Daniels v. Texas Department of Transportation
Plaintiff: Jeffery B Daniels
Defendant: Texas Department of Transportation
Case Number: 4:2015cv00702
Filed: October 13, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: Grayson
Presiding Judge: Amos L. Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - It is therefore ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Reconsideration [Dkt. 74 ] and Defendants Motion for Reconsideration [Dkt. 75 ] are hereby DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 1/6/2017. (baf, )
December 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The Court finds that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment [Dkt. 30] should be GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART and that Defendants' Motion to Strike [Dkt. 45] should be DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 12/10/2016. (kkc, )
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 50 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction as to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Texas Department of Transportation, 17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Texas Department of Transportation. For the foregoing reasons, the Court finds that Defendants' First Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. 17] should be GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Defendants' First Motion to Dismiss should be DENIED as to the 12(b)(6) Arg ument and as to the Immunity Arguments, DENIED AS MOOT as to the Section 1981 Argument, and GRANTED as to the Statute of Limitations Argument. The Court further finds that Defendants' Second Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. 50] should be DENIED. Acco rdingly, it is therefore ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Dismissal [Dkt. 17] is hereby GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART and that Defendants' Motion for Partial Dismissal under Rule 12(b)(1) [Dkt. 50] is hereby DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 12/2/2016. (kls, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniels v. Texas Department of Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery B Daniels
Represented By: Robert Stephen Notzon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Department of Transportation
Represented By: Cristina Vudhiwat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?