United States of America, ex rel Michael J. Fisher v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: United States of America, ex rel Michael J. Fisher, Michael J. Fisher, United States of America, Keith Franklin, Regina McPhaul, Chessa Hartfield and Reggie McPhaul
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Case Number: 4:2016cv00395
Filed: June 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER - GRANTING #173 Motion to Seal Their Brief in Response to Defendant's Motion to Compel the Production of Relators' Disclosure Statements. It is therefore ordered that Relators' Brief in Response to Defendants' Motion to Compel the Production of Relators' Disclosure Statements and all exhibits thereto remain under seal. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 3/23/2020. (baf, )
March 20, 2020 Filing 174 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #169 SEALED MOTION to Compel the Production of Relators' Disclosure Statements filed by Michael J. Fisher, Keith Franklin, Chessa Hartfield, Reggie McPhaul, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exh 1_Fisher Answers to First Set of Interrogatories, #2 Exh 2_Franklin First Amended Answers to First Set of Interrogatories, #3 Exh 3_Hartfield Amended Answers to First Set of Interrogatories, #4 Exh 4_ McPhaul Amended Answers to First Set of Interrogatories, #5 Exh 5_Fisher depo excerpts, #6 Exh 6_Hartfield depo excerpts, #7 Exh 7_McPhaul depo excerpts, #8 Exh 8_Franklin depo excerpts)(Sbaiti, Mazin)
March 20, 2020 Filing 173 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Relators' Brief in Response to Defendant's Motion to Compel the Production of Relators' Disclosure Statements by Michael J. Fisher, Keith Franklin, Chessa Hartfield, Jeff Kaplan, Reggie McPhaul, United States of America. (Sbaiti, Mazin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/20/2020: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (rpc, ).
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER granting #171 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Chase shall file its response to Relators' Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint on or before March 30, 2020. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 3/17/2020. (rpc, )
March 16, 2020 Filing 171 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #166 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosenberg, Jonathan)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER - GRANTING #165 Motion to File Under Seal Their Motion for Leave to File Relators' Seventh Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 3/11/2020. (baf, )
March 10, 2020 Filing 169 SEALED MOTION to Compel the Production of Relators' Disclosure Statements by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Asher Rivner in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Rivner, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Rivner, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Rivner, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Rivner, #6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Rivner, #7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Rivner, #8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Rivner, #9 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Rivner, #10 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Rivner, #11 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Rivner, #12 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Rivner, #13 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Rivner, #14 Exhibit 13 to Declaration of Rivner, #15 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosenberg, Jonathan)
March 10, 2020 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL THE PRODUCTION OF RELATORS' DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS submitted DOCUMENT #168 - NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
March 9, 2020 Counsel are reminded that the Court has not opted out of this court's Local Rules concerning courtesy copies; therefore, Counsel are asked to comply with Local Rule CV-5(a)(9) and Local Rule CV-10(b) with respect to sending courtesy copies to Judge Mazzant. Please send copies of pleadings that exceed 20 pages to Judge Mazzant's chambers. Please use tabs and dividers for exhibits, and please place voluminous pleadings in three-ring binder(s). (tls)
March 6, 2020 Filing 168 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD*** SEALED MOTION to Compel the Production of Relators' Disclosure Statements by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Asher Rivner in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Rivner, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Rivner, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Rivner, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Rivner, #6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Rivner, #7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Rivner, #8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Rivner, #9 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Rivner, #10 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Rivner, #11 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Rivner, #12 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Rivner, #13 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Rivner, #14 Exhibit 13 to Declaration of Rivner, #15 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosenberg, Jonathan) Modified on 3/10/2020 (baf, ).
March 6, 2020 Filing 167 AMENDED COMPLAINT against JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, filed by Keith Franklin, Reggie McPhaul, Chessa Hartfield, Michael J. Fisher.(Colquitt, Kevin)
March 6, 2020 Filing 166 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint by Michael J. Fisher, Keith Franklin, Chessa Hartfield, Reggie McPhaul. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (1) 7th Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit (2) Original Complaint, #3 Exhibit (3) Amended Interrogatory Responses of C. Hartfield, #4 Exhibit (4) Chase Loan Modification Spreadsheet, #5 Exhibit (5) Showalter Deposition Excperpts, #6 Exhibit (6) Handbook for Servicers, #7 Exhibit (7) Treasury Directive 10.01, #8 Exhibit (8) Delayed Conversions, #9 Exhibit (9) Issue Management Approval, #10 Exhibit (10) Specialty Modification Solutions, #11 Exhibit (11) Delayed Conversion-Capitalized Interest Issues, #12 Exhibit (12) Jan. 30, 2013 email, #13 Exhibit (13) Feb. 13, 2014 email, #14 Exhibit (14) Mar. 4, 2014 email, #15 Exhibit (15) Weekly Special Projects Meeting, #16 Exhibit (16) Oct. 13, 2015 email, #17 Exhibit (17) Black Knight Session Detail Loss Mitigation, #18 Exhibit (18) Mar. 16, 2016 email, #19 Text of Proposed Order)(Colquitt, Kevin)
March 6, 2020 Filing 165 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Relators' Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint by Michael J. Fisher, Keith Franklin, Chessa Hartfield, Reggie McPhaul. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Colquitt, Kevin)
March 5, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Telephone Conference to address a discovery dispute held on 3/5/2020. Court grants Defendant leave to file a SEALED motion to compel, with Local Rules to apply re: time for responsive briefing. United States may file a statement of interest. (Hearing digitally recorded.) (No attachment.) (tls)
