20/2011. (pad, )
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER GRANTING 65 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue. The deadline to respond is extended to 5/23/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 5/11/2011. (baf, )
May 10, 2011 Filing 65 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue by Buster Baking, Ricky B Perritt, The Cupcakery, The Woodlands Baking, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
May 9, 2011 Filing 64 Opposed MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Confidential Information by Pamela F. Jenkins, The Cupcakery. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Slater, Jodie)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING 61 Motion to Seal Document 62 Sealed Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 5/6/2011. (baf, )
May 4, 2011 Filing 62 Sealed Document. Joint Discovery Case Management Plan (Siebman, Clyde)
May 4, 2011 Filing 61 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document by Buster Baking, Ricky B Perritt, The Cupcakery, The Woodlands Baking, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
May 4, 2011 Filing 60 NOTICE of Disclosure by Pamela F. Jenkins, The Cupcakery (Slater, Jodie)
April 29, 2011 Filing 59 NOTICE of Disclosure by Buster Baking, Ricky B Perritt, The Cupcakery, The Woodlands Baking, LLC (Siebman, Clyde)
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING 55 Motion to Seal Document 56 SEALED MOTION Motion for Leave to File Amended Counterclaims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 4/20/2011. (baf, )
April 20, 2011 Filing 57 Sealed Document. (Slater, Jodie)
April 20, 2011 Filing 56 SEALED MOTION Motion for Leave to File Amended Counterclaims by Pamela F. Jenkins, The Cupcakery. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Slater, Jodie)
April 15, 2011 Filing 55 MOTION to Seal Document by Pamela F. Jenkins, The Cupcakery. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Slater, Jodie)
April 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING 52 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 4/14/2011. (baf, )
April 8, 2011 Filing 53 Plaintiffs' Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Defendants' Original Counterclaims (Barnes, Stephanie)
April 8, 2011 Filing 52 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Defendants' Original Counterclaims by Ricky B Perritt. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barnes, Stephanie)
March 25, 2011 Filing 51 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by Pamela F. Jenkins, The Cupcakery.(Slater, Jodie)
March 24, 2011 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the ANSWER submitted DOCUMENT 45 - DOCUMENT IS NOT SIGNED BY THE ATTORNEY AND DOES NOT CONTAIN A CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
March 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING 48 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 3/24/2011. (baf, )
March 23, 2011 Filing 49 Sealed Document. Plaintiffs' Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Defendants' Counterclaims (Siebman, Clyde)
March 23, 2011 Filing 48 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Defendants' Counterclaims by Buster Baking, Ricky B Perritt, The Cupcakery, The Woodlands Baking, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
March 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING 46 Motion to conduct the Deposition of Pamela Jenkins on 4/12/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 3/23/2011. (baf, )
March 22, 2011 Filing 46 Joint MOTION to Conduct the Deposition of Pamela Jenkins On April 12, 2011 by Buster Baking, Ricky B Perritt, The Cupcakery, The Woodlands Baking, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
March 21, 2011 Filing 45 ***NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY ENTERED - ATTORNEY MUST REFILE*** Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by Pamela F. Jenkins, The Cupcakery.(Slater, Jodie) Modified on 3/24/2011 (baf, ).
