October 12, 2017 |
Filing
250
MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE for 248 Report and Recommendations. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Texas Recovery Bureau, Inc., are DISMISSED for want of prosecution. All relief not previously granted is DENIED, and the Clerk is directed to CLOSE this civil action. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/12/2017. (baf, )
|
June 2, 2017 |
Filing
237
MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE for 233 Report and Recommendations. It is, therefore, ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Against Texas Recovery Bureau, Inc. for Failure to Appear (Dkt. 202 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/2/2017. (baf, )
|
April 12, 2017 |
Filing
231
MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE, for 225 Report and Recommendation. Having received the report of the United States Magistrate Judge, having considered each of Plaintiff's timely filed objec tions (Dkt. #228), and having conducted a de novo review, the Court is of the opinion that the findings and conclusions of the Magistrate Judge are correct and adopts the Magistrate Judge's report (Dkt. #225) as the findings and conclusions of the Court. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/12/2014. (kls, )
|
August 5, 2016 |
Filing
169
MEMORANDUM ADOPTING IN PART REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE for 160 Memorandum & Opinion, Order, Report and Recommendations. It is, therefore, ORDERED that Defendants Santander Consumer USA, Inc., Santander Consumer Ho lding USA, Inc. and Santander Holding USA, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint (Dkt. #118) is hereby GRANTED and the Santander Defendants are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice.It is further ORDERED that Defendants Motions to Dis miss (Dkt. #116; Dkt. #119; and Dkt. #129) are hereby DENIED. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs motions for reconsideration and for permission to appeal regarding her motions for summary judgment (Dkt. #157, #158, #159, #162) are hereby DENIED AS MOOT.. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/5/2016. (baf, )
|
December 2, 2015 |
Filing
160
MEMORANDUM OPINION, ORDER, AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re; denying as moot 102 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Santander Holding USA, Inc., Santander Consumer U SA Holding, Inc., 3 Complaint, filed by Jennifer K Abbott-Pope, 129 MOTION to Dismiss filed by PRA Receivables Management LLC, Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC, 116 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Beck & Masten Pontiac- GMC Inc, 119 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint and Memorandum of Law In Support filed by HSBC Financial Corporation, HSBC Auto Finance, Inc., 118 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended C omplaint filed by Santander Holding USA, Inc., Santander Consumer USA, Santander Consumer USA Holding, Inc. For these reasons, the Court finds that Beck & Masten Pontiac-GMC, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Dkt. 116), Defendants Santander Consumer USA, Inc. Santander Consumer Holding USA, Inc. and Santander Holding USA, Inc.'s Motion to Dism iss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Dkt. 118), HSBC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support (Dkt. 119), and PRA Receivables Management, LLC and Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 129) should be GRANTED. Within 21 days of the date of this report and recommendation, Plaintiff shall file a notice with the Court setting forth, with factual allegations and supporting authority, why her claims against Texas Recovery Bureau, Inc. did not accrue when her other claims did and would not also be barred by the statute of limitations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush on 12/2/2015. (kls, )
|
July 14, 2015 |
Filing
138
MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 105 Report and Recommendation, 117 Report and Recommendation. Therefore, pro se Plaintiff's motions for default judgment (Dkts. ##68, 69, 70, 71, 89, 90, 91, 92, 93, 106, 107, 108, 109, 110, 111, 112, 113, 114 & 115) are DENIED.Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/14/2015. (kls, )
|