March 3, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference to address a discovery dispute set for Thursday 3/5/2020 9:30 AM before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Attorneys are instructed to call the Conference Number at 9:25 AM: 888-363-4749; Access Code: 1588844, followed by #. (tls)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 164 THIRD SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/29/2021 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Proposed Jury instructions/Form of Verdict due by 12/30/2020. Mediation Completion due by 5/5/2020. Motions to dismiss, motions for summary judgment, or other dispositive motions due by 9/4/2020. Joint Final Pretrial Order due by 12/18/2020. The Court, after considering the parties' Joint Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order (Dkt. #163 ), finds good cause for entering the Third Amended Scheduling Order. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/13/2020. (baf, )
February 11, 2020 Filing 163 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #147 Scheduling Order,, Terminate Motions, by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Third Amended Scheduling Order)(Rosenberg, Jonathan)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 162 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. It is therefore ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Clarification or Reconsideration of the Court's September 9, 2019 Order (Dkt. #151 ) is hereby DENIED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/21/2020. (baf, )
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION. The Court hereby ORDERS that this case be submitted to mediation in accordance with this court's Mediation Plan. By agreement of the parties, the mediator assigned is the Hon. Jeff Kaplan (Ret.). Mediation Completion due by 5/5/2020. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/3/2019. (baf, )
November 27, 2019 Filing 160 NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Hon. Jeff Kaplan (Ret.), filed by Michael J. Fisher, Keith Franklin, Chessa Hartfield, Reggie McPhaul. (Sbaiti, Mazin)
November 20, 2019 Filing 159 NOTICE by Reggie McPhaul Notice of Intention to Take Deposition by Written Questions and Subpoena Duces Tecum to Black Knight, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Subpoena_Questions to Be Propounded, #2 Exhibit B to Subpoena_Document Requests)(Sbaiti, Mazin)
November 19, 2019 Filing 158 NOTICE of Change of Address by Mazin Ahmad Sbaiti (Sbaiti, Mazin)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 157 CORRECTED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 11/4/2019. (baf, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 156 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #112 Protective Order by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Corrected Protective Order, #2 Exhibit B - Corrected Protective Order (Redline)(Rosenberg, Jonathan)
October 31, 2019 Filing 155 REPLY to Response to Motion re #151 SEALED MOTION / Defendant's Reply in Further Support of its Motion for Clarification or Reconsideration of the Court's September 9, 2019 Order (Dkt. No. 148) filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Rosenberg, Jonathan)
October 22, 2019 Filing 154 RESPONSE in Opposition re #151 SEALED MOTION Plaintiffs-Relators' Response to Defendant's Motion for Clarification or Reconsideration of the Court's September 9, 2019 Order (Dkt. No. 148) filed by Michael J. Fisher, Keith Franklin, Chessa Hartfield, Reggie McPhaul, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sbaiti, Mazin)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER - GRANTING #152 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #151 SEALED MOTION. Responses due by 10/22/2019. Replies due by 10/31/2019. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/16/2019. (baf, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 152 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #151 SEALED MOTION Defendant's Motion for Clarification or Reconsideration of the Court's September 9, 2019 Order (Dkt. No.148) by Michael J. Fisher, Keith Franklin, Chessa Hartfield, Reggie McPhaul, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sbaiti, Mazin)
October 10, 2019 Filing 151 SEALED MOTION for Clarification or Reconsideration of the Court's September 9, 2019 Order (Dkt. NO. 148) by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(baf, )
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants Motion for Leave to File Under Seal its Motion for Clarification of the Courts September 9, 2019 Order is GRANTED. Defendants Motion for Clarification and accompanying exhibits (Dkt. #149-1) is hereby deemed filed. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/7/2019. (baf, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 149 Unopposed SEALED MOTION (Defendant's Unopposed Motion For Leave To File Under Seal Its Motion For Clarification Of The Court's September 9, 2019 Order) by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Motion for Clarification, #2 Exhibit A - Transcript)(Rosenberg, Jonathan)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. It is therefore ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Under the Public Disclosure Bar (Dkt. #106 ) is hereby DENIED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9/9/2019. (baf, )
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 147 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/1/2020., Jury instructions due by 12/30/2020., Mediation Completion due by 5/5/2020., Designation of Mediator due by 12/1/2019,, Motions due by 8/31/2020., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/18/2020. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/22/2019. (rpc, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 146 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mazin Ahmad Sbaiti on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sbaiti, Mazin)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER - GRANTING #144 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Samuel L. Boyd, Catherine C. Jobe, and the law firm of Boyd & Associates are hereby withdrawn as counsel for Co-Relators in the above captioned matter. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/19/2019. (baf, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 144 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Samuel L. Boyd & Catherine C. Jobe by Chessa Hartfield, Reggie McPhaul. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order granting motino for leave to withdraw)(Jobe, Catherine)
August 13, 2019 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL submitted DOCUMENTS #140 , #141 , #142 , #143 - A MOTION IS REQUIRED. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 143 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD***NOTICE by Chessa Hartfield re #138 Notice of Attorney Appearance (Withdrawal) (Jobe, Catherine) Modified on 8/13/2019 (baf, ).
August 12, 2019 Filing 142 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD***NOTICE by Reggie McPhaul re #135 Notice of Attorney Appearance (Withdrawal) (Jobe, Catherine) Modified on 8/13/2019 (baf, ).
August 12, 2019 Filing 141 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD***NOTICE by Reggie McPhaul re #136 Notice of Attorney Appearance (Withdrawal) (Boyd, Samuel) Modified on 8/13/2019 (baf, ).
August 12, 2019 Filing 140 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD***NOTICE by Chessa Hartfield re #137 Notice of Attorney Appearance (Withdrawal) (Boyd, Samuel) Modified on 8/13/2019 (baf, ).