March 16, 2011 Filing 44 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Pamela F. Jenkins, The Cupcakery (Slater, Jodie)
March 16, 2011 Filing 43 NOTICE by Buster Baking, Ricky B Perritt, The Cupcakery, The Woodlands Baking, LLC of Certificate of Interested Persons (Siebman, Clyde)
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 21 Motion to Dismiss.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 3/11/2011. (baf, )
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING 34 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 24 Motion to Transfer Venue. It is ORDERED that Ms. Jenkins shall present for a deposition within 30 days from the signing of this order, to be held in Las Vegas. It is further ORDERED that the deadline for Plaintiffs to respond to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue is hereby extended until 14 days after Plaintiffs receive the transcript of Ms. Jenkins' deposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 3/11/2011. (baf, )
March 11, 2011 Filing 40 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 34 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 24 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Pamela F. Jenkins, The Cupcakery. (Slater, Jodie)
March 10, 2011 Filing 39 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephanie Rene' Barnes on behalf of Buster Baking, Ricky B Perritt, The Cupcakery, The Woodlands Baking, LLC (Barnes, Stephanie)
March 10, 2011 Filing 38 REPLY to Response to Motion re 34 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 24 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Buster Baking, Ricky B Perritt, The Cupcakery, The Woodlands Baking, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Siebman, Clyde)
March 10, 2011 Filing 37 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bryan Hillary Burg on behalf of Buster Baking, Ricky B Perritt, The Cupcakery, The Woodlands Baking, LLC (Burg, Bryan)
March 9, 2011 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition re 34 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 24 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Pamela F. Jenkins, The Cupcakery. (Slater, Jodie)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER that the Defendants shall file a Response to 34 Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 24 MOTION to Change Venue on or before 3/9/2011 AT 12:00 pm. Plaintiffs may file any reply no later than 3/10/2011 at 12:00 p.m.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 3/7/2011. (baf, )
March 3, 2011 Filing 34 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 24 MOTION to Change Venue by Buster Baking, Ricky B Perritt, The Cupcakery, The Woodlands Baking, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING 29 Motion to Seal Amended Complaint and Accompanying Exhibits Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 3/3/2011. (baf, )
March 2, 2011 Filing 32 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Testimony of Pamela F. Jenkins held on 1/31/2011 before Judge Mazzant. Court Reporter/Transcriber: David Maxwell,Telephone number: 903/892-8634. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/28/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/7/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/3/2011. (pad, )
March 2, 2011 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re 21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Buster Baking, Ricky B Perritt, The Cupcakery, The Woodlands Baking, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
March 2, 2011 Filing 30 Sealed Document. Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint and Verified Application For Injunctive Relief (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Siebman, Clyde)
March 2, 2011 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Buster Baking, Ricky B Perritt, The Cupcakery, The Woodlands Baking, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
March 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER TO MEET, REPORT AND APPEAR AT SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - Scheduling Conference set for 5/11/2011 at 11:00 AM in Ctrm A01 (Sherman - Annex) before Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant. Hold a meeting as required by FRCP 26(f) by 4/27/2011. Rule 26 Meeting Joint Report due by 5/4/2011. Deadline to file Motions to Transfer 4/27/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 3/2/2011. (baf, )
March 2, 2011 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Buster Baking, Ricky B Perritt, The Cupcakery, The Woodlands Baking, LLC by The Cupcakery, Pamela F. Jenkins.(Slater, Jodie)
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING 25 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 21 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 3/2/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 2/28/2011. (baf, )
February 25, 2011 Filing 25 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 21 MOTION to Dismiss by Buster Baking, Ricky B Perritt, The Cupcakery, The Woodlands Baking, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
February 24, 2011 Filing 24 MOTION to Change Venue by Pamela F. Jenkins, The Cupcakery. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Slater, Jodie)
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 AGREED ORDER regarding 3 Motion for TRO. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 2/10/2011. (pad, ) Modified on 2/10/2011 (pad, ).
February 9, 2011 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint by Pamela F. Jenkins, The Cupcakery.(Slater, Jodie)
February 9, 2011 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss by Pamela F. Jenkins, The Cupcakery. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Slater, Jodie)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING 19 Motion to Seal. It is ORDERED that the Clerk place the following documents under seal: 1 Original Complaint, 3 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Without Notice, 10 Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Without Notice, and Hearing Transcript from hearing dated 1/31/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 2/7/2011. (baf, )
February 7, 2011 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION to Seal by Pamela F. Jenkins, The Cupcakery. (Slater, Jodie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/7/2011: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (snh, ).
