January 22, 2020 |
Filing
359
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER. Motion to Intervene, Request for Leave to File Action Against Receiver, and Request for Preliminary Injunction for Return of Seized Property (Dkt. # 296 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; Trinity Escrow, LLC's E mergency Request for Preliminary Injunction for Return of Seized Property (Dkt. # 314 ) is DENIED; Kingsbridge Capital, LLC's Emergency Motion to Intervene (Dkt. # 316 ) is DENIED; Kingsbridge Capital, LLC's Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction for Return of Possession of Seized Property (Dkt. # 317 ) is DENIED; Request for Concurrent Hearing on Emergency Motions by Julissa Martinez, Trinity Escrow, LLC, and Kingsbridge Capital, LLC (Dkt. # 318 ) is GRANTED; Trinity Escrow, LLC& #039;s Emergency Motion to Intervene (Dkt. # 319 ) is DENIED; Emergency Pro Se Motion to Intervene (Dkt. # 324 ) is DENIED; Emergency Pro Se Motion (Dkt. # 335 ) is DENIED; Emergency Pro Se Motion to Intervene (Dkt. # 336 ) is DENIED; Motion for Hearing (Dkt. # 337 ) is DENIED; Emergency Motion for Hearing (Dkt. # 338 ) is DENIED; Emergency Motion for Hearing (Dkt. # 339 ) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/22/2020. (rpc, )
|
February 27, 2018 |
Filing
274
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Defendant's pro se Motion to Retrieve Private Property and Effects from the Court Appointed Receiver (Dkt. # 272 ) is hereby DENIED at this time. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/27/2018. (rpc, )
|
August 7, 2017 |
Filing
266
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Granting 252 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) Plaintiff's Motion to Enter Judgment and Brief in Support filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Denying 258 MOTION to Amend/Correc t 238 Memorandum & Opinion. Defendant Sameer P. Sethi is PERMANENTLY RESTRAINED AND ENJOINED from violation of Sections 17(a) of the Securities Act of 1933 (Securities Act), 15 U.S.C. § 77q(a), and Section 10(b) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 (Exchange Act), 15 U.S.C. § 78j(b), and Rule 10b-5 thereunder, 17 C.F.R. § 240.10b-5. filed by Sameer P Sethi. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/7/17. (cm, )
|
April 4, 2017 |
Filing
260
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Granting in Part Denying in Part re 237 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds (Additional Funds Per Settlement or in the alternative Motion to Have the Court Enter a New Order on its Motion to Allow Interpleader and/or Motion to Reconsider and/or Vacate Orders Granting ANBTX's Motion to filed by American National Bank of Texas. the Courts previous Order Granting Motion to Approve Interpleader (Sethi Dkt. #134; Sambina Dkt. #35) is hereby reinstated. It is further ORDERED that American National is hereby discharged from further liability regarding the accounts and isDISMISSED with prejudice from the above styled cases. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/4/17. (cm, )
|
January 19, 2017 |
Filing
239
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 216 Statement of Costs Incurred as a Result of Contempt by Securities and Exchange Commission. Plaintiffs Statement of Costs Incurred as a Result of Contempt (Dkt. #216) is hereby GRANTED and Contemnors Sameer Sethi, Praveen Sethi, and John Weber are ordered to pay the SEC, jointly and severally, $33,160 as costs incurred in bringing the contempt motion. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/19/17. (cm, )
|
January 17, 2017 |
Filing
238
AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 195 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment As To Sameer Sethi and Brief In Support filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commissions Motion for Summary Judgment as to Sameer Sethi (Dkt. #195) is hereby GRANTED. The Court hereby withdraws its previous Memorandum Opinion and Order (Dkt. #232) and enters this order in its place. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/17/17. (cm, )
|
January 10, 2017 |
Filing
235
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 201 MOTION for Reconsideration re 169 Memorandum & Opinion, Contempt Order, filed by John R Weber. It is therefore ORDERED that Non-Party John R. Webers Motion for Reliefis hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/10/17. (cm, )
|
December 16, 2016 |
Filing
232
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 195 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment As To Sameer Sethi and Brief In Support filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/16/16. (cm, )
|
August 25, 2016 |
Filing
184
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING re 178 Emergency MOTION Emergency Motion filed by Praveen Sethi, GRANTING IN PART DENYING IN PART 176 MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by Sameer P Sethi. It is therefore ORDERED that Praveen s hall be imprisoned until he chooses to repay Cambrians investors and comply with the other provisions of the Courts Contempt Order. Praveen shall turn himself in to the U.S. Marshals Service, U. S. Courthouse Annex, 200 N. Travis Street, Mezzanine Level, Sherman, Texas, no later than 2:00 p.m. on August 26, 2016. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/25/16. (cm, )
|
August 18, 2016 |
Filing
175
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 137 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct Notice of Deficiency filed by Sameer P Sethi. It is therefore ORDERED that Defendant Sameer Sethis Amended Motion to Amend the Court Order to Permit an Interlocutory Appeal and in the Alternative Permit an Appeal Based on the Collateral Order Doctrine (Dkt. #137) is hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/18/16. (cm, )
|
August 10, 2016 |
Filing
171
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 120 MOTION First Interim Fee Application of Gardere Wynne Sewell LLP for Allowance of Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses filed by Marcus Helt. First Interim Fee Application of Gardere Wynne Sewell LLP for Allowance of Fees and Reimbursements of Expenses (Dkt. #120) is hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/10/16. (cm, )
|
June 8, 2016 |
Filing
135
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 131 MOTION to Allow Interpleader filed by American National Bank of Texas. It is therefore ORDERED that Intervenors, American National Bank of Texas, Motion to Allow Interpleader (Dkt. #131) is hereby GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART.American National is awarded attorneys fees in the amount of $8,120 and costs in the amount of $464.87. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/8/16. (cm, )
|
April 18, 2016 |
Filing
127
MEMORANDUM OPINION. It is therefore ORDERED that Defendants First Amended Motion for Judgment on thePleadings Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(c) and 9(b) (Dkt. #116) is herebyDENIED. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/18/16. (cm, )
|
July 1, 2015 |
Filing
50
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/1/2015. (baf, )
|