August 9, 2019 Filing 139 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #113 Scheduling Order,, Joint Motion for Entry of New Scheduling Order by Michael J. Fisher, Keith Franklin, Chessa Hartfield, Reggie McPhaul, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Second Amended Scheduling Order, #2 Proposed Order)(Sbaiti, Mazin)
August 5, 2019 Filing 138 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Catherine Carlyle Jobe on behalf of Chessa Hartfield (Jobe, Catherine)
August 5, 2019 Filing 137 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Samuel L Boyd on behalf of Chessa Hartfield (Boyd, Samuel)
August 5, 2019 Filing 136 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Samuel L Boyd on behalf of Reggie McPhaul (Boyd, Samuel)
August 5, 2019 Filing 135 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Catherine Carlyle Jobe on behalf of Reggie McPhaul (Jobe, Catherine)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER - GRANTING #133 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Shawn L Raymond; Stephen Lee Shackelford, Jr; Laranda Moffett Walker; Geoffrey Lloyd Harrison and Jason Louis Lichtman terminated. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/22/2019. (baf, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 133 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Michael J. Fisher, Keith Franklin, Chessa Hartfield, Reggie McPhaul. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw as Counsel)(Shackelford, Stephen)
June 25, 2019 Filing 132 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD*** MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Michael J. Fisher, Keith Franklin, Chessa Hartfield, Reggie McPhaul. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw as Counsel)(Shackelford, Stephen) Modified on 6/25/2019 (baf, ).
June 25, 2019 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY submitted DOCUMENT #132 - NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE AND PROPOSED ORDER DOES NOT COMPLY WITH OUR LOCAL RULES. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 131 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mazin Ahmad Sbaiti on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sbaiti, Mazin)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER - GRANTING #129 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Action filed by Reggie McPhaul, Chessa Hartfield, Michael J. Fisher, Keith Franklin, United States of America. This case is STAYED for 60 days from the dateof this Order. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/25/2019. (baf, )
April 24, 2019 Filing 129 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Action by Michael J. Fisher, Keith Franklin, Chessa Hartfield, Reggie McPhaul, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lichtman, Jason) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/24/2019) (baf, ).
April 1, 2019 Filing 128 ANSWER to #115 Amended Complaint (JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.'s Answer To Sixth Amended Complaint) by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA.(Rosenberg, Jonathan)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting #124 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Chase shall file its response to Relators' Sixth Amended Complaint on or before April 1, 2019. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 3/8/2019. (rpc, )
March 8, 2019 Filing 126 RESPONSE in Opposition re #106 MOTION for Summary Judgment / Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Under Public Disclosure Bar filed by Michael J. Fisher, Keith Franklin, Chessa Hartfield, Reggie McPhaul. (Shackelford, Stephen)
March 6, 2019 Filing 125 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order by Michael J. Fisher, Keith Franklin, Chessa Hartfield, Reggie McPhaul. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order on Unopposed Motion to Modify Scheduling Order)(Shackelford, Stephen) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/6/2019) (baf, ).
March 6, 2019 Filing 124 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #115 Amended Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosenberg, Jonathan)
February 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER - GRANTING #114 Motion for Leave to File a Sixth Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/24/2019. (baf, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 122 REPLY to Response to Motion re #106 MOTION for Summary Judgment / Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Under Public Disclosure Bar filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Rosenberg, Jonathan)
February 20, 2019 Filing 121 RESPONSE in Support re #114 MOTION for Leave to File Sixth Amended Complaint filed by Michael J. Fisher, Keith Franklin, Chessa Hartfield, Reggie McPhaul. (Shackelford, Stephen)
February 19, 2019 Filing 120 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Daniel Strachan on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank NA (Strachan, Mark)
February 13, 2019 Filing 119 RESPONSE to Motion re #114 MOTION for Leave to File Sixth Amended Complaint filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Rosenberg, Jonathan)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER - GRANTING #116 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Darren P Nicholson terminated. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/7/2019. (baf, )
February 6, 2019 Filing 117 RESPONSE in Opposition re #106 MOTION for Summary Judgment / Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Under Public Disclosure Bar filed by Michael J. Fisher, Keith Franklin, Chessa Hartfield, Regina McPhaul. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Samuel L. Boyd, #2 Affidavit of Michael J. Fisher, #3 Affidavit of Keith Franklin, #4 Affidavit of Chezza Hartfield, #5 Affidavit of Reginald McPhaul)(Lichtman, Jason)
February 5, 2019 Filing 116 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nicholson, Darren)
January 30, 2019 Filing 115 AMENDED COMPLAINT , Sixth Amended against JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, filed by Keith Franklin, Reggie McPhaul, Chessa Hartfield, Michael J. Fisher.(Sanders, Roger)
January 30, 2019 Filing 114 MOTION for Leave to File Sixth Amended Complaint by Michael J. Fisher, Keith Franklin, Chessa Hartfield, Regina McPhaul. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sanders, Roger)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/31/2020 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Amended Pleadings due by 1/30/2019 for Relator and by 2/28/2019 for Defendant. Discovery due by 6/28/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 1/30/2019. Proposed Jury instructions/Form of Verdict due by 12/23/2019. Mediation Completion due by 10/1/2019. Designation of Mediator due by 8/15/2019. Motions to dismiss, motions for summary judgment, or other dispositive motions due by 8/21/2019. Joint Final Pretrial Order due by 12/9/2019. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/22/2019. (baf, )
January 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/12/2019. (baf, )
January 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE - GRANTING #107 Joint MOTION REQUESTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re #106 MOTION for Summary Judgment / Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Under Public Disclosure Bar filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/12/2019. (baf, )
January 7, 2019 Due to the Court's schedule, the 1/16/2019 Scheduling Conference is CANCELED. The Court will issue a Scheduling Order. (kkc, )
January 4, 2019 Filing 110 Agreed MOTION for Protective Order (Relators') by Michael J. Fisher, Keith Franklin, Chessa Hartfield, Regina McPhaul. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lichtman, Jason)
January 4, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR - PROPOSED ORDER ONLY - PLEASE DISREGARD. Document # 109, Submission of Scheduling Order. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (baf, )
January 3, 2019 Filing 109 ***PLEASE DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR***Submission of Proposed Agreed Protective order by Michael J. Fisher, Keith Franklin, Chessa Hartfield, Regina McPhaul . (Lichtman, Jason) Modified on 1/4/2019 (baf, ).
