OrthoAccel Technologies, Inc. v. Propel Orthodontics, LLC et al
Plaintiff: OrthoAccel Technologies, Inc.
Defendant: Propel Orthodontics, LLC and Propel Orthodontics USA, LLC
Case Number: 4:2016cv00350
Filed: May 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: Collin
Presiding Judge: Amos L. Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 331 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 278 SEALED MOTION Rule 56(d) to Deny or Defer Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Propel Orthodontics, LLC. Propel may supplement its response to OrthoAccels Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Counterclaims (Dkt. #263) within fourteen (14) days of the entry of this order. It is further ORDERED that OrthoAccel may submit a reply within seven (7) days of Propel filing its supplemented response. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/11/17. (cm, )
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 328 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Granting in Part re 317 SEALED MOTION to Compel Propel's Financials filed by OrthoAccel Technologies, Inc.. It is therefore ORDERED that Propel produce full monthly P&L statements from January 2014 through January 2017 by 5:00 p.m. on April 6, 2017. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/4/17. (cm, )
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 324 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 159 SEALED MOTION Partial Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaims or in the Alternative for a More Definite Statement filed by OrthoAccel Technologies, Inc.. Plaintiff OrthoAccel Technologies, Inc.s Partial Motion to Dismiss Defendants Counterclaims, or in the Alternative for a More Definite Statement (Dkt. #159) is hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/3/17. (cm, )
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 148 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 57 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Permanent Injunction filed by OrthoAccel Technologies, Inc.. Unless terminated earlier, this preliminary injunction shall expire upon the issuance of a final deci sion by the Court in this case. It is further ORDERED that this preliminary injunction shall not be effective unless and until Plaintiff has filed an appropriate bond or cash deposit in lieu thereof in the amount of $10,000. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/26/16. (cm, )
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 53 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Propel Orthodontics, LLC, Propel Orthodontics USA, LLC. Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Amended Complaint or, in the alternative, For a More Definite Statement (Dkt. #53) is hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9/19/16. (cm, )
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 9 MOTION for Discovery Expedited filed by OrthoAccel Technologies, Inc. Plaintiffs Motion for Expedited Discovery (Dkt. #9) is hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/13/16. (cm, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OrthoAccel Technologies, Inc. v. Propel Orthodontics, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OrthoAccel Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: James George Munisteri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Propel Orthodontics, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Ray Bragalone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Propel Orthodontics USA, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Ray Bragalone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?