Bond Street Ltd, LLC. v. Liess et al
Plaintiff: Bond Street Ltd, LLC.
Defendant: Randall Wade Shumway, Cicero Research, LLC and Michael Liess
Case Number: 4:2012cv00755
Filed: December 5, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: Collin
Presiding Judge: Ron Clark
Presiding Judge: Amos L. Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 54 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Michael Liess, 60 Report and Recommendations. Defendant Michael Liesss Motion for Entry of Final Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. It is f urther ORDERED that Plaintiffs claims for fraud, fraudulent inducement, and negligent misrepresentation are DISMISSED. The parties shall proceed to trial on Plaintiffs remaining claims, which are for breach of fiduciary duty and breach of the duty of good faith and fairdealing. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 9/19/14. (cm, )
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 55 Report and Recommendations, DENYING 33 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Michael Liess, GRANTING 46 Motion for Reconsideration, filed by Bond Street Ltd, LLC.. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 9/11/14. (cm, )
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Denying as Moot 32 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Michael Liess. Plaintiff should file its amended complaint within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 3/31/14. (cm, )
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE for 9 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/25/2013. (pad, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bond Street Ltd, LLC. v. Liess et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Wade Shumway
Represented By: Jesse Keith Shumway
Represented By: Jennie Christine Knapp
Represented By: Neil Ross Burger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cicero Research, LLC
Represented By: Neil Ross Burger
Represented By: Jennie Christine Knapp
Represented By: Jesse Keith Shumway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Liess
Represented By: Steve Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bond Street Ltd, LLC.
Represented By: Scott Ryan Doody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?