January 2, 2019 Filing 108 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Conference)(Shackelford, Stephen)
December 18, 2018 Filing 107 Joint MOTION REQUESTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re #106 MOTION for Summary Judgment / Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Under Public Disclosure Bar by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nicholson, Darren)
December 14, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 106 MOTION for Summary Judgment / Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Under Public Disclosure Bar by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Declaration of Darren Nicholson, #3 Exhibit 1 SPA, Jul. 31, 2009, #4 Exhibit 2 MHA Handbook, May 26, 2016, #5 Exhibit 3 NMS Complaint, #6 Exhibit 4 NMS Consent Order, #7 Exhibit 5 Summary of Compliance, Jun. 19, 2013, #8 Exhibit 6 Compliance Scorecard, Jun. 19, 2013, #9 Exhibit 7 Monitor Report, Dec. 4, 2013, #10 Exhibit 8 Compliance Scorecard, Dec. 4, 2013, #11 Exhibit 9 SIGTARP Report, Apr. 25, 2012, #12 Exhibit 10 SIGTARP Report, Jul. 25, 2012, #13 Exhibit 11 MHA Report, Jul. 2012, #14 Exhibit 12 SIGTARP Report, Oct. 25, 2012, #15 Exhibit 13 MHA Report, Oct. 2012, #16 Exhibit 14 MHA Report, Apr. 2013, #17 Exhibit 15 SIGTARP Report, Jul. 24, 2013, #18 Exhibit 16 MHA Report, Jul. 2013, #19 Exhibit 17 SIGTARP Report, Oct. 29, 2013, #20 Exhibit 18 SIGTARP Report, Jan. 29, 2014, #21 Exhibit 19 MHA Report, Apr. 2014, #22 Exhibit 20 SIGTARP Report, Jul. 30, 2014, #23 Exhibit 21 Stempel article, Jul. 30, 2012, #24 Exhibit 22 Dayen article, May 2, 2013, #25 Exhibit 23 McKim article, May 7, 2013, #26 Exhibit 24 Douglas article, Jun. 19, 2013, #27 Exhibit 25 Benson and Dougherty article, Sept. 11, 2013, #28 Exhibit 26 Panchuk article, Dec. 4, 2013, #29 Exhibit 27 Transcript, #30 Exhibit 28 Supplemental Directive, Jun. 29, 2010, #31 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosenberg, Jonathan)
December 11, 2018 Filing 105 JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.'s ANSWER to Complaint (Answer To Fifth Amended Complaint #71 ) by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA.(Rosenberg, Jonathan)
December 7, 2018 Filing 104 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Asher Rivner on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7053150. (Rivner, Asher)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 1/16/2019 at 2:00 PM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Rule 26 Meeting Joint Report due by 1/2/2019. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 11/27/2018. (baf, )
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER - GRANTING #101 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Chase shall file its answer to Relators' Fifth Amended Complaint by December 11, 2018. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 11/5/2018. (baf, )
November 2, 2018 Filing 101 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #71 Sealed Document Fifth Amended Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sayles, Richard)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. It is ORDERED that Chase's Motion to Strike Irrelevant Allegations from the Complaint and for a More Definite Statement (Dkt. #96 ) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/30/2018. (baf, )
July 23, 2018 Filing 99 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #96 Opposed MOTION to Strike #71 Sealed Document QUI TAM PLAINTIFFS/RELATORS' FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Michael J. Fisher, Keith Franklin, Chessa Hartfield, Regina McPhaul. (Shackelford, Stephen)
July 16, 2018 Filing 98 REPLY to Response to Motion re #96 Opposed MOTION to Strike #71 Sealed Document QUI TAM PLAINTIFFS/RELATORS' FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Nicholson, Darren)
July 2, 2018 Filing 97 RESPONSE in Opposition re #96 Opposed MOTION to Strike #71 Sealed Document QUI TAM PLAINTIFFS/RELATORS' FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Michael J. Fisher, Keith Franklin, Chessa Hartfield, Regina McPhaul. (Shackelford, Stephen)
May 31, 2018 Filing 96 Opposed MOTION to Strike #71 Sealed Document QUI TAM PLAINTIFFS/RELATORS' FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. Responses due by 7/2/2018 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jonathan Rosenberg, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Nicholson, Darren)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER - GRANTING #94 Motion to Unseal Document #61 Sealed Document. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's unopposed motion is granted and that the Fourth Amended Complaint (Dkt. #61 ) shall be immediately unsealed. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/31/2018. (baf, )
May 31, 2018 Filing 94 Unopposed MOTION to Unseal Document #61 Sealed Document Defendant's Unopposed Motion (I) to Unseal the Fourth Amended Complaint, or in the Alternative, (II) for Leave to File Under Seal Its Motion to Strike Irrelevant Allegations from the Complaint and for a More Definite Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order)(Nicholson, Darren)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES - GRANTING #92 Motion for Extension of Time to Extend Deadlines. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/30/2018. (baf, )
April 30, 2018 Filing 92 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nicholson, Darren) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/30/2018) (baf, ).
