Moore v. Williams et al
Plaintiff: Jimmy Moore
Defendant: Charles Williams, D. Rohoe, Rodger A. McDonald, Juan Marrono, D. Tompkins, M. B. Karl and Linda Richey
Case Number: 4:2014cv00825
Filed: December 17, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: Fannin
Presiding Judge: Don D. Bush
Presiding Judge: Ron Clark
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 AMENDED ORDER OF DISMISSAL ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 56 Report and Recommendations. It is accordingly ORDERED Defendant's motion to dismiss (Dkt. #49) is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/9/2018. (daj, )
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 56 Report and Recommendations. It is accordingly ORDERED Defendant's motion to dismiss (Dkt. #49) is GRANTED. It is also ORDERED Plaintiff's Complaint (Dkt. #1) pursuant to 42 U.S.C. §1983 is DISMISSED with prejudice against Defendant. All motions by either party not previously ruled upon are DENIED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/8/2018. (daj, )
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, re 25 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Karl's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss filed by M. B. Karl. The claims must be dismissed as Assistant Warden Karl is entitled to qualified immunity. In conclusi on, Plaintiff fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted; thus, Defendant's motion to dismiss must be granted. It is therefore ORDERED that Defendant Assistant Warden Karl's Rule 12(b)6) motion to dismiss (Dkt. #25) is GRANTED and the claims against her DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/27/2017. (kls, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Rohoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodger A. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Marrono
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. B. Karl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Richey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?