Morgan v. NTS Architects & Planners, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Jason Morgan
Defendant: NTS Architects & Planners, Inc., Western Rim Investors 2013-3, L.P. and Newport Classic Homes, L.P.
Case Number: 4:2016cv00454
Filed: June 29, 2016
Court: Texas Eastern District Court
Office: Sherman Office
County: Collin
Referring Judge: Don D. Bush
Presiding Judge: Amos L. Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 7, 2018 133 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE 132 . The parties' Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice (Dkt. #131) is GRANTED. This entire action, and all of the claims asserted therein, be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own costs. All relief not previously granted is hereby DENIED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/7/2018. (rpc, )
December 29, 2017 125 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Dkt. #70) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/29/2017. (rpc, )
November 30, 2017 112 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE for 85 Report and Recommendations re: 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by WW Woodbridge, LP. Western Rim Investors 2013-3, L.P., Newport Classic Homes, L.P. Defendants No-Evidence Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. #47) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 11/30/2017. (cm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgan v. NTS Architects & Planners, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Morgan
Represented By: Eric Graham Calhoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NTS Architects & Planners, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Rim Investors 2013-3, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newport Classic Homes, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?