Luci Bags LLC v. Younique, LLC

Plaintiff: Luci Bags LLC
Defendant: Younique, LLC
Case Number: 4:2016cv00377
Filed: June 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Ron Clark
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. It is therefore ORDERED that Defendant Younique, LLC's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Damage Claims and Jury Demand (Dkt. #85) is hereby GRANTED in part. As a result, Plaintiff's claim for punitive damages is hereby stricken. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/8/2018. (daj, )
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - DENYING 55 MOTION to Strike -- DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE REBECCA LUCAS AS AN EXPERT WITNESS -- filed by Younique, LLC. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9/28/2017. (baf, )
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. It is therefore ORDERED that Defendant Younique, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment based on the functionality of Plaintiff's Asserted Trade Dress (Dkt. #45) is hereby DENIED. This case should proceed to trial. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/1/2017. (daj, )
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Younique, LLC. ORDERED that Defendant Younique, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. #30) is hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/29/2017. (kls, )
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - It is therefore ORDERED that Defendant Younique, LLCs Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(3) 10 is hereby DENIED.. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/9/2017. (baf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luci Bags LLC v. Younique, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luci Bags LLC
Represented By: Zachary Wade Hilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Younique, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?