March 5, 2018 Filing 91 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Keith Franklin, Regina McPhaul, Chessa Hartfield, Michael J. Fisher, United States of America. Keith Franklin waiver sent on 3/2/2018, answer due 5/1/2018; Regina McPhaul waiver sent on 3/2/2018, answer due 5/1/2018; Chessa Hartfield waiver sent on 3/2/2018, answer due 5/1/2018; Michael J. Fisher waiver sent on 3/2/2018, answer due 5/1/2018; United States of America waiver sent on 3/2/2018, answer due 5/1/2018. (Lichtman, Jason)
February 7, 2018 Filing 90 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen Lee Shackelford, Jr on behalf of Michael J. Fisher, Keith Franklin, Chessa Hartfield, Regina McPhaul (Shackelford, Stephen)
February 7, 2018 Filing 89 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shawn L Raymond on behalf of Michael J. Fisher, Keith Franklin, Chessa Hartfield, Regina McPhaul (Raymond, Shawn)
February 7, 2018 Filing 88 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Geoffrey Lloyd Harrison on behalf of Michael J. Fisher, Keith Franklin, Chessa Hartfield, Regina McPhaul (Harrison, Geoffrey)
February 7, 2018 Filing 87 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Laranda Moffett Walker on behalf of Michael J. Fisher, Keith Franklin, Chessa Hartfield, Regina McPhaul (Walker, Laranda)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the Fifth Amended Complaints shall be unsealed thirty days after entry of this Order, and service upon defendant by the plaintiffs-relators is authorized. All sealed documents previously filed in this action shall remain under seal and not be made public, except for, thirty days after entry of this Order, plaintiff-relator's operative qui tam complaint, this Order, and the Government's Notice of Election to Decline Intervention. Thirty days after entry of this Order, the seal shall be lifted as to all other matters occurring in this action subsequent to the date of this Order. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/29/2017. (baf, )
December 27, 2017 Filing 85 SEALED NOTICE OF ELECTION TO DECLINE INTERVENTION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(baf, )
June 26, 2017 Filing 83 MOTION for Six-Month Extension of Time to Make an Election Decision by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(pad, )
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #81 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Chad Brian Walker; Elizabeth Danielle Thompson Williams; Michael Brett Johnson and Thomas M Melsheimer terminated. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/26/17. (cm, )
April 19, 2017 Filing 81 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney RELATORS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL OF RECORD by Michael J. Fisher, Keith Franklin, Chessa Hartfield, Regina McPhaul. (Melsheimer, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/20/2017: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (cm, ).
March 28, 2017 Filing 79 UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A THREE-MONTH EXTENSION OF TIME TO MAKE AN ELECTION DECISION by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(cm, )
March 27, 2017 Filing 78 UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION BY THE UNITED STATES THREE-MONTH EXTENSION OF TIME TO MAKE AN ELECTION DECISION by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(cm, )
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re #41 MOTION For Transfer To U.S. District Court For The District Of Columbia Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.s Motion to Transfer to U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia (Dkt. #41) is hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 3/27/17. (cm, )
March 13, 2017 Filing 76 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Motion Hearing held on 3/13/2017 re #41 MOTION For Transfer To U.S. District Court For The District Of Columbia Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Court Reporter Jan Mason.) (dm, )
March 10, 2017 Filing 75 NOTICE by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA re #41 MOTION For Transfer To U.S. District Court For The District Of Columbia Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) , #73 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, (Letter from Jonathan Rosenberg to The Honorable Amos L. Mazzant re March 13, 2017 Hearing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rosenberg, Jonathan)
March 9, 2017 Filing 74 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger D Sanders on behalf of Keith Franklin, Chessa Hartfield, Regina McPhaul (Sanders, Roger)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #41 MOTION For Transfer To U.S. District Court For The District Of Columbia Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) : Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2017 01:30 PM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/28/17. (cm, )
January 17, 2017 Filing 72 SEALED RESPONSE (RELATORS' RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF ON MOTION TO TRANSFER) by Keith Franklin, Regina McPhaul, Chessa Hartfield, Michael J. Fisher to #70 Sealed Response to Motion, filed by Keith Franklin, Regina McPhaul, Chessa Hartfield, Michael J. Fisher. (Melsheimer, Thomas)
January 17, 2017 Filing 71 Sealed Document. QUI TAM PLAINTIFFS/RELATORS' FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Melsheimer, Thomas)
January 6, 2017 Filing 70 SEALED SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR TRANSFER TO U.S. DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) re #41 MOTION For Transfer To U.S. District Court For The District Of Columbia Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Rosenberg, Jonathan)
January 6, 2017 Filing 69 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anton Metlitsky on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank NA (Metlitsky, Anton)
December 27, 2016 Filing 67 UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR THREE-MONTH EXTENSION OF TIME TO MAKE AN ELECTION DECISION by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(cm, )
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR THE COURT TO DEFER RULING AND ALLOW FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER #65 Motion. Defendants brief shall be due within 10 days after Relators FourthAmended Complaint is unsealed, and Relators brief shall be due 10 days after Defendantsbrief is filed. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 11/3/16. (cm, )
November 2, 2016 Filing 65 Unopposed MOTION For The Court To Defer Ruling And Allow For Supplemental Briefing On Defendant's Motion To Transfer by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosenberg, Jonathan)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING RELATORS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO FILE FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT UNDER SEAL AND FOR EXTENSION OF SERVICE DEADLINE granting #60 Motion to Seal Document #61 Sealed Document. Relators Fourth Amended Complaint (Dkt. #61), filed under seal concurrently with their Motion for Leave on October 21, 2016, is deemed properly filed, and the service deadline is extended to 120 days after the Court unseals the Fourth Amended Complaint. The Clerk is directed to unseal the Fourth Amended Complaint sixty (60) days after entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/27/16. (cm, )
October 25, 2016 Filing 63 RESPONSE to Motion re #41 MOTION For Transfer To U.S. District Court For The District Of Columbia Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) - Statement of Interest in Response to Defendant's Motion For Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) filed by United States of America. (Gillingham, James)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #59 Motion for Leave to File. The United States of America is granted leave to file a statement of interest regarding Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.s Motion for Transfer to the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) on or before October 25, 2016. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/24/16. (cm, )
October 21, 2016 Filing 61 SEALED QUI TAM PLAINTIFFS/RELATORS FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Melsheimer, Thomas) Modified on 12/27/2016 (cm, ). Modified on 1/4/2017 (cm, ).
