Allen v. Noah Precision, LLC
Plaintiff: Brian Allen
Defendant: Noah Precision, LLC
Counter_claimant: Noah Precision, LLC
Counter_defendant: Brian Allen
Case Number: 4:2014cv00611
Filed: September 23, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: Collin
Presiding Judge: Don D. Bush
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND MOTION TO STRIKE re 117 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Noah Precision, LLC; re 139 Defendant's Motion to Strike. Defe ndant's. motion to strike (Dkt. 139) is DENIED as moot. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 117) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Summary judgment is GRANTED as to Plaintiff's fraudulent transfer claim and his b reach of contract claim related to the redemption of his Units, and DENIED as to Plaintiff's breach of contract and quantum meruit claims for business expenses. Those claims shall proceed to trial. As explained above, Defendant's motion to strike is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 7/5/2017. (kls, )
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS - The Court finds that neither the Lauda Defendants nor Defendant Adams have sufficient contacts with the State of Texas to establish general or specific jurisdiction over t hem. The Court also finds that Plaintiff has failed to state a claim for fraudulent transfer against Defendant Adams. Accordingly, Defendant Adams Motion to Dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction under Rule 12(b)(2) and for failure to state a clai m under Rule 12(b)(6) (Dkt. 77 ) is GRANTED, the Lauda Defendants Motion to Dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction under Rule 12(b)(2) (Dkt. 78 )is GRANTED, and Plaintiffs claims against said Defendants are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 11/2/2016. (baf, )
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 46 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Brief in Support filed by Peter M. Adams, GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 59 MOTION to Compel Rule 26(a) Disclosures Disclosures from Defendants, Lauda-Noah, LP, Lauda-Noah Management, Inc., and Peter M. Adams and to Compel Production of Documents and Answers to Interrogatories against Lauda-Noah, LP and Lauda-Noah Manageme filed by Brian Allen, DENYING 61 Sec ond MOTION to Compel to Permit Disclosure of Documents Previously Designated by Defendants as "Attorneys' Eyes Only" filed by Brian Allen, DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 47 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Bri ef in Support filed by Lauda-Noah, Lauda-Noah Management, DENYING 49 MOTION to Compel to permit Disclosure of Documents Previously Designated by Defendant as "ATTORNEYS' EYES ONLY" filed by Brian Allen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush on 3/28/2016. (baf, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Noah Precision, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Allen
Represented By: Susan J Foster
Represented By: Thomas J Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noah Precision, LLC
Represented By: Lori M Carr
Represented By: Susan Elizabeth Hannagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Noah Precision, LLC
Represented By: Lori M Carr
Represented By: Susan Elizabeth Hannagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Brian Allen
Represented By: Susan J Foster
Represented By: Thomas J Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?