Soniat v. Department of Housing and Urban Development et al
Plaintiff: Shelley Soniat
Defendant: Department of Housing and Urban Development, Don D Bush and Richard Schell
Case Number: 4:2016cv00337
Filed: May 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: Denton
Presiding Judge: Christine A. Nowak
Presiding Judge: Amos L. Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE for 106 Report and Recommendations. Therefore, the Court hereby adopts the findings and conclusions of the Magistrate Judge (Dkt. #106) as the findings and conclusions of this Court. It is, therefore, ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis for Appeal (Dkt. 97 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/28/2017. (baf, )
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ***PLEASE DISREGARD - INADVERTENTLY DOCKETED IN INCORRECT CASE BY CLERK***MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - It is therefore ORDERED that Defendant Younique, LLCs Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(3) 10 is hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/9/2017. (baf, ) Modified on 1/9/2017 (baf, ).
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 42 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/6/2017. (pad, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soniat v. Department of Housing and Urban Development et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelley Soniat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Housing and Urban Development
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don D Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Schell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?