Robin v. City of Frisco, Texas et al
Plaintiff: Janna Robin
Defendant: City of Frisco, Texas, Greg Ward, John Bruce, Lauren Safranek, George Purefoy and Amy Smith
Case Number: 4:2016cv00576
Filed: August 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: Collin
Presiding Judge: Amos L. Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Plaintiff may proceed to trial on her state law retaliation claims under the TCHRA as against the City. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #57) is hereby GRANTED and Plaintiff's state law conspiracy and aiding-and-abetting claims are DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/4/2018. (rpc, )
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 35 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Lauren Safranek, Greg Ward, George Purefoy, City of Frisco, Texas, Amy Smith, John Bruce. Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. #35) is hereby GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 11/15/2017. (cm, )
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 26 MOTION for Leave to File Defendants' Final Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand filed by Lauren Safranek, Greg Ward, George Purefoy, City of Frisco, Texas, Amy Smith, John Br uce, 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend 3 Answer to Complaint filed by Lauren Safranek, Greg Ward, George Purefoy, City of Frisco, Texas, Amy Smith, John Bruce. Defendants Motion for Leave to File their Final Amended A nswer, Affirmative Defenses, and Jury Demand in Response to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint (Dkt. #26) is hereby GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendants Motion for Leave for Extension of Time to File Defendants Final Amended Pleadings (Dkt. #25) is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/13/17. (cm, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robin v. City of Frisco, Texas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janna Robin
Represented By: Alexander Max Douglas Brauer
Represented By: Benjamin Leon Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Frisco, Texas
Represented By: Kimberly Beth Herbert
Represented By: Darrell G-M Noga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Ward
Represented By: Kimberly Beth Herbert
Represented By: Darrell G-M Noga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Bruce
Represented By: Kimberly Beth Herbert
Represented By: Darrell G-M Noga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren Safranek
Represented By: Kimberly Beth Herbert
Represented By: Darrell G-M Noga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Purefoy
Represented By: Kimberly Beth Herbert
Represented By: Darrell G-M Noga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Smith
Represented By: Kimberly Beth Herbert
Represented By: Darrell G-M Noga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?