Evicam International, Inc. v. Enforcement Video, LLC
Plaintiff: |
Evicam International, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Enforcement Video, LLC |
Mediator: |
Jeff Kaplan |
Case Number: |
4:2016cv00105 |
Filed: |
November 24, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas |
Office: |
Sherman Office |
County: |
Tyler |
Presiding Judge: |
Amos L. Mazzant |
Nature of Suit: |
Patent |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1338 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 5, 2017 |
Filing
155
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - It is therefore ORDERED that Enforcement Video, LLC d/b/a WatchGuard Video's Motion for Summary Judgment for Invalidity of U.S. Patent Nos. 6,211,907 and 6,950,013 for Un-Patentable Subject Matter Under Mayo/Alice (Dkt. 73 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/5/2017. (baf, )
|
February 28, 2017 |
Filing
89
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING re 45 Opposed MOTION for Protective Order filed by Evicam International, Inc.. WatchGuards deadline to designate expert witnesses with respect to the disputed prior art inventors is extended to no later than March 13, 2017. It is further ORDERED that Evicam may designate rebuttal expert witnesses with respect to the disputed prior art inventors until no later than March 27, 2017. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/28/17. (cm, )
|
November 8, 2016 |
Filing
60
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 24 MOTION to Amend/Correct for Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions filed by Enforcement Video, LLC. The Court hereby GRANTS WatchGuards Motion for Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions (Dkt. #24). Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 11/8/16. (cm, )
|
November 2, 2016 |
Filing
57
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The parties are ordered that they may not refer, directly or indirectly, to each others claim construction positions in the presence of the jury. Likewise, the parties are ordered to refrain from mentioning any portion o f this opinion, other than the actual definitions adopted by the Court, in the presence of the jury. Any reference to claim construction proceedings is limited to informing the jury of the definitions adopted by the Court. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 11/2/16. (cm, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?