February 7, 2011 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jodie Annette Slater on behalf of Pamela F. Jenkins, The Cupcakery (Slater, Jodie)
February 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Without Notice filed by The Woodlands Baking, LLC, The Cupcakery, Ricky B Perritt, Buster Baking. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 2/2/2011. (pad, )
January 31, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant: Motion Hearing held on 1/31/2011 re 10 Sealed MOTION (Court Reporter D. Maxwell.) (dm, )
January 31, 2011 Filing 16 CONSENT to Magistrate Judge Disposition on Motion by Buster Baking, Pamela F. Jenkins, Ricky B Perritt, The Cupcakery, The Cupcakery, The Woodlands Baking, LLC re 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Without Notice Motion referred to Amos L. Mazzant. (tls, )
January 31, 2011 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clyde Moody Siebman on behalf of Buster Baking, Ricky B Perritt, The Cupcakery, The Woodlands Baking, LLC (Siebman, Clyde)
January 28, 2011 Filing 14 NOTICE OF PROOF OF SERVICE by Buster Baking, Ricky B Perritt, The Cupcakery, The Woodlands Baking, LLC re 11 Order on Motion for TRO (baf, )
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DENYING 10 Motion for TRO. In order to proceed with the hearing on 1/31/2011 at 10:00 a.m., Plaintiff must prove he has served defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 1/26/2011. (baf, )
January 25, 2011 Filing 13 Return of Service Executed as to Pamela F. Jenkins on 1/18/2011, answer due: 2/8/2011. (baf, )
January 25, 2011 Filing 12 Return of Service Executed as to The Cupcakery on 1/18/2011, answer due: 2/8/2011. (baf, )
January 25, 2011 Filing 10 Amended MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Without Notice by Buster Baking, Ricky B Perritt, The Cupcakery, The Woodlands Baking, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Emails, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B: Las Vegas Sun Article, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C: EIN News Report)(Whitten, Michael)
January 18, 2011 Filing 9 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Pamela F. Jenkins. (baf, )
January 18, 2011 Filing 8 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to The Cupcakery. (baf, )
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Without Notice : Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2011 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 1/18/2011. (baf, )
January 16, 2011 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available here by clicking on the hyperlink and is also on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (pad, )
January 14, 2011 Filing 6 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant Pursuant to a Standing Order. (pad, )
January 14, 2011 Filing 5 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Schneider. (pad, )
January 14, 2011 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Without Notice by Buster Baking, Ricky B Perritt, The Cupcakery, The Woodlands Baking, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Temporary Restraining Order, # 2 Affidavit Affidavit of Ricky B. Perritt, # 3 Affidavit Certificate of Efforts, # 4 Summons(es) Summons - Cupcakery, # 5 Summons(es) Summons - Pamela Jenkins)(Whitten, Michael)
January 14, 2011 Filing 2 ***REPLACED WITH DOCUMENT #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Without Notice by Buster Baking, Ricky B Perritt, The Cupcakery, The Woodlands Baking, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Temporary Restraining Order Without Notice)(Whitten, Michael) Modified on 1/16/2011 (pad, ).
January 14, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pamela F. Jenkins, The Cupcakery ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-2843231.), filed by The Woodlands Baking, LLC, Buster Baking, The Cupcakery, Ricky B Perritt. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Whitten, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perritt et al v. The Cupcakery, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cupcakery
Represented By: Jodie Annette Slater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela F. Jenkins
Represented By: Jodie Annette Slater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky B Perritt
Represented By: Stephanie Rene' Barnes
Represented By: Bryan Hillary Burg
Represented By: Clyde Moody Siebman
Represented By: Michael Joseph Whitten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Cupcakery
Represented By: Stephanie Rene' Barnes
Represented By: Bryan Hillary Burg
Represented By: Clyde Moody Siebman
Represented By: Michael Joseph Whitten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Buster Baking
Represented By: Stephanie Rene' Barnes
Represented By: Bryan Hillary Burg
Represented By: Clyde Moody Siebman
Represented By: Michael Joseph Whitten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Woodlands Baking, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie Rene' Barnes
Represented By: Bryan Hillary Burg
Represented By: Clyde Moody Siebman
Represented By: Michael Joseph Whitten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: The Cupcakery
Represented By: Jodie Annette Slater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Pamela F. Jenkins
Represented By: Jodie Annette Slater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Buster Baking
Represented By: Clyde Moody Siebman
Represented By: Michael Joseph Whitten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Ricky B Perritt
Represented By: Clyde Moody Siebman
Represented By: Michael Joseph Whitten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: The Cupcakery
Represented By: Clyde Moody Siebman
Represented By: Michael Joseph Whitten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: The Woodlands Baking, LLC
Represented By: Clyde Moody Siebman
Represented By: Michael Joseph Whitten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?