October 21, 2016 Filing 60 MOTION to Seal Document RELATORS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO FILE FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT UNDER SEAL AND FOR EXTENSION OF SERVICE DEADLINE by Michael J. Fisher, Keith Franklin, Chessa Hartfield, Regina McPhaul. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Melsheimer, Thomas)
October 17, 2016 Filing 59 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Statement of Interest Regarding Defendant's Motion to Transfer by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillingham, James)
October 11, 2016 Filing 58 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #41 MOTION For Transfer To U.S. District Court For The District Of Columbia Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) (RELATORS' SURREPLY IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C.1404(A)) filed by Michael J. Fisher, Keith Franklin, Chessa Hartfield, Regina McPhaul. (Melsheimer, Thomas)
October 11, 2016 Filing 57 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Garland Gillingham on behalf of United States of America (Gillingham, James)
October 11, 2016 Filing 56 NOTICE by United States of America re #41 MOTION For Transfer To U.S. District Court For The District Of Columbia Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) - United States of America's Notice of Intent to File Statement of Interest (Gillingham, James)
September 29, 2016 Filing 55 REPLY to Response to Motion re #41 MOTION For Transfer To U.S. District Court For The District Of Columbia Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Rosenberg, Jonathan)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #53 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9 /29/2016. (cm, )
September 27, 2016 Filing 53 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sayles, Richard)
September 19, 2016 Filing 52 RESPONSE to Motion re #41 MOTION For Transfer To U.S. District Court For The District Of Columbia Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) (RELATORS' RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. s 1404(A)) filed by Michael J. Fisher, Keith Franklin, Chessa Hartfield, Regina McPhaul. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Melsheimer, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/20/2016: #7 Text of Proposed Order) (cm, ).
September 16, 2016 Filing 51 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth Danielle Thompson Williams on behalf of Michael J. Fisher, Keith Franklin, Chessa Hartfield, Regina McPhaul (Williams, Elizabeth Danielle)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #42 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #41 MOTION For Transfer To U.S. District Court For The District Of Columbia Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) Responses due by 9/19/2016. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9/8/16. (cm, )
September 2, 2016 Filing 49 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason Louis Lichtman on behalf of Michael J. Fisher, Keith Franklin, Chessa Hartfield, Regina McPhaul (Lichtman, Jason)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #46 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Samuel L Boyd and Catherine Carlyle Jobe terminated. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9/2/16. (cm, )
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #45 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The deadline to serve the complaint is extended to October 21, 2016. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9/2/16. (cm, )
September 1, 2016 Filing 46 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Michael J. Fisher, Keith Franklin, Chessa Hartfield, Regina McPhaul. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Jobe, Catherine)
September 1, 2016 Filing 45 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File (Unopposed Motion for Extension of Deadline to Serve the Complaint) by Michael J. Fisher, Keith Franklin, Chessa Hartfield, Regina McPhaul. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Melsheimer, Thomas)
August 25, 2016 Filing 44 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Brett Johnson on behalf of Michael J. Fisher, Keith Franklin, Chessa Hartfield, Regina McPhaul (Johnson, Michael)
August 25, 2016 Filing 43 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Chad Brian Walker on behalf of Michael J. Fisher, Keith Franklin, Chessa Hartfield, Regina McPhaul (Walker, Chad)
August 25, 2016 Filing 42 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #41 MOTION For Transfer To U.S. District Court For The District Of Columbia Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) (Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Their Response to Defendant's Motion To Transfer Venue) by Michael J. Fisher, Keith Franklin, Chessa Hartfield, Regina McPhaul. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Melsheimer, Thomas)
August 17, 2016 Filing 41 MOTION For Transfer To U.S. District Court For The District Of Columbia Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan Rosenberg, Esq. In Support, #2 Exhibit A to Rosenberg Declaration, #3 Exhibit B To Rosenberg Declaration, #4 Exhibit C To Rosenberg Declaration, #5 Exhibit D To Rosenberg Declaration, #6 Exhibit E To Rosenberg Declaration, #7 Exhibit F To Rosenberg Declaration, #8 Exhibit G To Rosenberg Declaration, #9 Exhibit H To Rosenberg Declaration, #10 Exhibit I To Rosenberg Declaration, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosenberg, Jonathan)
August 17, 2016 Filing 40 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edwin Sawyer Neely on behalf of All Defendants (Neely, Edwin)
August 17, 2016 Filing 39 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Darren P Nicholson on behalf of All Defendants (Nicholson, Darren)
August 17, 2016 Filing 38 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard Alan Sayles on behalf of All Defendants (Sayles, Richard)
August 17, 2016 Filing 37 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth Lemond McKeen on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank NA (McKeen, Elizabeth)
August 17, 2016 Filing 36 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Rosenberg on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank NA (Rosenberg, Jonathan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 35 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:13-cv-06920. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 15, 2016 Case Assigned to Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (cm, )
June 15, 2016 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Michael J. Fisher, Keith Franklin, Chessa Hartfield, Regina McPhaul. (cm, )
June 6, 2016 Filing 34 QUI TAM PLAINTIFF/RELATORS' THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO 31 USC 3729-3732, FALSE CLAIMS ACT amending #33 Amended Complaint against JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by United States of America, Michael J. Fisher, Keith Franklin, Chezza Hartfield, Regina McPhaul. Related document: #33 Amended Complaint filed by Michael J. Fisher, Keith Franklin, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8) (This document was previously sealed in envelope #11 and unsealed on 6/6/2016.) (kko) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/15/2016.]
June 6, 2016 Filing 33 QUI TAM PLAINTIFF/RELATORS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO 31 USC 3729-3732, FALSE CLAIMS ACT amending #28 Amended Complaint, against JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Michael J. Fisher, United States of America, Keith Franklin. Related document: #28 Amended Complaint filed by Michael J. Fisher, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (This document was previously sealed in envelope #8 and unsealed on 6/6/2016.) (kko) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/15/2016.]
