February 20, 2020 |
Filing
238
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. It is therefore ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs (Dkt. 229 ) is hereby DENIED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/20/2020. (baf, )
|
February 3, 2020 |
Filing
237
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. It is therefore ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Judgment Under Rules 59(e) or 60 (Dkt. 233 ) is hereby DENIED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/3/2020. (baf, )
|
September 18, 2018 |
Filing
218
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER AND FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Defendants' counterclaim for judicial foreclosure (Dkt. # 143 ) is hereby GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9/18/2018. (rpc, ) Modified on 9/18/2018 (kls, ).
|
February 28, 2018 |
Filing
196
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. It is therefore ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Joint Pre-Trial Order (Dkt. 189 ) is hereby GRANTED in part. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/28/2018. (baf, )
|
October 2, 2017 |
Filing
135
MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE for 127 Report and Recommendations, re 99 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by John Priester, Jr., Bettie Priester. The Court is of the opinion that the fi ndings and conclusions of the Magistrate Judge are correct and adopts the Magistrate Judge's report (Dkt. #127) as the findings and conclusions of the Court. It is, therefore, ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion (Dkt. 99 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9/30/2017. (baf, )
|
June 30, 2017 |
Filing
98
MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE, for 74 Unopposed Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed by John Priester, Jr., Bettie Prieste. ORDERED that Plaintiffs John Priester and Bettie Priester's Partially Unopposed Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Dkt. #74) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, that Plaintiffs are DENIED leave to file the Amended Complaint (Dkt. #75), and that Plaintiffs' first-filed Amended Complaint (Dkt. #66) is STRICKEN. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/30/2017. (kls, )
|
March 3, 2017 |
Filing
64
MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE for 61 Report and Recommendations. Having considered each of Defendants' timely filed objections (Dkt. #63), and having conducted a de novo review, the Court i s of the opinion that the findings and conclusions of the Magistrate Judge are correct and adopts the Magistrate Judge's report (Dkt. #61) as the findings and conclusions of the Court. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Defendants' Motion f or Judgment on the Pleadings (Dkt. 10 ) is DENIED. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file an Amended Complaint on or before March 17, 2017, setting forth those factual bases for any alleged material change in circumstances. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 3/3/2017. (baf, )
|
February 8, 2017 |
Filing
62
MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE - Having considered each of Plaintiffs' timely filed objections (Dkt. #56), each of Defendants' responses (Dkts. #57-59), and having conducted a de novo review, the Court is of the opinion that the findings and conclusions of the Magistrate Judge are correct and adopts the Magistrate Judge's report (Dkt. #55) as the findings and conclusions of the Court. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Plaintiff' s Motion to Remand (Dkt. 8 ) is DENIED, and that the Non-Diverse Defendants--Cristobal Galindo, PC, Galindo Law & Title, Galindo Cristobal Title Services, Cristobal Galindo, Alamo Title Company, Kristen Tinsleyeach be dismissed without prejudice. It is further ORDERED that the Motion for Default Judgment (Dkt. 12 ), the Galindo Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 24 ), the Alamo Title Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 26 ), the Tinsley Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 27 ), and the Motion for Leave (Dkt. #[52)] each are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/8/2017. (baf, ) Modified on 2/8/2017 (baf, ).
|