PaDRE Nterprises, Inc. v. Rhea
Plaintiff: PaDRE Nterprises, Inc.
Defendant: Hugh Gary Rhea
Case Number: 4:2011cv00674
Filed: October 20, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Don D. Bush
Presiding Judge: Richard A. Schell
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 184 Report and Recommendations. Plaintiffs Motion Seeking Attorney Fees and Imposing Sanctions for Discovery Abuse (Dkt. 125) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part and Plaintiffs shall be awarded $6,000 in attorneys fees as costs. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 4/14/15. (cm, )
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE for 126 Motion for Summary Judgment and 124 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 7/2/2014. (pad, )
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re 84 MOTION to Strike 79 Notice of Discovery Disclosure Defendant's Experts filed by H. Paul Newhouse, 108 Supplemental MOTION to Strike 79 Notice of Discovery Disclosure Defendant's Expert, William C. Berry, C.P.A. The motions to strike (Dkts. 84 & 108) are DENIED as to Wendy Carlson and GRANTED as to William Berry and he shall not be permitted to present expert testimony herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush on 8/13/13. (cm, )
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 63 Motion to Dismiss filed by PaDRE Nterprises, Inc., 87 Report and Recommendations, 65 Motion to Dismiss filed by Hugh Gary Rhea. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/18/13. (cm, )
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 63 Third MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by PaDRE Nterprises, Inc.. Within fourteen (14) days after service of the magistrate judges report, any party may serve and file written objections to the findings and recommendations of the magistrate judge.28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(C). Signed by Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush on 1/31/13. (cm, )
September 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 41 Memorandum & Opinion, Report and Recommendations, 10 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed by Hugh Gary Rhea. Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 10) is GRANTED as to the quashing of the service but DENIED as to the request for dismissal. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 9/28/12. (cm, )
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM OPINION, ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 26 MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's First Amended Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Hugh Ga ry Rhea, 10 MOTION Re-Urge Motion to Dismiss filed by Hugh Gary Rhea. Within fourteen (14) days after service of the magistrate judges report, any party may serve and file written objections to the findings and recommendations of the magistrate judge. 28 U.S.C.A. § 636(b)(1)(C). Signed by Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush on 3/29/12. (cm, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PaDRE Nterprises, Inc. v. Rhea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PaDRE Nterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Emily D Newhouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugh Gary Rhea
Represented By: David M Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?