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SEAL granting #30 Motion to Seal. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Qui Tam Plaintiffs/Relators' Motion for Leave to File Relators' Second Amended Complaint and Leave to File It Under Seal pursuant to 31 U.S.C. 3729-3732, False Claims Act, (Doc No. __), including its Exhibits, related filings, motions and orders, is GRANTED and that all such filings herein be filed under seal pursuant to 31 U.S.C. 3730(b) until further order of this Court, and that no pleadings be served upon the defendant until further order of this Court so that the Government may have the opportunity to investigate new claims alleged in Relators' Second Amended Complaint. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 9/3/2014) (This document was previously sealed in envelope #8 and unsealed on 6/6/2016.) (kko) Modified on 6/15/2016 (kko). [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/15/2016.]
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING RELATORS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND LEAVE TO FILE IT UNDER SEAL granting #29 Motion to Amend/Correct #28 Amended Complaint. Having considered the Motion for Leave, the Court is of the opinion that the Motion should be and is hereby GRANTED. It is therefore ORDERED that: Relators' Second Amended Complaint is deemed filed at the time the Motion for Leave was filed on September 2, 2014, the date it was lodged. Relators' Second Amended Complaint is filed under seal pursuant to 31 U.S.C. 3730(b) so that the Government may have the opportunity to investigate the claims alleged therein. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 9/3/2014) (This document was previously sealed in envelope #8 and unsealed on 6/6/2016.) (kko) Modified on 6/15/2016 (kko). [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/15/2016.]
June 6, 2016 Filing 30 QUI TAM PLAINTIFFS' MOTION to Seal. Document filed by Michael J. Fisher. (This document was previously sealed in envelope #8 and unsealed on 6/6/2016.) (kko) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/15/2016.]
June 6, 2016 Filing 29 QUI TAM PLAINTIFF/RELATORS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND LEAVE TO FILE IT UNDER SEAL. Document filed by Michael J. Fisher. (This document was previously sealed in envelope #8 and unsealed on 6/6/2016.) (kko) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/15/2016.]
June 6, 2016 Filing 28 QUI TAM PLAINTIFF/RELATOR MICHAEL J. FISHER'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO 31 U.S.C. 3729-3732, FEDERAL FALSE CLAIMS ACT amending #17 Complaint, against JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Michael J. Fisher, United States of America. Related document: #17 Complaint, filed by Michael J. Fisher, United States of America. [Exhibits 1, 2, 3, 4, 5A-R, 6, 7, 8, 9 - PDF files could not be uploaded to ECF from CD provided by Plaintiffs] (This document was previously sealed in envelope #4 and unsealed on 6/6/2016.)(kko) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/15/2016.]
June 6, 2016 Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: #16 Order to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (kko) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/15/2016.]
June 6, 2016 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - Eastern District of Texas, except for SEALED documents numbered 2, 3, 5-7, which were sent via Federal Express AIRBILL # 0201776506178039 on 6/13/2016; and documents number 28 which was sent via UPS AIRBILL # 1Z E22 E53 37 1004 382 8. (kko) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/15/2016.]
June 6, 2016 Filing 27 DECLARATION of Chad B. Walker re: #26 MOTION to Transfer Case. Document filed by Michael J. Fisher. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (This document was previously sealed in envelope #14 and unsealed on 6/6/2016.) (kko) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/15/2016.]
June 6, 2016 Filing 26 RELATORS' UNOPPOSED MOTION to Transfer Venue to the Eastern District of Texas, Sherman Division. Document filed by Michael J. Fisher. (This document was previously sealed in envelope #14 and unsealed on 6/6/2016.) (kko) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/15/2016.]
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #24 Motion for Thomas M. Melsheimer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 5/16/2016) (This document was previously sealed in envelope #13 and unsealed on 6/6/2016.) (kko) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/15/2016.]
June 6, 2016 Filing 24 MOTION for Thomas M. Melsheimer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Michael J. Fisher. (This document was previously sealed in envelope #13 and unsealed on 6/6/2016.) (kko) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/15/2016.]
June 6, 2016 Filing 23 LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Rebecca C. Martin dated 3/18/2016 re: Enclosing for the Court's review and approval a proposed Order unsealing this action. Document filed by United States of America. (This document was previously sealed in envelope #12 and unsealed on 6/6/2016.) (kko) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/15/2016.]
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that for good cause shown pursuant to 31 U.S.C. 3730(b)(3), the time for plaintiff the United States of America to notify this Court of its decision whether to intervene into this action in connection with the allegations of the Second Amended Complaint ("SAC"), or decline to do so, is hereby extended to and including May 4, 2015. The SAC, and all orders and other documents submitted to this Court relating to the SAC, shall remain under seal during that period and until further order of the Court. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 11/5/2014) (This document was previously sealed in envelope #10 and unsealed on 6/6/2016.) (kko) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/15/2016.]
June 6, 2016 Filing 21 EX PARTE STATUS REPORT OF THE UNITED STATES AND STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF A PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING THE SEAL. Document filed by United States of America. (This document was previously sealed in envelope #10 and unsealed on 6/6/2016.) (kko) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/15/2016.]
June 6, 2016 Filing 20 LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Christopher B. Harwood dated 11/4/2014 re: Ex Parte Status Report and Request to extend the seal by six months. Document filed by United States of America. (This document was previously sealed in envelope #10 and unsealed on 6/6/2016.)(kko) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/15/2016.]
June 6, 2016 Filing 19 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Samuel L. Boyd dated 9/4/2014. Document filed by Michael J. Fisher. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (This document was previously sealed in envelope #9 and unsealed on 6/6/2016.) (kko) Modified on 6/14/2016 (kko). [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/15/2016.]
June 6, 2016 Filing 18 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (This document was previously sealed in envelope #1 and unsealed on 6/6/2016.) (kko) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/15/2016.]
