Adams v. Trujillo, et al
Plaintiff: |
Rayshana Adams |
Defendant: |
McKinney ISD and Liliana Trujillo |
Counter_claimant: |
Liliana Trujillo |
Counter_defendant: |
Rayshana Adams |
Case Number: |
4:2014cv00762 |
Filed: |
November 21, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas |
Office: |
Sherman Office |
County: |
Collin |
Presiding Judge: |
Don D. Bush |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 6, 2016 |
Filing
102
MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT EVIDENCE - 93 Report and Recommendations, GRANTING 50 Motion for Summary Judgment file d by McKinney ISD, DENYING 98 MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Appendix in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Rayshana Adams. Plaintiff shall take nothing by her remaining claims here, Defendant shall be awarded its costs, and this matter shall be closed on the Courts docket. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/6/2016. (baf, )
|
April 13, 2016 |
Filing
93
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE 50 Fifth MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by McKinney ISD. Signed by Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush on 4/13/2016. (baf, ) Modified on 4/13/2016 (baf, ).
|
March 24, 2016 |
Filing
91
MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE for 84 Report and Recommendation - GRANTING 51 Motion to Dismiss filed by McKinney ISD, GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 31 Motion to Dismiss, filed b y McKinney ISD, GRANTING 30 Motion to Dismiss filed by Liliana Trujillo. The claims against Defendant Trujillo shall be dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiffs claims of hostile work environment against Defendant MISD remain pending at this time. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 3/24/2016. (baf, )
|
March 18, 2016 |
Filing
89
MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE for 69 Report and Recommendations, Order, DENYING 45 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 3/18/2016. (baf, )
|
February 26, 2016 |
Filing
84
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 51 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Tex. Civ. Prac. & Rem. Code Section 101.106(e) filed by McKinney ISD, 30 Amended MOTION to Dismiss filed by Liliana Trujillo. Signed by Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush on 2/26/2016. (baf, )
|
January 28, 2016 |
Filing
69
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 45 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Rayshana Adams., Within fourteen (14) days after service of the magistrate judges report, any party may serve and file written objections to the findings and recommendations of the magistrate judge. 28 U.S.C.A. § 636(b)(1)(C). Signed by Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush on 1/28/16. (cm, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?