Morse v. Codilis & Stawiarski, P.C. et al
Plaintiff: Gregory C Morse
Defendant: Codilis & Stawiarski, P.C., Ditech Financial, LLC and Ditech Financial, LLC, NA
Case Number: 4:2016cv00279
Filed: April 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: Collin
Presiding Judge: Christine A. Nowak
Presiding Judge: Amos L. Mazzant
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE for 127 Report and Recommendations. It is, therefore, ORDERED Ditech's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 86 ) is GRANTED, and that Plaintiff's claims ag ainst Ditech are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against Ditech Financial, LLC and Ditech Financial, LLC, National Association (Dkt. 104 ) and Plaintiff's Motion to St rike (Dkt. 111 ) are DENIED, and that each of Ditech's Motions for Protective Order (Dkts. 80 , 120 ), and Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (Dkt. 112 ) and Motion for Leave (Dkt. 123 ) are DENIED AS MOOT.. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9/25/2017. (baf, )
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE - DENYING AS MOOT 55 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Ditech Financial, LLC, re 128 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9/21/2017. (baf, )
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE - Having considered Plaintiff's timely filed objections (Dkt. #71), and having conducted a de novo review, the Court is of the opinion that the findings and concl usions of the Magistrate Judge are correct and adopts the Magistrate Judge's report (Dkt. #67) as the findings and conclusions of the Court. It is, ORDERED that Defendant Codilis & Stawiarski, P.C.'s Amended and Supplemental Rule 12(b)(6) Motions to Dismiss (Dkts. 54 , 56 ) is GRANTED, and Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Codilis & Stawiarski, P.C. are DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/5/2017. (baf, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morse v. Codilis & Stawiarski, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory C Morse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Codilis & Stawiarski, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ditech Financial, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ditech Financial, LLC, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?