June 6, 2016 Filing 17 QUI TAM PLAINTIFF/RELATOR MICHAEL J. FISHER'S COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO 31 U.S.C. 3729-3732, FEDERAL FALSE CLAIMS ACT against JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Document filed by Michael J. Fisher, United States of America. (This document was previously sealed in envelope #1 and unsealed on 6/6/2016.)(kko) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/15/2016.]
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Before the Court is Qui Tam Plaintiff/Relators' Motion to Transfer Venue to the Eastern District of Texas, Sherman Division. The Court is of the opinion that the Motion is well taken and should be and therefore is GRANTED. The Clerk is therefore INSTRUCTED TO TRANSFER this action and all pleadings to the Eastern District of Texas, Sherman division. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 6/2/2016) (kko) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/15/2016.]
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER, The United States of America (the "Government"), by its attorney, Preet Bharara, having declined to intervene pursuant to the False Claims Act, 31 U.S.C. 3730(b)(4)(B), with respect to the claims raised in the Complaint filed by the relator in the above-captioned action, and now having declined to change that determination as to the claims raised in the First, Second and Third Amended Complaints filed by the relator in the above-captioned action; IT IS ORDERED THAT: 1. The First Amended Complaint, Second Amended Complaint, and Third Amended Complaint shall be unsealed thirty days after entry of this Order; and, in the event that relator has not moved to dismiss this action, service upon defendant by the relator is authorized as of that date. 2. Except for this Order, the First Amended Complaint, the Second Amended Complaint, and the Third Amended Complaint, all documents filed in this action between April 8, 2014 and the date of entry of this Order shall remain under seal. 3. Pursuant to the Court's April 8, 2014 Order, all documents filed in this action prior to April 8, 2014, shall remain under seal except for the April 8, 2014 Order, the Government's Notice of Decision to Decline Intervention as to the Complaint, and the Complaint. 3. Upon the unsealing of the First Amended Complaint, the Second Amended Complaint, and the Third Amended Complaint, the seal shall be lifted as to all matters occurring in this action subsequent to the date of this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 03/22/2016) (mps) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/15/2016.]
June 6, 2016 Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk. Transmitted re: #16 Order to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing or unsealing of document or case. (kko) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/15/2016.]
May 31, 2016 Filing 14 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/15/2016.]
May 16, 2016 Filing 13 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/15/2016.]
March 22, 2016 Filing 12 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/15/2016.]
November 3, 2015 Filing 11 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/15/2016.]
November 7, 2014 Filing 10 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/15/2016.]
September 4, 2014 Filing 9 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/15/2016.]
September 3, 2014 Filing 8 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/15/2016.]
April 9, 2014 Filing 7 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/15/2016.]
April 3, 2014 Filing 6 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/15/2016.]
November 22, 2013 Filing 5 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/15/2016.]
November 15, 2013 Filing 4 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/15/2016.]
November 15, 2013 Filing 3 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/15/2016.]
October 1, 2013 Filing 2 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/15/2016.]
September 30, 2013 Filing 1 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/15/2016.]
September 30, 2013 Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger is so designated. (nm) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/15/2016.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America, ex rel Michael J. Fisher v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Represented By: Jonathan Rosenberg
Represented By: Darren P Nicholson
Represented By: Edwin Sawyer Neely
Represented By: Asher Rivner
Represented By: Anton Metlitsky
Represented By: Mark Daniel Strachan
Represented By: Richard Alan Sayles
Represented By: Elizabeth Lemond McKeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America, ex rel Michael J. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. Fisher
Represented By: Samuel L Boyd
Represented By: Thomas M Melsheimer
Represented By: Chad Brian Walker
Represented By: Roger D Sanders
Represented By: Geoffrey Lloyd Harrison
Represented By: Catherine Carlyle Jobe
Represented By: Michael Brett Johnson
Represented By: Laranda Moffett Walker
Represented By: Shawn L Raymond
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: Elizabeth Danielle Thompson Williams
Represented By: Stephen Lee Shackelford, Jr
Represented By: Mazin Ahmad Sbaiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Samuel L Boyd
Represented By: Thomas M Melsheimer
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: Mazin Ahmad Sbaiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Franklin
Represented By: Samuel L Boyd
Represented By: Thomas M Melsheimer
Represented By: Chad Brian Walker
Represented By: Roger D Sanders
Represented By: Geoffrey Lloyd Harrison
Represented By: Catherine Carlyle Jobe
Represented By: Michael Brett Johnson
Represented By: Laranda Moffett Walker
Represented By: Shawn L Raymond
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: Elizabeth Danielle Thompson Williams
Represented By: Stephen Lee Shackelford, Jr
Represented By: Mazin Ahmad Sbaiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina McPhaul
Represented By: Samuel L Boyd
Represented By: Thomas M Melsheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chessa Hartfield
Represented By: Samuel L Boyd
Represented By: Thomas M Melsheimer
Represented By: Chad Brian Walker
Represented By: Roger D Sanders
Represented By: Geoffrey Lloyd Harrison
Represented By: Catherine Carlyle Jobe
Represented By: Michael Brett Johnson
Represented By: Laranda Moffett Walker
Represented By: Shawn L Raymond
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: Elizabeth Danielle Thompson Williams
Represented By: Stephen Lee Shackelford, Jr
Represented By: Mazin Ahmad Sbaiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reggie McPhaul
Represented By: Samuel L Boyd
Represented By: Thomas M Melsheimer
Represented By: Chad Brian Walker
Represented By: Roger D Sanders
Represented By: Geoffrey Lloyd Harrison
Represented By: Catherine Carlyle Jobe
Represented By: Michael Brett Johnson
Represented By: Laranda Moffett Walker
Represented By: Shawn L Raymond
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: Elizabeth Danielle Thompson Williams
Represented By: Stephen Lee Shackelford, Jr
Represented By: Mazin Ahmad Sbaiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?